USA v. Castellano et al
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00523-NGG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 4, 2021 at 1:06 AM ST (4.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Laraine Castellano, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Kestenbaum & Mark

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
also known asLaraine Lia Richard Stephen Kestenbaum +1 516 466 0410 +1 516 829 3729 rkestenbaum@kmtaxlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Richard Stephen Kestenbaum +1 516 466 0410 +1 516 829 3729 rkestenbaum@kmtaxlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (187) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/16/2021, Entered: 7/16/2021 Sentencing Memorandum
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Thomas Scialpi, SENTENCING MEMORANDUM SUPPLEMENT by Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021
    ORDER: Defendant's 185 request to travel is DENIED without prejudice. If Defendant wishes to renew his request, he is DIRECTED to provide the court with a more detailed submission describing his familial or other relationship with Mr. DiPietro. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/14/2021. (Baron, Laura)
      LREF
      Legal Document 185 Filed: 5/14/2021, Entered: 5/14/2021
      Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
        LREF
        Legal Document 184 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: 4/28/2021
        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
          LREF
          Legal Document 183 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Court Filing
          ORDER granting 178 Motion to Release Bond Obligation as to Laraine Castellano (1). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/22/2021. (Lee, Tiffeny)
            LREF
            Legal Document 181 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021 Court Filing
            JUDGMENT as to Laraine Castellano (1), Count(s) 1, 2, Dismissed on Motion of the United States; Count(s) 5, Receives time served on Count 5 of the Indictment; 3 years supervised release with special conditions; $100 special assessment; $9.4 Million Restitution due immediately and payable at the rate of 20% of the defendant's gross monthly income while on supervised release. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/21/2021. (Lee, Tiffeny)
              LREF
              Blank  Filed: 4/20/2021, Entered: 4/20/2021 Minute Entry
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Sentencing held via videoconference on April 20, 2021. Counsel for the Government and for Defendant present via video. Defendant present via video. Defense counsel is DIRECTED to provide the court with a supplemental filing identifying all of the relevant information omitted from prior filings, including a detailed explanation from a qualified physician describing whether receiving the COVID-19 vaccination would present a specific risk to Defendant and explaining, in detail, their medical recommendation as to whether Defendant should receive the vaccination and the reasoning behind that recommendation. The supplemental filing should also provide the court with a complete understanding of Defendant's business dealings, including the identity of Defendant's business partners and descriptions of all sources of Defendant's income with specificity. Defense counsel is DIRECTED to submit the supplemental filing by Wednesday, April 28, 2021. The sentencing is ADJOURNED until after the court receives Defendant's supplemental filing. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and to contact the court's Deputy at joseph_reccoppa@nyed.uscourts.gov to select a new date for the sentencing, which will take place in Courtroom 4D at the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of New York, located at 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, NY 11201. (Baron, Laura)
                LREF
                Legal Document 178 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Letter Motion
                Letter MOTION to Release Bond Obligation by Laraine Castellano. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Harris, Justine)
                LREF
                Legal Document 176 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 Sentencing Memorandum
                SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Thomas Scialpi (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Kedia, Sarita)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/9/2021, Entered: 4/9/2021 Notice of Filing of Official TranscriptCourt Filing
                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Laraine Castellano held on November 24, 2020, before Judge Garaufis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Charleane M. Heading, Telephone number 718-613-2643. Email address: cheading@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/30/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2021. (Heading, Charleane)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Court Filing
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Dennis Scialpi held on October 8. 2019, before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Danelczyk, Telephone number 718-613-2330. Email address: LindaDan226@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2021. (Danelczyk, Linda)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021 Court Filing
                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Thomas Scialpi held on October 8. 2019, before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda Danelczyk, Telephone number 718-613-2330. Email address: LindaDan226@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/16/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/26/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2021. (Danelczyk, Linda)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 172 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: 3/25/2021 Court Filing
                      ORDER as to Thomas Scialpi re 171 Letter requesting permission to travel. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/24/2021. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021
                        Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 170 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021 sentencing memorandum
                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Thomas Scialpi (Hafetz, Joshua)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 169 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER as to Thomas Scialpi re [168] Letter requesting permission to travel. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/11/2021. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021 letter
                              Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: 12/10/2020 sentencing memorandum
                                SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Thomas Scialpi (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Kedia, Sarita)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Email Test
                                Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Levine, Evelyn)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Email Test
                                  Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY (Levine, Evelyn)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 164 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 letter
