DFSB Kollective Co. Ltd. v. CJ E&M, Inc. et al
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:15-mc-80265

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2017 at 12:02 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DFSB Kollective Co. Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Browne George Ross LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew A. August +1 415 391 7100 +1 415 391 7198 aaugust@bgrfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan L Gottfried +1 310 274 7100 +1 310 275 5697 jgottfried@bgrfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith Joseph Wesley +1 310 274 7100 +1 310 275 5697 keith.wesley@lw.com
v.
No Logo CJ E&M America, Inc. , Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
a California corporation Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy B Yoo +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 tby@birdmarella.com
No Logo CJ E&M America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy B Yoo +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 tby@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy B Yoo +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 tby@birdmarella.com
No Logo CJ E&M, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
a Korean corporation Ekwan E Rhow +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 erhow@birdmarella.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy B Yoo +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 tby@birdmarella.com
No Logo Beats Music, LLC, Respondent

Represented by Lewis & Llewellyn Llp

  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Compel
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 55 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?