United States of America v. N.Y.C. District Council of N.Y
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-3300

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 7:39 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 1470 - Civil (RICO)
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee New York City and Vicinity District Council of the United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America, FILED. Service date 11/18/2015 by CM/ECF. [1645449] [15-3300] [Entered: 11/18/2015 03:53 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None
    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee New York City and Vicinity District Council of the United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America, FILED. Service date 11/18/2015 by CM/ECF.[1645265] [15-3300] [Entered: 11/18/2015 02:49 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United States of America, FILED. Service date 11/16/2015 by CM/ECF.[1642700] [15-3300] [Entered: 11/16/2015 12:03 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
        SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant John Daly Brief due date as 01/28/2016;. Joint Appendix due date as 01/28/2016, FILED.[1642291] [15-3300] [Entered: 11/16/2015 08:41 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
          NOTICE, to Appellee United States of America , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[1642203] [15-3300] [Entered: 11/13/2015 05:43 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None
            NEW CASE MANAGER, Jennifer Thompson, ASSIGNED.[1642201] [15-3300] [Entered: 11/13/2015 05:40 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
              LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant John Daly, informing Court of proposed due date 01/28/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 11/12/2015 by CM/ECF.[1640272] [15-3300] [Entered: 11/12/2015 01:58 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                NEW CASE MANAGER, Jennifer Thompson, ASSIGNED.[1633365] [15-3300] [Entered: 11/03/2015 09:26 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
                  NEW CASE MANAGER, Jennifer Thompson, ASSIGNED.[1633347] [15-3300] [Entered: 11/03/2015 09:21 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
                    CAPTION, to reflect Appellees New York City and Vicinity District Council of the United Brotherhood of Carpenters and Joiners of America and Glen G. McGorty, AMENDED.[1631448] [15-3300] [Entered: 10/30/2015 09:27 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                      FORM D, on behalf of Appellant John Daly, FILED. Service date 10/29/2015 by CM/ECF.[1631327] [15-3300] [Entered: 10/29/2015 07:40 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                        FORM C, on behalf of Appellant John Daly, FILED. Service date 10/29/2015 by CM/ECF.[1631326] [15-3300] [Entered: 10/29/2015 07:39 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/29/2015, Entered: None
                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant John Daly, FILED. Service date 10/29/2015 by CM/ECF.[1631325] [15-3300] [Entered: 10/29/2015 07:35 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                            DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 09/16/2015, RECEIVED.[1622380] [15-3300] [Entered: 10/19/2015 02:00 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant John Daly, FILED. [1622377] [15-3300] [Entered: 10/19/2015 01:58 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?