MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV v. OBAMA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01959

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 10, 2016 at 1:51 AM ST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. Wells Dixon +1 212 614 6423 +1 212 614 6499 wdixon@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. O'Hara +1 312 704 3000 +1 312 704 3001 mohara@hinshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Andrew Moss +1 312 207 1000 amoss@reedsmith.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lowell E. Sachnoff +1 312 207 1000 lsachnoff@reedsmith.com
No Logo MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV a/k/a HAMZAYEVICH ABDULAYEV (ISN 257), Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. O'Hara +1 312 704 3000 +1 312 704 3001 mohara@hinshawlaw.com
v.
No Logo ASHTON B. CARTER, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald James Wiltsie +1 202 307 1401 +1 202 616 8470 ronald.wiltsie@usdoj.gov
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Respondent
Officially listed as "BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald James Wiltsie +1 202 307 1401 +1 202 616 8470 ronald.wiltsie@usdoj.gov
No Logo Commander NAVY REAR ADM. PETER J. CLARKE, Respondent
No Logo PETER J. CLARKE, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Terry Marcus Henry +1 202 514 4107 +1 202 616 8470 terry.henry@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald James Wiltsie +1 202 307 1401 +1 202 616 8470 ronald.wiltsie@usdoj.gov
No Logo President BARACK OBAMA, Respondent
No Logo Secretary ASHTON CARTER, Respondent
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER denying 5 Sealed Motion; denying 19 Sealed Motion. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. It is furtherORDERED that the petitioner's Motion for Judgment and Order Granting Writ of Habeas Corpus 5 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. It is furtherORDERED that Respondents' [] Motion to Dismiss the Petition [] 19 , is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. It is further ORDERED that this case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on August 1, 2016. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    RESPONSE re 41 Order, (Petitioner's Response to Show Cause Order Dated July 12, 2016) filed by MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV. (O'Hara, Matthew) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that any party shall SHOW CAUSE on or before July 27, 2016, why the Court should not deny as moot the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and the parties' dispositive cross-motions, and close this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on July 12, 2016. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wiltsie, Ronald) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Transfer by ASHTON B. CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK HUSSEIN OBAMA, II (Wiltsie, Ronald) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Filing of Protected Information Under Seal by MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV (O'Hara, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              SEALED DOCUMENT filed by MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(O'Hara, Matthew) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE OF FILING OF AMENDED PUBLIC VERSION (REDACTED) OF UNDER SEAL FILING (Docket 25 - 25-1) by MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) REDACTED Petitioner's Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment (Dkt. 25), # 2 Exhibit 2) REDACTED Ex A to Petitioner's Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment (Dkt. 25-1))(Moss, John) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Public Filing [REDACTED] of Under Seal Filing [Dkt. 27] by MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Petition, # 2 Exhibit Ex 9 to Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Petition, # 3 Exhibit Ex 10 to Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Petition, # 4 Exhibit Cert of Service to Respondents' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Petition)(Moss, John) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Public Filing [REDACTED] of Under Seal Filing [Dkt. 25] by MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Petitioner's Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment and Opp'n to Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit Ex. A to Petitioner's Reply in Support of Motion for Judgment)(Moss, John) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Public [REDACTED] Filing of Under Seal Filing (Dkt. 18) by MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Respondents' Combined Motion to Dismiss the Petition & Opp'n to Motion for Judgment, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, # 6 Exhibit 5 to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, # 7 Exhibit 6 to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, # 8 Exhibit 7 to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, # 9 Exhibit 8 to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, # 10 Exhibit Prop Order to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, # 11 Exhibit Cert of Service to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss)(Moss, John) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SEALED DOCUMENT filed by ASHTON CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK H. OBAMA(This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wiltsie, Ronald) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER denying 28 Motion. For the reasons set forth in the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the Petitioner's Motion for Oral Argument and Notice of Supplemental Authority is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on May 4, 2016. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 05/04/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            RESPONSE re 28 MOTION Petitioner's Motion for Oral Argument and Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by ASHTON CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK H. OBAMA. (Wiltsie, Ronald) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION Petitioner's Motion for Oral Argument and Notice of Supplemental Authority by MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(O'Hara, Matthew) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None sealed reply
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 5 SEALED MOTION filed by MUHAMMADI DAVLIATOV a/k/a HAMZAYEVICH ABDULAYEV (ISN 257) filed by ASHTON CARTER, PETER J. CLARKE, BARACK H. OBAMA. (See docket entry no. 18 to view document.) (td) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Sealed Opposition
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Space Space

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 81 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?