CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. barnesandnoble.com, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01727

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 18, 2017 at 7:55 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Barnesandnoble.com LLC, Defendant
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 12/15/2015. (ch, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Unknown Document Type
    Agreed MOTION to Dismiss by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tadlock, Charles)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Smiley, Keith)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Harvey, Jr on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Harvey, John)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
            SUMMONS Issued as to barnesandnoble.com, LLC. (ch, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/9/15. (ch, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                  COMPLAINT against barnesandnoble.com, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5475240.), filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 51 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?