The Investment Committe of the Manhattan and Bronx Service Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-04408
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 25, 2017 at 3:04 AM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo The Investment Committe of the Manhattan and Bronx Service Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David L Wales +1 212 554 1409 dwales@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Moylan Guiney +1 212 545 4761 +1 212 545 4758 guiney@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
v.
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lewis Richard Clayton +1 212 373 3215 +1 212 373 2070 lclayton@paulweiss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Hillel Hurwitz +1 212 373 3254 +1 212 492 0254 jhurwitz@paulweiss.com
No Logo IBM Retirement Funds, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Irving Werder, Jr. +1 212 849 7231 +1 212 849 7100 rickwerder@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo IBM Retirement Plans Committee, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Irving Werder, Jr. +1 212 849 7231 +1 212 849 7100 rickwerder@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo New York State Common Retirement Fund, ThirdParty Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Patrick Chiplock +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 355 9592 dchiplock@lchb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Eliott Fineman +1 212 355 9500 +1 212 335 9592 sfineman@lchb.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1104
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Peter H. LeVan, Jr. dated 8/13/2010 re: Requesting that the Court adjourn the current deadline for plaintiffs to serve defendant with pre-trial order matters pending the parties' upcoming conference with the Court on August 30. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs' request to adjourn the current deadline of September 1, 2010 for serviced pre-trial order matters on defendants is hereby granted. The Court will address the issue of alternate scheduling at the August 30, 2010 conference. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/13/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00686-SAS-DCF, 1:09-cv-03020-SAS, 1:09-cv-04408-SAS(jpo) (Entered: 08/13/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David Lloyd Wales on behalf of The Investment Committe of the Manhattan and Bronx Service Transit Operating Authority Pension Plan. New Address: Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP, 1285 Sixth Avenue, 38th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10019, 212-554-1409. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00686-SAS, 1:09-cv-04408-SAS(Wales, David) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATED REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties hereby stipulate to and the Court so orders that the pre-trial schedule set forth in the Scheduling Order entered by the Court on 3/23/09, as amended by the Orders entered 4/24/09 and 9/1/09, respectively, shall be revised as follows: Fact discovery will be completed by 6/30/2010. Expert discovery will conclude by 9/30/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 3/31/2010. Plaintiffs to file their motions for class certification by 5/5/2010. Oppositions to class certification due by 6/7/2010. Reply brief in support of class certification due by 6/21/2010. All remaining provisions and deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order as amended remain in effect. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/27/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:09-cv-00686-SAS, 1:09-cv-03020-SAS, 1:09-cv-04408-SAS(tro) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 60 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?