Covye Cousins v. WMATA, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 15-7125

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 3:35 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3320 - Assault Libel and Slander
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207756432 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None
CLERK'S ORDER [1582190] filed holding case in abeyance. Case 15-7125 held in abeyance pending IFP decision in 1:12cv1058-CRC from U.S. District Court; The Clerk is directed to transmit a copy of this order to the district court. [15-7125]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207755246 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
    LETTER [1581533] sent regarding attorney membership to Timothy P. Leahy for Covye Cousins. Application for Admission due 12/02/2015. [15-7125]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207755243 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF APPEAL [1581530] filed by Covye Cousins seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:12-cv-01058-CRC. Assigned USCA Case Number [15-7125]
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 116 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?