CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Macys.com, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01738

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 11:17 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Macys.com, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by THE WEBB LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED kbaldaufjr@webblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James J. Bosco +1 412 471 8815 +1 412 471 4094 Jbosco@webblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel H. Brean +1 412 471 8815 +1 412 471 4094 dbrean@webblaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony W Brooks +1 412 471 8815 +1 412 471 4094 abrooks@webblaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/16/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Denying Without Prejudice 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Macys.com, Inc... Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/28/2016. (sm, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Readiness for Scheduling Conference by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Macys.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldauf, Kent)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC for Macys.com, Inc.. (nkl, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Macys.com, Inc.( Bosco, James)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/23/2016, Entered: 1/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony W Brooks on behalf of Macys.com, Inc. (Brooks, Anthony)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/23/2016, Entered: 1/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James J Bosco, Jr on behalf of Macys.com, Inc. (Bosco, James)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kent E Baldauf, Jr on behalf of Macys.com, Inc. (Baldauf, Kent)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Macys.com, Inc.( Brean, Daniel)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 11/12/2015. (ch, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Bryan Smiley on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Smiley, Keith)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John J Harvey, Jr on behalf of CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Harvey, John)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: 11/11/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC (Tadlock, Charles)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Macys.com, Inc. c/o Corporation Service Company. (nkl, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Tadlock, Charles)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: 11/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                            COMPLAINT against Macys.com, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5475461.), filed by CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tadlock, Charles)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 75 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?