Kreisberg v. Huntington Power Equipment, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-01592

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 6:20 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jonathan B. Kreisberg, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rick Concepcion +1 860 240 3374 +1 860 240 3564 Rick.Concepcion@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Huntington Power Equipment, Inc., Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Shipman & Goodwin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel Joseph Jiran +1 860 251 5520 +1 860 251 5500 gjiran@goodwin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jarad M. Lucan +1 860 251 5785 +1 860 251 5215 jlucan@goodwin.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The parties have reported settlement. The Clerk is directed to administratively close the file without prejudice to reopening on or before February 20, 2016, as set forth in the attached order. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/20/16. (Mata, E.)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Joseph Jiran on behalf of Huntington Power Equipment, Inc. (Jiran, Gabriel)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by Jarad M. Lucan on behalf of Huntington Power Equipment, Inc. (Lucan, Jarad)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 3 Electronic Filing Order, 4 Notice, 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jonathan B. Kreisberg, 2 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/5/2015.(Nuzzi, T)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Notice
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 11/3/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Attachment)(Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/3/2015.(Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 11/3/2015.(Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jonathan B. Kreisberg.Responses due by 11/24/2015 (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Memorandum in Support, # 9 Memorandum in Support)(Nuzzi, T) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Ferguson, L.)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 36 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?