Rhonda Geringer v. State of Oregon Department of, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 15-35500

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 1, 2017 at 3:59 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2320 - Assault Libel and Slander
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/24/2015, Entered: None
MANDATE ISSUED. (MMS, WCC and AK) [9657585] (RR) [Entered: 08/24/2015 12:38 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
    Filed order (MARY M. SCHROEDER, WILLIAM C. CANBY and ALEX KOZINSKI) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the June 15, 2015 notice of appeal was not filed within 30 days after the district court’s judgment entered on October 22, 2013. See 28 U.S.C. § 2107(a); United States v. Sadler, 480 F.3d 932, 937 (9th Cir. 2007) (requirement of timely notice of appeal is jurisdictional). Consequently, this appeal is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. No further filings will be entertained in this closed case. DISMISSED. [9628795] (SML) [Entered: 07/30/2015 01:14 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None
      DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCE OF PRO SE APPELLANT AND NO APPEARANCE FOR APPELLEES. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Rhonda Geringer opening brief due 09/23/2015. [9578942] (SML) [Entered: 06/18/2015 08:50 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 95 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?