Teashot v. Green Mountain Coffee, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, Case No. 14-1072

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 11:17 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009209895 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
[10153420] Administratively Closed;Procedural termination without judicial action;Clerk of the Court. [14-1072]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01009209682 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
    [10153322] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/27/2014 Docketing statement due 03/13/2014 for Teashot LLC. Transcript order form due 03/13/2014 for Robert R. Brunelli. Notice of appearance due on 03/13/2014 for Green Mountain Coffee Roasters, Inc., Keurig, Incorporated, Starbucks Corporation and Teashot LLC. [14-1072]
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 27 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?