                                    Letter Requesting Adjournment of Sentencing as to Laraine Castellano (Harris, Justine)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 163 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/12/2020 sentencing memorandum
                                      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by USA as to Laraine Castellano (Hafetz, Joshua)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 162 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020 sentencing memorandum
                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Laraine Castellano (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E) (Harris, Justine)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 160 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: 10/13/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER re [159] Letter requesting adjournment of sentencing as to Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. Sentencing adjourned to 11/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/9/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 159 Filed: 9/26/2020, Entered: 9/26/2020 letter
                                          Letter requesting adjournment of sentencing as to Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 158 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 letter
                                            Letter Requesting Adjournment of Sentencing as to Laraine Castellano (Harris, Justine)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 156 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: 7/21/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER as to Laraine Castellano re [155] Letter Requesting Adjournment of Sentencing. Application granted. Sentencing is set for 9/23/2020 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/20/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 155 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 letter
                                                Letter Requesting Adjournment of Sentencing as to Laraine Castellano (Harris, Justine)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 154 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020 letter
                                                  Letter requesting adjournment of sentencing as to Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 153 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER re [152] Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to the PSR, until Monday, July 20, 2020 as to Laraine Castellano (1). Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/7/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 152 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020, Terminated: 7/7/2020 motion for extension of time to file
                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to the PSR by Laraine Castellano. (Harris, Justine)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 148 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER as to Laraine Castellano re [147] Letter Requesting Permission to Travel. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/14/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 letter
                                                          Letter Requesting Permission to Travel as to Laraine Castellano (Estevao, Anna)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting [145] Motion to Travel as to Thomas Scialpi (2)Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/7/2020. (Marziliano, August)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 145 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020, Terminated: 2/10/2020 Motion to Travel
                                                              Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita) Modified on 2/10/2020 (Marziliano, August).
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 144 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER as to Thomas Scialpi granting Probation's request for adjournment due to delay in presentence investigation. Sentencing set for 4/22/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/17/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 143 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Change of Plea Hearing as to Laraine Castellano held on 10/15/2019. Plea entered by Laraine Castellano (1); Guilty Count 5. Sentencing set for 2/26/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. (Court Reporter Michele Lucchese) (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 138 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anna Maria Estevao appearing for Laraine Castellano (Estevao, Anna)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 137 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 letter
                                                                      Letter Regarding Internal Screen at Sher Tremonte as to Laraine Castellano (Harris, Justine)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 136 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Justine A. Harris appearing for Laraine Castellano (Harris, Justine)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 135 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 Order on Motion To Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [134] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Justine A. Harris for Laraine Castellano replacing James Druker as to Laraine Castellano (1). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/7/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Change of Plea HearingCourt Filing
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Change of Plea Hearing as to Thomas Scialpi held on 10/8/2019. Plea entered by Thomas Scialpi (2); Guilty Count 3. Sentencing set for 1/22/2020 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. (Court Reporter Linda Danelczyk) (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Plea Agreement Hearing as to Dennis Scialpi held on 10/8/2019. Plea entered by Dennis Scialpi (3) Guilty Count 1s. Sentencing set for 1/22/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. (Court Reporter Linda Danelczyk) (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 information - felony
                                                                                SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (S-1) as to Dennis Scialpi (3) count(s) 1s. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Waiver of Indictment
                                                                                  WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Dennis Scialpi. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 134 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019, Terminated: 10/10/2019 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Laraine Castellano. (Harris, Justine)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 133 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [128] Motion for Extension of Time as Laraine Castellano (1), Thomas Scialpi (2), Dennis Scialpi (3). Oral argument is scheduled for Tuesday January 7, 2020 at 11:00. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/30/19. (Piper, Francine) Modified on 9/3/2019 to correct date (Piper, Francine).
