Chiu, Lead Plaintiff, et al v. Beverly Ent Inc, et al
Federal Court Proceeding Arkansas Western District Court, Case No. 10-pos-1
District Judge Jimm Larry Hendren, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2017 at 9:06 AM EST (4.8 years ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Charles R Krebs, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weiss & Yourman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph H Weiss +1 212 682 3025
No Logo Columbia Partners, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sean M. Handler +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 shandler@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nolan Caddell & Reynolds PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bill D Reynolds +1 479 782 5297 +1 479 782 5184 breynolds@justicetoday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart L. Berman +1 610 667 7706
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darren J Check +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
No Logo David Chiu, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randy K Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@cbplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley Geller Bowman & Coats LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jules Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 abrody@ssbny.com
No Logo Ernest Baer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Bates & Pulliam, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Curtis L. Bowman +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 cbowman@bowmanlawyer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Allen Carney +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8501 acarney@cbplaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Randy K Pulliam +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 rpulliam@cbplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carney Bates Pullman PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tiffany Wyatt Oldham +1 501 312 8500 +1 501 312 8505 toldham@cbplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cauley Geller Bowman & Coats LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S. Gene Cauley +1 501 312 8500

Toggle Switch Represented by Nolan Caddell & Reynolds PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bill D Reynolds +1 479 782 5297 +1 479 782 5184 breynolds@justicetoday.com
No Logo Stanley V Kensic, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
v.
No Logo Beverly Enterprises, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hardin, Jesson & Terry - Fort Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirkman T. Dougherty +1 479 452 2200 kdougherty@hardinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley D. Jesson +1 479 452 2200 jesson@hardinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rex M Terry +1 479 452 2200 +1 479 452 9097 terry@hardinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul H. Dawes +1 650 328 4600
No Logo David R Devereaux, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hardin, Jesson & Terry - Fort Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirkman T. Dougherty +1 479 452 2200 kdougherty@hardinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley D. Jesson +1 479 452 2200 jesson@hardinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rex M Terry +1 479 452 2200 +1 479 452 9097 terry@hardinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul H. Dawes +1 650 328 4600
No Logo Ernst & Young, LLP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ernst & Young, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bruce Matthew Cormier +1 202 327 7603

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Anderson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David M. Powell +1 501 372 0800 +1 501 372 6453 dmpowell@williamsanderson.com
No Logo Jeffrey P Freimark, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hardin, Jesson & Terry - Fort Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirkman T. Dougherty +1 479 452 2200 kdougherty@hardinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley D. Jesson +1 479 452 2200 jesson@hardinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rex M Terry +1 479 452 2200 +1 479 452 9097 terry@hardinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul H. Dawes +1 650 328 4600
No Logo William R Floyd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hardin, Jesson & Terry - Fort Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirkman T. Dougherty +1 479 452 2200 kdougherty@hardinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley D. Jesson +1 479 452 2200 jesson@hardinlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rex M Terry +1 479 452 2200 +1 479 452 9097 terry@hardinlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul H. Dawes +1 650 328 4600
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: None
JUDGMENT (USCA, 8th Circuit) granting the joint motion for dismissal of the appeal in accordance with the stipulation; dismissing the appeal [55-1] (cc: all counsel) ; appeal record return ddl set for 5/19/04 (mfr) (Entered: 04/19/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None
    DESIGNATION OF RECORD by Plaintiffs that the transcript of the hearing held on 08/28/03 be forwarded to the Court of Appeals to become a part of the record on appeal. (mfr) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: None
      TRANSMITTAL SHEET to USCA, St. Louis, MO re 1 vol transcript of 08/28/03 hearing (mfr) (Entered: 02/05/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: None
        SCHEDULING ORDER from USCA; Appellate Docket Number 04-1275 ; court reporter's transcript ddl set for 3/16/04 (mfr) Modified on 02/06/2004 (Entered: 02/05/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
          TRANSMITTAL LETTER to USCA, St. Louis, MO re certified copies of docket entries, NOA, Order, NOA Supplement form (cc: all counsel of record, Theresa Sawyer-CR) (mfr) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/23/2004, Entered: None
            TRANSMITTAL LETTER to Bruce Cormier, Paul Dawes, Bradley Jesson, Rex M. Terry, Kirkman Dougherty re NOA (cc: pltf's counsel, Theresa Sawyer-Court Reporter) (mfr) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff from District Court decision re: order [54-2] dated 12/23/03 (cc: Rex Terry, Bradley Jesson, Kirkman Dougherty, Paul Dawes, David Powell, Bruce Cormier, Theresa Sawyer-Court Reporter-placed in mail on 01/23/04) (mfr) Modified on 01/23/2004 (Entered: 01/22/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/23/2003, Entered: None
                ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren denying motion for leave to amend plaintiffs consolidated amended class action [43-1] granting motion to dismiss plaintiffs consolidated amended complaint [34-1], granting motion to dismiss [31-1] dismissing case (2:02-cv-02193 2:02-cv-02222) (cc: all counsel) (ct) (Entered: 12/23/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: None
                  ORDER by Magistrate Beverly S. Jones ; Settlement conference cancelled (cc: all counsel) (djm) (Entered: 12/16/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/7/2003, Entered: None
                    ORDER by Magistrate Beverly S. Jones ; Settlement conference set for 1/8/04 11:00 (cc: all counsel) (djm) (Entered: 11/07/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: None
                      REPLY by plaintiff Stanley V Kensic, plaintiff David Chiu, plaintiff Columbia Partners, plaintiff Ernest Baer to response to motion for leave to amend plaintiffs consolidated amended class action [43-1] (sh) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/18/2003, Entered: None
                        ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren granting motion for attorney Bruce M. Cormier to appear pro hac vice [46-1] (cc: all counsel) (ct) (Entered: 08/18/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE by defendant Ernst & Young LLP, defendant Jeffrey P Freimark, defendant David R Devereaux, defendant William R Floyd, defendant Beverly Ent Inc to motion for leave to amend plaintiffs consolidated amended class action [43-1] (sh) (Entered: 08/15/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE by defendant Ernst & Young LLP to motion for leave to amend plaintiffs consolidated amended class action [43-1] (sh) (Entered: 08/15/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: None
                              ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren granting motion for attorney Bruce M. Powell to appear pro hac vice [46-1] (cc: all counsel) (ct) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/14/2003, Entered: None
                                MOTION by defendant Ernst & Young LLP for attorney Bruce M. Cormier to appear pro hac vice (sh) Modified on 08/15/2003 (Entered: 08/14/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None
                                  ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren allowing defts until 8/15/03 to respond to motion to amend and the motion to amend shall be heard at the court's hearing on 8/28/03 along with defts' motions to dismiss [43-1] , ; In-court hearing scheduled for 8/28/03 (cc: all counsel) (ct) (Entered: 08/04/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM BRIEF by plaintiff David Chiu, plaintiff Columbia Partners, plaintiff Ernest Baer in support of motion for leave to amend plaintiffs consolidated amended class action [43-1] (sh) (Entered: 08/01/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: None
                                      MOTION by plaintiffs David Chiu, Columbia Partners, & Ernest Baer for leave to amend plaintiffs consolidated amended class action (sh) (Entered: 08/01/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of intent to amend plaintiffs consolidated amended class action complaint by plaintiffs Stanley V Kensic, David Chiu, & Columbia Partners, plaintiff Ernest Baer (sh) (Entered: 07/22/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None
                                          ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren granting plaintiff's motion for oral argument [36-1] setting hearing on motion to dismiss plaintiffs consolidated amended complaint [34-1] 9:30 8/28/03, setting hearing on motion to dismiss [31-1] 9:30 8/28/03 to be held in Room 310, Fort Smith (cc: all counsel) (jn) (Entered: 07/18/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None
                                            REPLY by defendant Beverly Ent Inc to response to motion to dismiss plaintiffs consolidated amended complaint [34-1] (sh) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/11/2003, Entered: None
                                              REPLY by defendant Ernst & Young LLP to response to motion to dismiss [31-1] (sh) (Entered: 07/11/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                RESPONSE by plaintiff Charles R Krebs, plaintiff Stanley V Kensic, plaintiff Ernest Baer to motion to dismiss plaintiffs consolidated amended complaint [34-1] (sh) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                  RESPONSE by plaintiff Charles R Krebs, plaintiff Stanley V Kensic, plaintiff Ernest Baer to motion to dismiss [31-1] (sh) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION by plaintiff Ernest Baer for oral argument (sh) (Entered: 06/27/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                      MEMORANDUM BRIEF by defendant Jeffrey P Freimark, defendant David R Devereaux, defendant William R Floyd, defendant Beverly Ent Inc in support of motion to dismiss plaintiffs consolidated amended complaint [34-1] (sh) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION by defendant Jeffrey P Freimark, defendant David R Devereaux, defendant William R Floyd, defendant Beverly Ent Inc to dismiss plaintiffs consolidated amended complaint (sh) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT of David M. Powell regarding motion to dismiss [31-1] (sh) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM BRIEF by defendant Ernst & Young LLP in support of motion to dismiss [31-1] (sh) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION by defendant Ernst & Young LLP to dismiss (sh) (Entered: 05/30/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Columbia Partners; jury demand (sh) (Entered: 04/30/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren giving pltfs until 4/30/03 to file amd and consol complt, giving dfts until 5/30/03 to file motions to dism, giving pltf until 6/27/03 to respond to said motions, giving dfts until 7/11/03 to reply; canceling jt Rule 26(f) Conference previously scheduled for 4/21/03; previous trial