Jeffrey Pye, et al v. Fidlty Natl Prop & Cslty Ins
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 14-40135

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 1:49 PM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3150 - Overpayments & Enforcement of Judgments
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503263248 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None
REVISED PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [8053932-2] [14-40135] (JMA)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503262875 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
    JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [14-40135] (JMA)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503262839 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [14-40135 Affirmed in Part, Reversed in Part, and Rendered ] Judge: EGJ , Judge: SAH , Judge: GJC Mandate pull date is 11/30/2015 [14-40135] (JMA)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502957368 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None
        CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 04/27/2015. [14-40135] (GAM)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502911515 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
          CROSS APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0. XA/Pet Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/27/2015 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Jeffrey M. Pye and Theresa Pye. [14-40135] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: CROSS APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Mr. Jeffrey M. Pye and Ms. Theresa Pye Date of service: 01/22/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: DeJean, Nielsen, Treas; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: Mayo [14-40135] (Martin L. Mayo )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502889830 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
            CROSS APPELLEE 'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0. XE/Res Brief deadline satisfied. XA/Pet's Reply Brief due on 01/22/2015 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Jeffrey M. Pye and Theresa Pye. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/20/2015 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. [14-40135]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company and Opposition Brief to Cross-Appellants' Brief Date of service: 01/05/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: DeJean, Nielsen, Treas; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: Mayo [14-40135] (William Ross DeJean )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502859764 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
              RECORD EXCERPTS MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellees Cross-Appellants Mr. Jeffrey M. Pye and Ms. Theresa Pye in 14-40135 [7789824-2]. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 12/10/2014 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Jeffrey M. Pye and Theresa Pye. [14-40135] (RJd)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502856637 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None
                RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require a certificate of service. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 12/17/2014 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Jeffrey M. Pye and Theresa Pye [14-40135] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellees Cross-Appellants Mr. Jeffrey M. Pye and Ms. Theresa Pye. Date of service: 12/03/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: DeJean, Nielsen, Treas; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: Mayo [14-40135] (Martin L. Mayo )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502855452 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                  DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the record excerpts received from Appellees Cross-Appellants Mr. Jeffrey M. Pye and Ms. Theresa Pye because must it be filed seperately from brief. [14-40135] (SDH)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502853268 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None
                    CROSS APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 XA/Pet Brief deadline satisfied. XE/Res's Brief due on 01/05/2015 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/08/2014 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Jeffrey M. Pye and Theresa Pye. [14-40135]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: CROSS APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Jeffrey M. Pye and Ms. Theresa Pye. Date of service: 12/01/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: DeJean, Nielsen, Treas; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: Mayo ; [14-40135] (Martin L. Mayo )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502833901 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                      CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file cross appellant's brief filed by Appellees Cross-Appellants Mr. Jeffrey M. Pye and Ms. Theresa Pye [7774289-2] XA/Pet Brief deadline updated to 12/01/2014 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Jeffrey M. Pye and Theresa Pye. [14-40135] (JMW)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502833326 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                        UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Cross-Appellants Mr. Jeffrey M. Pye and Ms. Theresa Pye to extend the time to file brief [7726665-2] filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company in 14-40135 until 12/01/2014 at 11:59 pm [7774289-2]. Date of service: 11/11/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: DeJean, Nielsen, Treas; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: Mayo [14-40135] (Martin L. Mayo )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502765353 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: None
                          BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company in 14-40135 [7726665-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/16/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. [14-40135] (RJd)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502763949 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                            RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Date of service: 09/10/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: DeJean, Nielsen, Treas; Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: Mayo [14-40135] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 09/15/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. [14-40135] (William Ross DeJean )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502763928 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None
                              APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Date of service: 09/10/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: DeJean, Nielsen, Treas; US mail - Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: Mayo [14-40135] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires the proper citations to the record. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0. A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. XA/Pet's Brief due on 10/14/2014 for Appellees Cross-Appellants Jeffrey M. Pye and Theresa Pye.. Sufficient Brief due on 09/24/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. [14-40135] (William Ross DeJean )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502757983 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company [7722208-2] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 09/10/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. [14-40135] (ADB)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502757567 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None
                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company to extend time to file brief as appellant until 09/10/2014 at 05:00 pm [7722208-2]. Date of service: 09/04/2014 via email - Attorney for Appellants Cross-Appellees: DeJean, Nielsen, Treas; US mail - Attorney for Appellee Cross-Appellant: Mayo [14-40135] (William Ross DeJean )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502688670 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                    Attorney Mr. William Truman Treas, Esq. for Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: Counsel failed to complete the lower portion of the form. [14-40135] (LBM)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502688631 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                      Attorney Mr. Gerald Joseph Nielsen, Esq. for Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company is advised to resubmit appearance form. Reason: Counsel failed to complete the lower portion of the form. [14-40135] (LBM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502680094 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: None
                                        BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/06/2014 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company. [14-40135] (MRB)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502611776 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None
                                          DISCOUNT OF 10% invoked. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Cathy Carnew. To avoid further action the transcript must be filed by 05/19/2014. Transcript deadline updated to 05/19/2014 for Cathy Carnew, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date updated to 05/19/2014 for Cathy Carnew, Court Reporter [14-40135] (JMW)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502588338 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
                                            CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to complete transcript filed by Ms. Cathy Carnew [7603279-2] Court Reporter Discount Date updated to 04/17/2014 for Cathy Carnew, Court Reporter. Transcript deadline updated to 04/17/2014 for Cathy Carnew, Court Reporter. [14-40135] (JMW)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502585109 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                              MOTION OF COURT REPORTER filed by Ms. Cathy Carnew to extend time to complete transcript until 04/17/2014 [7603279-2].. [14-40135] (JMW)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502569991 Filed: 3/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                ACKNOWLEDGEMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Cathy Carnew, Est. Completion Dt: 03/30/2014, Est. No.of Pgs: 660, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 02/28/2014, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 03/31/2014, Proceeding Type and Date: Trial 01/09/2014 - 01/10/2014. Transcript due on 03/31/2014 for Cathy Carnew, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date is 03/31/2014 for Cathy Carnew, Court Reporter [14-40135] (JMW)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502560876 Filed: 3/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NO COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGEMENT RECEIVED for Ms. Cathy Carnew. Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Cathy Carnew, Dt. Ct. Rprt. Time Begins: 02/25/2014. Transcript deadlines created - Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled. Transcript due on 03/27/2014 for Cathy Carnew, Court Reporter. Court Reporter Discount Date is 03/27/2014 for Cathy Carnew, Court Reporter [14-40135] (JMW)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502559084 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                    INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process (as to cross-appeal docketed 3/10/14). [7585441-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [14-40135] (RJd)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502555125 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                      CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [7582798-2] Parties updated: Appellant Cross-Appellee Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Appellees Cross-Appellants Jeffrey M. Pye and Theresa Pye in 14-40135. NOA filed on 03/04/2014 by Appellees Cross-Appellants Mr. Jeffrey M. Pye and Ms. Theresa Pye. [7582798-1] [14-40135] (CAG)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502543492 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                        ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company for the Court to process. [14-40135] (William Ross DeJean )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502538062 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
                                                          INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7571422-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 03/07/2014 for Appellant Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company [14-40135] (RJd)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00502532147 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                            PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company [14-40135] (BCL)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?