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 132 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 letter
                                                                                        Letter request to schedule plea as to Laraine Castellano (Druker, James)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 128 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: 7/11/2019, Terminated: 9/3/2019 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Laraine Castellano as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. (Druker, Scott)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 127 Filed: 5/17/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi re [126] Letter requesting adjournment of motion schedule. Motions due by 7/15/2019; Response due by 9/3/2019; Reply due by 9/17/2019. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Time excluded until 9/25/19. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/16/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 126 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/15/2019 letter
                                                                                              Letter requesting adjournment of motion schedule as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 125 Filed: 3/28/2019, Entered: 4/2/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER as to Thomas Scialpi re [124] Letter requesting to travel. Application granted. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/28/2019. (Love, Alexis)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 letter
                                                                                                  Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 123 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: 3/21/2019 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER granting [122] Motion to Travel as to Laraine Castellano (1). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/20/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: 3/13/2019, Terminated: 3/21/2019 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                      Letter MOTION to Travel by Laraine Castellano. (Druker, James)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 121 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: 3/4/2019 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi Time excluded from 3/4/2019 until 5/15/2019., ( Motions due by 5/15/2019., Responses due by 7/1/2019, Replies due by 7/15/2019.). Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/4/2019. (Marziliano, August)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 120 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: 2/26/2019 letter
                                                                                                          Letter requesting adjournment of motion schedule as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 119 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi re [118] Letter requesting adjournment of motion schedule. Defendants' Motions due: 3/1/2019; Government's response due by 4/15/2019; Reply due 4/29/2019. Oral argument set for 5/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Speedy Trial time is excluded for motion practice until oral argument. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/14/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018 letter
                                                                                                              Letter requesting adjournment of motion schedule as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 117 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER as to Thomas Scialpi re request to travel to Florida. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/25/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: 10/24/2018 letter
                                                                                                                  Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 115 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: 10/18/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER re [114] amended motion schedule as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. Defendants' Motions due by 12/14/2018; Goverment's Response due by 1/25/2019; Defendants' Replies due by 2/8/2019. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Time is excluded under the Speedy Trial Act until oral argument on consent of the parties. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/16/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 114 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: 10/16/2018 letter
                                                                                                                      Letter requesting modificiation of motion schedule as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 113 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: 10/11/2018 letter
                                                                                                                        Letter requesting modification of motion schedule as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 112 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: 9/13/2018 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Firm, address, email hem@msf-law.com by Dennis Scialpi (Mazurek, Henry)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 111 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: 9/11/2018 letter
                                                                                                                            Letter re Production of Discovery as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Buford, Frank)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: 8/21/2018 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER re [109] Motion to Continue as to Laraine Castellano (1), Thomas Scialpi (2), Dennis Scialpi (3). Application is granted. Time is excluded for motion practice under the Speedy Trial Act to and including January 3, 2019. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/17/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: 8/9/2018, Terminated: 8/21/2018 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Continue Schedule for Motions, Responses and Oral Argument by Laraine Castellano as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. (Druker, James)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi: The [107], [108] Letter requests to travel, with consent of the government and with no objection of Pretrial Services, is granted. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/9/2018. (Abdallah, Fida)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                    Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: 8/8/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                      Letter requesting permission to travel to Florida as to Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: 7/18/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                        Letter re Production of Discovery (Tax Transcripts) as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Buford, Frank)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: 5/25/2018 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER AMENDING MOTION SCHEDULE as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. Defendants' motions due: 8/15/2018; Government's response due: 10/1/2018; Defendants' reply due: 10/17/2018. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Time is excluded until 10/31/2018. