CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Shutterfly, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01743

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 1, 2017 at 1:45 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Shutterfly, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 54 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?