CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Buy.com Inc. d/b/a Rakuten.com
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01730

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 11, 2017 at 5:30 PM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
No Logo Buy.com Inc. d/b/a Rakuten.com, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 250

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder ssumitani@stetinalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder wbrucker@stetinalaw.com
v.
No Logo Buy.com Inc. d/b/a Rakuten.com, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 250

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder wbrucker@stetinalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder ssumitani@stetinalaw.com
No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
  Entries (155) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/11/2017, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/29/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Mediator
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Mediator
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/15/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/8/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/10/2016, Entered: None Stay
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/1/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Substitute Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Substitute Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Answer to Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 118 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?