CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Sears Holdings Management Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01742

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 11:39 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Kmart Corporation, Defendant
No Logo MyGofer LLC, Defendant
No Logo Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Defendant
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?