Electric Boat Corporation v. United States of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit Rhode Island District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00461

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 21, 2022 at 3:54 PM EST (3.7 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Electric Boat Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Fotouhi +1 202 887 3681 dfotouhi@gibsondunn.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K. Murphy +1 202 955 8238 +1 202 530 9657 mmurphy@gibsondunn.com

Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald J. Petros +2742 274 274 2000 +2779 277 277 9600 gpetros@haslaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua Michael Levin +1 202 514 4198 joshua.levin@usdoj.gov
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Represented by Gardner Cornell, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Michael Levin +1 202 514 4198 joshua.levin@usdoj.gov
No Logo Electric Boat Corporation, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Fotouhi +1 202 887 3681 dfotouhi@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael K. Murphy +1 202 955 8238 +1 202 530 9657 mmurphy@gibsondunn.com

Represented by Hinckley Allen & Snyder, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gerald J. Petros +2742 274 274 2000 +2779 277 277 9600 gpetros@haslaw.com
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/21/2022, Entered: None Response in Opposition
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/23/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/17/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Consent Decree
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Approve Consent Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Status Report
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference scheduled for Tuesday 6/28/2016 at 9:30 AM in Chambers before Chief Judge William E. Smith; out-of-state counsel may attend via teleconference if they first send a written request to do so via email to Case Manager Ryan Jackson. (Jackson, Ryan) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/18/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/31/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued as to USA
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Complaint - New Case
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?