Equitas Disability Advocates, v. David Bryant, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 15-7127

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 2, 2017 at 3:19 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4150 - Contract: Overpayment Recovery
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207764907 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
STIPULATION [1586630] filed to dismiss case voluntarily [15-7127] (Rowe, Eric)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207764901 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
    ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1586628] filed by Eric C. Rowe on behalf of Appellant Equitas Disability Advocates, LLC. [15-7127] (Rowe, Eric)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207755662 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None
      CLERK'S ORDER [1581760] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 12/03/2015. APPELLANT certificate as to parties, etc. due 12/03/2015. APPELLANT statement of issues due 12/03/2015. APPELLANT underlying decision due 12/03/2015. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 12/03/2015. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 12/03/2015. APPELLANT transcript status report due 12/03/2015. APPELLANT procedural motions due 12/03/2015. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 12/18/2015; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties, etc. due 12/03/2015. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 12/03/2015. APPELLEE procedural motions due 12/03/2015. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 12/18/2015 [15-7127]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207755633 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL [1581745] filed by Equitas Disability Advocates, LLC seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:14-cv-01644-RDM. Assigned USCA Case Number [15-7127]
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 90 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?