Gallagher v. Pajevic
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-00410

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 11, 2021 at 10:28 AM DT (4.1 days ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Notice - Other
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Hearing
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Sanctions
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Notice - Other
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None Objection
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/24/2019, Entered: None Default Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/21/2019, Entered: None Notice of Full Consent to Magistrate Judge - Standard
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: None Supplement
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Strike - Rule 56
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/4/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/19/2017, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Supplement
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Continue
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            OPINION AND ORDER: The Court, sua sponte, ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE, on or before 11/9/2017, a supplemental jurisdictional statement that alleges the domicile of Plaintiff and Defendant and presents evidence providing competent proof of the parties' domiciles and of an amount of controversy over $75,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 10/26/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(jss)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Notice Pursuant to LR 41-1 - form will be generated
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              OPINION AND ORDER The Court STRIKES the letter docketed as an Answer DE 14 , filed by Defendant Nada Pajevic. As a result, the Court DENIES as moot the Motion to Deny Defendants Answer DE 16 , filed by Plaintiff Robert Gallagher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 8/24/16. cc: pltf & dft(kjp)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Pro Se Complaint
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?