setting on 2/2/04 to remain as scheduled (cc: all counsel) (ng) Modified on 03/31/2003 (Entered: 03/28/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren advising that deft has until 4/4/03 to plead to complaints and they are to conduct joint Rule 26(f) conference by 4/21/03 & to provide court the report by 4/28/03. ; Jury trial scheduled for 2/2/04 (cc: all counsel) (ct) (Entered: 03/13/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren allowing Williams and Anderson LLP to enter as attorney for deft Ermst & Young in the palce of Wright Lindsey & Jennings LLP. David M. Powell will continue as attorney(cc: all counsel) (ct) Modified on 03/12/2003 (Entered: 03/12/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren granting motion to appoint Chiu Plaintiffs Group as lead plaintiff and to approve selection of lead counsel [6-1], granting motion to consolidate cases 02-2190, 02-2193 & 02-2222 and to be appointed lead plaintiff for approval of lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel [3-1] 2:02-cv-2190 with member cases 2:02-cv-2193, 2:02-cv-2222 (cc: all counsel) (ct) (Entered: 03/10/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL memorandum of law by movant David Chiu re motion to appoint Chiu Plaintiffs Group as lead plaintiff and to approve selection of lead counsel [6-1] (sh) (Entered: 02/07/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren granting motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead [23-1] (cc: all counsel) (ct) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION by defendant Jeffrey P Freimark, defendant David R Devereaux, defendant William R Floyd, defendant Beverly Ent Inc to extend time to answer or otherwise plead (ct) (Entered: 01/09/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren granting motion to extend time to answer complaint [21-1] (cc: all counsel) (ct) (Entered: 01/03/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION by defendant Ernst & Young, LLP to extend time to answer complaint (ct) Modified on 01/06/2003 (Entered: 01/03/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                    ORDER by Honorable Jimm L. Hendren granting motion for attorney Paul H. Dawes to appear pro hac vice [19-1] as counsel for defendants Beverly Enterprises, William Floyd, David Devereaux and Jeffrey Freimark (cc: all counsel) (jn) (Entered: 12/30/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION by defendant Beverly Ent Inc for attorney Paul H. Dawes to appear pro hac vice (sh) (Entered: 12/27/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                        CLERK'S ORDER granting defts Ernst & Young, LLP's motion to extend time to answer [17-1] until 1/3/03 (cc: all counsel) (rw) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION/LETTER by defendant Ernst & Young LLP to extend time to answer (rw) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE by defendants Beverly Ent Inc, William R Floyd, David R Devereaux, and Jeffrey P Freimark to motion to appoint Chiu Plaintiffs Group as lead plaintiff and to approve selection of lead counsel [6-1], and motion to consolidate cases 02-2190, 02-2193 & 02-2222 and to be appointed lead plaintiff for approval of lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel [3-1] (mfr) (Entered: 12/13/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS by defendant David R Devereaux ; Notice/Request mailed on 11/14/02 (mfr) (Entered: 12/12/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS by defendant William R Floyd ; Notice/Request mailed on 11/14/02 (mfr) (Entered: 12/12/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS by defendant Jeffrey P Freimark ; Notice/Request mailed on 11/14/02 (mfr) (Entered: 12/12/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS by defendant Beverly Ent Inc ; Notice/Request mailed on 11/14/02 (mfr) (Entered: 12/12/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Ernst & Young LLP on 11/26/02 (mfr) (Entered: 12/12/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ...RESPONSE by movant Columbia Partners to Chiu's motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and to approve selection of lead counsel [6-1] (msj) (Entered: 11/11/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                          ...RESPONSE by movant David Chiu to Columbia Partners' motion to consolidate cases 02-2190, 02-2193 & 02-2222 and to be appointed lead plaintiff for approval of lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel [3-1] (msj) (Entered: 11/01/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Randall K. Pulliam in support of motion to appoint Chiu Plaintiffs Group as lead plaintiff and to approve selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel [6-1] (mfr) (Entered: 11/15/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM BRIEF by movant David Chiu, movant Paul Sullivan in support of motion for appointment as lead plaintiff and to approve selection of lead counsel [6-1] (sh) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION by movant David Chiu, movant Paul Sullivan to appoint Chiu Plaintiffs Group as lead plaintiff and to approve selection of lead counsel (sh) Modified on 11/15/2002 (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Darren J. Check in support of Columbia Partners' motion to consolidate cases 02-2190, 02-2193 & 02-2222 and to be appointed lead plaintiff for approval of lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel [3-1] (sh) Modified on 11/15/2002 (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM BRIEF by movant Columbia Partners in support of motion to consolidate cases 02-2190, 02-2193 & 02-2222 and to be appointed lead plaintiff for approval of lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel [3-1] (sh) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION by movant Columbia Partners to consolidate cases 02-2190, 02-2193 & 02-2222 and to be appointed lead plaintiff for approval of lead plaintiff's selection of lead counsel and liaison counsel (sh) (Entered: 10/16/2002)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MEMO of reassignment to Honorable Jimm L. Hendren (cc: all counsel) (sh) (Entered: 08/19/2002)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT ( 0 Summons(es) issued) (sh) (Entered: 08/16/2002)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 70 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?