CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Lowe's Home Centers, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01737

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 12:48 AM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Lowe's Home Centers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael A. Oakes +1 202 955 1500 moakes@hunton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven L Wood +1 202 955 1500 +1 202 778 2201 swood@hunton.com
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      CONSOLIDATION ORDER - The above-captioned cases are hereby ORDERED to be CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE, Cause No. 2:15-cv-01730. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in the LEAD CASE., Cases associated.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/06/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER ADOPTING 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Denying Without Prejudice to re-urging 11 MOTION to Dismiss Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/28/2016. (sm, ) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 48 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?