League of Minnesota Cities Insurance Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:08-cv-05147
District Judge John R. Tunheim, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 5:54 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo League of Minnesota Cities Insurance Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford M Greene +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 cgreene@greeneespel.com
No Logo Minnesota Counties Insurance Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanette M Bazis +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 jbazis@greeneespel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clifford M Greene +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 cgreene@greeneespel.com
v.
No Logo John Does I-V, Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Day Runner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Yucca Uranium Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Zelle, Hofmann, Voelbel, Mason & Gette LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence T Hofmann +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 lhofmann@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan F Mack +1 612 339 2020 +1 612 336 9100 jmack@zelle.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rory D Zamansky +1 612 359 4280 +1 612 336 9100 rzamansky@zelle.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on August 27, 2009. (HAM) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., League of Minnesota Cities Insurance Trust, Minnesota Counties Insurance Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) Modified filers on 8/28/2009 (jz). (Entered: 08/27/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2009, Discovery due by 12/1/2009, Motions (non-disp) due 4/1/2010, Motions (disp) due by 6/1/2010, Ready for trial due by 7/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 6/15/09. (kt) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/8/2009, Entered: None
        STIPULATION TO AMEND PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by League of Minnesota Cities Insurance Trust, Minnesota Counties Insurance Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) Modified filers on 6/9/2009 (jz). (Entered: 06/08/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/12/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 4/16/09. (kt) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
            STIPULATION re 13 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings (Amend Pretrial Scheduling Order) by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) Modified text and filers on 4/15/2009 (jdf). (Entered: 04/15/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 2/25/09. (jam) (Entered: 02/25/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None
                STIPULATION for Protective Order and PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by League of Minnesota Cities Insurance Trust, Minnesota Counties Insurance Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., John Does I-V. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service - Stipulated Protective Order)(Bazis, Jeanette) Modified text on 2/25/2009 (jz). (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/1/2009, Discovery due by 9/1/2009, Motions (non-disp) due 1/1/2010, Motions (disp) due by 3/1/2010, Ready for trial due by 4/1/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 1/13/09. (jam) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan: Pretrial Conference held on 1/13/2009. Scheduling order to be issued. (kt) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                      STIPULATION on Filing of Amended Answer by both parties. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mack, Jonathan) Modified on 1/9/2009 (MMP). Modified on 1/9/2009 (MMP). (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                        AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mack, Jonathan) Modified on 1/7/2009 (jz). (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by League of Minnesota Cities Insurance Trust, Minnesota Counties Insurance Trust, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., John Does I-V. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2009 09:45 AM in Chambers Hearing before Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 11/17/08. (jam) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2008: # 1 Consent Form) . Modified on 11/17/2008 (jam). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Mack, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., John Does I-V, filed by League of Minnesota Cities Insurance Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit E, Part 2, # 7 Exhibit E, Part 3, # 8 Exhibit E, Part 4, # 9 Certificate of Service) (Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None
                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. of Wells Fargo & Co. as corporate parent and/or publicly held company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mack, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER that the time for defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including October 30, 2008. Signed by Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan on 9/29/08. (jam) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None
                                      STIPULATION ON EXTENSION OF TIME by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., League of Minnesota Cities Insurance Trust. (Mack, Jonathan) Modified on 9/30/2008 (jz). (Entered: 09/29/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by League of Minnesota Cities Insurance Trust. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 9/10/2008, answer due 9/30/2008; John Does I-V served on 9/10/2008, answer due 9/30/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service-Summons)(Bazis, Jeanette) (Entered: 09/16/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., John Does I-V, filed by League of Minnesota Cities Insurance Trust. (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4026759) Assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Securities List and referred to Magistrate Judge Arthur J. Boylan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C Part 2, # 5 Exhibit C Part 3, # 6 Exhibit C Part 4, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet) (akl) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 128 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?