CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Groupon, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01735

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 11:33 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
Groupon, Inc. Groupon, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall Gerstein & Borun LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Duston +1 312 474 6300 tduston@marshallip.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tron Fu +1 312 474 6300 +1 312 474 0448 tfu@marshallip.com
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?