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/24/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: 5/24/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                            Letter requesting modification of motion schedule as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                              Letter re Production of Discovery Materials as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Buford, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: 4/12/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                Letter re Discovery as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Buford, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/2/2018, Entered: 4/2/2018 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [100] Motion to Travel as to Laraine Castellano (1). Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/30/18. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/29/2018, Entered: 3/29/2018, Terminated: 4/2/2018 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION to Travel by Laraine Castellano. (Druker, James)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: 3/28/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Thomas Scialpi re [98] Letter request to travel. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/27/2018. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/26/2018, Entered: 3/26/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                        Letter requesting permission to travel to Florida as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 97 Filed: 2/5/2018, Entered: 2/13/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER on DE # [96] as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. Defendants' Motions due 05/31/2018. Government's Response due by 7/16/2018. Defendant's Replies due by 7/30/2018. Status Conference set for 9/12/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/2/2018. (Williams, Erica)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 96 Filed: 2/2/2018, Entered: 2/2/2018 letter
                                                                                                                                                            Letter with Proposed Dates as to Laraine Castellano (Druker, James)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 95 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018, Terminated: 3/4/2019 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION to Continue by Laraine Castellano. (Druker, James)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 94 Filed: 1/11/2018, Entered: 1/11/2018 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James Druker appearing for Laraine Castellano (Attachments: # (1) Substitution of Counsel) (Druker, James)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 93 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: 12/21/2017 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Joshua G. Hafetz appearing for USA. (Hafetz, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 91 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [90] Motion to Travel as to Thomas Scialpi (2). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/19/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 90 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                    Letter requesting permission to travel to Florida as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Travel See Document 90 by Thomas Scialpi. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Law Firm/Mailing Address/Email Address CORRECTED by Dennis Scialpi (Mazurek, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Law Firm/Mailing Address/Email Address for Counsel of Record by Dennis Scialpi (Mazurek, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 87 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Frank Turner Buford appearing for USA. (Buford, Frank)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 12/20/2017 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Status Conference as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi held on 9/12/2017. Defendant Thomas Scialpi's bail conditions are modified in that he is given permission to travel to Maryland and Connecticut for work. Defendant Laraine Castellano needs to find new retained counsel. Motion schedule set: Defense motions by 1/12/2018. Responses due by 2/16/2018. Replies due by 2/28/2018. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Time is excluded for motion practice and case (already) designated as a complex case. (Court Reporter Angela Grant) (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 86 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Sixth Discovery Letter as to Dennis Scialpi (Seifan, Marisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 85 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Sixth Discovery Letter as to Thomas Scialpi (Seifan, Marisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 84 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Sixth Discovery Letter as to Laraine Castellano (Seifan, Marisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 83 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Fifth Discovery Letter as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Seifan, Marisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi, Application granted. Speedy Trial Act time is excluded from 7/26/2017 until 9/12/2017 on consent of the parties in the interest of justice for review of discovery. So Signed by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/282017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 81 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter regarding status conferrence and travel as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Travel See Document [81] by Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re Defendant Laraine Castellano's [79] Application to Travel. The Application is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/11/2017 (Weigel, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017, Terminated: 7/11/2017 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION to Travel by Laraine Castellano. (Kestenbaum, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: 7/11/2017 order on motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Application granted re: [77] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Dennis Scialpi (3). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/10/2017. (Almonte, Giselle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: 7/10/2017, Terminated: 7/11/2017 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to extend area of travel authorization by Dennis Scialpi. (Mazurek, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [75] Motion to Travel as to Thomas Scialpi (2). So Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/20/2017. (Almonte, Giselle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017, Terminated: 6/20/2017 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Travel by Thomas Scialpi. (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [70] Motion to Travel as to Laraine Castellano (1). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/3/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [71] Motion to Travel as to Thomas Scialpi (2). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 4/3/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [69] Motion to Continue as to Laraine Castellano (1), Thomas Scialpi (2), Dennis Scialpi (3). Time is excluded under the speedy trial act in the interest of justice for additional discovery from March 30, 2017 to July 26, 2017 on consent of the parties. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/29/17. