United States v. $32,600 in US Currency
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arkansas Eastern District Court, Case No. 4:15-cv-00679

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 5:33 AM ST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 881
Nature of Suit Drug Related Seizure of Property
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Decree of ForfeitureCourt Filing
ORDER OF FORFEITURE granting 13 unopposed motion; and directing that Onebanc Official Check No. 38801 in the amount of $10,000.00 be substituted as a defendant in place of Infiniti QX80, VIN JN8AZ2NE7E9068894. The Infiniti QX80 is dismissed from this action. Each party will bear its own fees and costs. The Court shall retain jurisdiction for purposes of enforcing the terms of the parties' settlement agreement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/23/2018. (ljb)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Order Cancelling Deadline
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Initial Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case, currently assigned to the docket of Judge Susan Webber Wright, due to her senior status. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 11/24/2015. (jak)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 0 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?