CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. The Home Depot U.S.A. Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01747

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 9:07 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Homer Tlc, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas George Papastavros +1 617 406 6019 +1 617 406 6119 nickpapastavros@dlapiper.com
No Logo The Home Depot U.S.A. Inc., Defendant
The Home Depot, Inc. The Home Depot, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nicholas George Papastavros +1 617 406 6019 +1 617 406 6119 nickpapastavros@dlapiper.com
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/11/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 133 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?