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 4/5/2017 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Travel by Thomas Scialpi. (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 4/5/2017 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION to Travel by Laraine Castellano. (Kestenbaum, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017, Terminated: 4/4/2017 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Thomas Scialpi as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [67] Motion to Travel as to Thomas Scialpi (2). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/1/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: 2/28/2017, Terminated: 3/3/2017 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita) Modified on 3/3/2017 (Lee, Tiffeny).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 66 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. Time excluded from 12/1/16 until 1/18/17. Status Conference set for 1/18/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis.SO Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/1/2016. (Ramesar, Thameera)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: 11/30/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter re adjournment of conference date as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: 10/19/2016 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to Authorize Temporary Travel by Dennis Scialpi. (Mazurek, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [62] Motion to Travel as to Thomas Scialpi (2). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/14/2016. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: 10/14/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Travel See, Document [62] by Thomas Scialpi. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: 9/23/2016 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi granting [60] Letter requesting adjournment of status conference. Status Conference adjourned to 12/1/2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 4D South. Time excluded on consent from 9/21/2016 until 12/1/2016. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/21/2016. (Barrett, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: 9/19/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter requesting adjournment of status conference as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: 8/19/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter producing discovery as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Nguyen, Lan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: 7/14/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Thomas Scialpi re [57] Letter. Application granted. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/12/2016. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: 7/5/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: 5/13/2016 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Status Conference as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi held on 5/12/2016. Next Status Conference set for 9/21/2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Time excluded on consent. Bail conditions are modified with respect to the defendant Castellano in that the defendant is allowed to travel to Connecticut. (Court Reporter Charleane Heading) (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Henry E. Mazurek appearing for Dennis Scialpi (with corrected case number) (Mazurek, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: 5/10/2016 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Henry E. Mazurek appearing for Dennis Scialpi (Mazurek, Henry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Producing Discovery and Responding to 2.8.16 Letter as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Nguyen, Lan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: 3/15/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting Defendant Thomas Scialpi's [51] Motion to Travel. The motion is GRANTED. Defendant is permitted to travel to Florida from April 10, 2016, through April 15, 2016. Defendant is DIRECTED to advise Pretrial Services of his itinerary in advance of travel. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/15/2016. (Ding, Jeffery) (Lee, Tiffeny).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. Status Conference set for 5/12/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Time excluded from 2/8/16 until 5/12/16. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/8/2016. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: 2/5/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter requesting adjournment of status conference as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter requesting permission to travel as to Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting Defendant Thomas Scialpi's [48] Motion to Travel. The motion is GRANTED. Defendant is permitted to travel to Florida with his family from February 13, 2016, through February 21, 2016. Defendant is DIRECTED to advise Pretrial Services of his itinerary in advance of travel. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/3/2016. (Ding, Jeffery)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: 1/28/2016, Terminated: 3/15/2016 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Second MOTION to Travel by Laraine Castellano. (Kestenbaum, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Lan Nguyen appearing for USA. (Nguyen, Lan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016, Terminated: 1/20/2016 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION to Travel by Laraine Castellano. (Kestenbaum, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting Defendant Laraine Castellano's [45] Motion to Travel. The motion is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/20/2016. (Goldstein, Ryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Enclosing Second Discovery Production as to Dennis Scialpi (Trowel, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Enclosing Second Discovery Production as to Thomas Scialpi (Trowel, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Enclosing Second Discovery Production as to Laraine Castellano (Trowel, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Protective Order as to Laraine Castellano. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/6/2016. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 40 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Protective Order as to Thomas Scialpi. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/6/2016. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Protective Order as to Dennis Scialpi. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/6/2016. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Respectfully Requesting that the Court Enter the Attached Stipulations and Protective Orders Signed by the Parties, Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 16(d)(1) as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi (Trowel, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kevin M Trowel appearing for USA. (Trowel, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Order on Motion for BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [34] Motion for Bond Modification as to Thomas Scialpi (2). So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Attorney update in case as to Thomas Scialpi. Attorney Peter J. Tomao terminated as per doc.# [29]. