Kalodner, et al v. Trump, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-08527

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 7:54 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Howard Kalodner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Michael Haber +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 haber@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Levine , +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 687 7230 mlevine@ssbny.com
No Logo Jerry Krim, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Michael Haber +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 haber@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Levine , +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 687 7230 mlevine@ssbny.com
No Logo Joyce Kalodner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Michael Haber +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 haber@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Levine , +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 687 7230 mlevine@ssbny.com
v.
No Logo Don M. Thomas, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Nicholas A. Ribis, Defendant
No Logo Peter M. Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Salomon Brothers Inc., Defendant
No Logo TC/GP, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Trump Casino, Inc., Defendant
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump's Castle Associates"
Trump's Castle Hotel & Casino, Inc. Trump's Castle Hotel & Casino, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wallace B. Askins, Defendant
Trump Hotels and Casino Resorts Holdings, LP Trump Hotels and Casino Resorts Holdings, LP, Nominal Defendant
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc. Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc., Nominal Defendant
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER, the Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to dismiss this action with prejudice pursuant to the same order and final judgment entered in Ziemak on 12/19/01, and to close the case . ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); Copies mailed. (kw) (Entered: 02/04/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
    Notice of reassignment to Judge Gerard E. Lynch . Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Mark Levine, Jeffrey M. Haber, Robert I. Harwood . (jp) (Entered: 09/25/2000)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/1997, Entered: None
      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Salomon Brothers mailed on 12/13/96; Solomon need not respond to the Complaint as provided in paragraph 18 of the Stipulated Pretrial Order No. 1, dated 12/9/96. (ae) Modified on 08/27/1997 (Entered: 08/27/1997)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
        Notice of asg _ to Judge Deborah A. Batts Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Mark Levine, Jeffrey M. Haber, Robert I. Harwood . (sc) (Entered: 12/04/1996)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: None
          Related Case Statement with 96 CIV 7820. (ba) (Entered: 11/18/1996)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/13/1996, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT filed; Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c); FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 274856 (ba) (Entered: 11/18/1996)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 205 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?