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015, Terminated: 11/18/2015 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Bond Modification by Thomas Scialpi. (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard S. Kestenbaum appearing for Laraine Castellano Notice of Appearance Bernard S. Mark (Kestenbaum, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis: Status Conference as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi held on 11/3/2015. Further Status Conference set for 2/12/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4D South before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Time excluded on consent. The modifications of bail as to travel are granted with respect to defendants Laraine Castellano and Thomas Scalpi, with details to be provided in a letter to Pretrial Services. (Court Reporter Mary Agnes Drury) (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Enclosing First Discovery Production as to Dennis Scialpi (Seifan, Marisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Enclosing First Discovery Production as to Thomas Scialpi (Seifan, Marisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Enclosing First Discovery Production as to Laraine Castellano (Seifan, Marisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: 11/2/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sarita Kedia appearing for Thomas Scialpi (Kedia, Sarita)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter regarding modifying bond conditions dated October 15, 2015 as to Thomas Scialpi (Tomao, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: 10/30/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Modifying Travel Conditions of Bond as to Dennis Scialpi. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/29/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER as to Thomas Scialpi re [22] Letter. Absent any objection from the Government or Pretrial Services, the application [for a temporary modification to the bond conditions to permit travel on 10/24/2015] is GRANTED. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 10/23/2105 [sic]. (Barrett, C)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION by Laraine Castellano (Kestenbaum, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: 10/29/2015 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Assignment of Judge as to Laraine Castellano (Kestenbaum, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order Reassigning Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. Reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis as related to 14cr348. Judge Sandra L. Townes no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 10/29/2015. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Laraine Castellano: Defendant's [20] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release is granted. Ordered by Judge Sandra L. Townes on 10/29/2015. (Frullo, Veronica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Terminate Motions (filed in error)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motions terminated, docketed incorrectly. as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi: [23] First MOTION for Bond filed by Laraine Castellano. **This document is a confession of judgment not a motion for bond. (Frullo, Veronica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: 10/27/2015, Terminated: 10/29/2015 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION for Bond by Laraine Castellano as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. (Kestenbaum, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Corrected letter requesting Travel on Saturday, October 24, 2015 to Rockland County, New York as to Thomas Scialpi (Tomao, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter requesting temporary modification to the Order dated October 15, 2015, permitting Mr. Scialpi to travel to Westchester on Saturday, October 24, 2015 as to Thomas Scialpi (Tomao, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2015, Entered: 10/23/2015, Terminated: 10/29/2015 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Laraine Castellano. (Burns, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Corrected Letter dated October 20,2015 as to Thomas Scialpi (Tomao, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/20/2015, Entered: 10/20/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter requesting modification of the bond conditions in the Bond Order dated October 15, 2015, and requesting permission to travel December 11-14, 2015 as to Thomas Scialpi (Tomao, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order Reassigning Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. Reassigned to Judge Sandra L. Townes as related to 14cr348 and 15cr125. Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 10/20/2015. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: 10/19/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Discovery Demands Pursuant Rule 16, Brady, Giglio, Jencks, Etc. as to Thomas Scialpi (Tomao, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REDACTION as to Dennis Scialpi to [17] Sealed, Order Setting Conditions of Release. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 1 - Sealed Document CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Dennis Scialpi (3) $250K Bond with conditions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/15/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REDACTION re Thomas Scialpi to [15] Sealed, Order Setting Conditions of Release. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 1 - Sealed Document CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Thomas Scialpi (2) $500K Bond with conditions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/15/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Redacted Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REDACTED Bond as to Laraine Castellano to [13] Sealed, Order Setting Conditions of Release. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 1 - Sealed Document CRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Laraine Castellano (1) $800K Bond with conditions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/15/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Dennis Scialpi. Time excluded from 10/15/2015 until 11/03/2015. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/15/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Thomas Scialpi. Time excluded from 10/15/2015 until 11/03/2015. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/15/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Laraine Castellano. Time excluded from 10/15/2015 until 11/3/2015. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 10/15/2015. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Douglas T. Burns appearing for Dennis Scialpi. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard M. Langone appearing for Thomas Scialpi. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Richard S. Kestenbaum appearing for Laraine Castellano. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann:Initial Appearance and Arraignment as to Laraine Castellano (1) Count 1,2,5 and Thomas Scialpi (2) Count 1,2,3,4,5 and Dennis Scialpi (3) Count 1,2 held on 10/15/2015. Plea entered by Laraine Castellano (1) Count 1,2,5 and Thomas Scialpi (2) Count 1,2,3,4,5 and Dennis Scialpi (3) Count 1,2; Not Guilty on counts All Counts. Bond Hearing held. Defendants released on bond. Status Conference set for 11/3/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4B South before Judge Sandra L. Townes. (Tape #4:11-4:43.) (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter J. Tomao appearing for Thomas Scialpi (Tomao, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 Motion for Related Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Related Case Designation by USA as to Laraine Castellano, Thomas Scialpi, Dennis Scialpi. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT as to Laraine Castellano (1) count(s) 1, 2, 5, Thomas Scialpi (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Dennis Scialpi (3) count(s) 1, 2. (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Information Sheet) (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 7,180 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?