Banks v. New York City
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-09357
District Judge Lorna G. Schofield, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 3:03 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jessica Torres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freund, Christian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Lichtmacher +1 212 922 9066 +1 212 922 9077 empirestatt@aol.com
No Logo Johnny Banks, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freund, Christian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Lichtmacher +1 212 922 9066 +1 212 922 9077 empirestatt@aol.com
No Logo Robbin Lynn Purvis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Freund, Christian

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred Lichtmacher +1 212 922 9066 +1 212 922 9077 empirestatt@aol.com
v.
No Logo Lt. Hennessy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lsu Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Alice Macfarlane +1 562 201 7208 katmacfarlane@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry K. Myrvold +1 212 788 9391 +1 212 788 9776 bmyrvold@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elissa Beth Jacobs +1 212 341 9892 +1 212 788 9776 ejacobs@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "New York City"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Lsu Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Alice Macfarlane +1 562 201 7208 katmacfarlane@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry K. Myrvold +1 212 788 9391 +1 212 788 9776 bmyrvold@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elissa Beth Jacobs +1 212 341 9892 +1 212 788 9776 ejacobs@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian G Maxey +1 206 733 9001 +1 206 684 8284 brian.maxey@seattle.gov
No Logo Police Officer Aaron Krulik, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lsu Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Alice Macfarlane +1 562 201 7208 katmacfarlane@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry K. Myrvold +1 212 788 9391 +1 212 788 9776 bmyrvold@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elissa Beth Jacobs +1 212 341 9892 +1 212 788 9776 ejacobs@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Sgt. Shumon Mahbub, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lsu Law Center

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Alice Macfarlane +1 562 201 7208 katmacfarlane@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Department Of Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry K. Myrvold +1 212 788 9391 +1 212 788 9776 bmyrvold@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elissa Beth Jacobs +1 212 341 9892 +1 212 788 9776 ejacobs@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Unidentified Correction Officers, Defendant
No Logo Unidentified Police Officers, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (90) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's supplemental motion for summary judgment is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/17/2017) (kgo)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      OPINION AND ORDER re: 90 MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, Hennessy, New York City. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Estate's federal false arrest claim and state false imprisonment claim are dismissed against all Defendants, and its state claims for negligence and wrongful death are dismissed against the Individual Defendants. The Court retains supplemental jurisdiction over the negligence and wrongful death claims as asserted against the City. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the motion at Docket No. 90. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/11/2016) (kgo)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 87 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
        THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 86 Amended Complaint, against Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City, Unidentified Correction Officers, Unidentified Police Officers with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jessica Torres. Related document: 86 Amended Complaint, filed by Jessica Torres.(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 85 Amended Complaint, against Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City, Unidentified Correction Officers, Unidentified Police Officers with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jessica Torres. Related document: 85 Amended Complaint, filed by Jessica Torres.(Lichtmacher, Fred) Modified on 10/13/2015 (moh). (Entered: 10/09/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 23 Amended Complaint, against Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City, Unidentified Correction Officers, Unidentified Police Officers with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jessica Torres. Related document: 23 Amended Complaint, filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Lichtmacher, Fred) Modified on 10/9/2015 (moh). (Entered: 10/08/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the application is granted, and Defendants' brief shall be filed by November 20, 2015; any response from Plaintiff shall be filed by December 18, 2015; any reply from Defendants shall be filed by January 8, 2016. It is further ORDERED that the Third Amended Complaint shall be limited to the substitution of the named Plaintiff. It is further ORDERED that the previously filed answers to the Second Amended Complaint, filed at Docket Nos. 29-31, shall be deemed to respond to the Third Amended Complaint. It is further ORDERED that the Third Amended Complaint shall be filed no later than October 13, 2015. (As further set forth in this Order.) Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2015. Motions due by 11/20/2015. Responses due by 12/18/2015 Replies due by 1/8/2016. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/7/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elissa B. Jacobs dated October 6, 2015 re: joint proposed summary judgment briefing schedule. Document filed by Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City.(Jacobs, Elissa) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 76 Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to amend the Complaint is granted, and Plaintiff may file such Complaint naming a single Plaintiff, Jessica Torres on behalf of the Estate of Edwin Junior Carrington, and omitting Johnny Banks. Plaintiff Johnny Banks is dismissed from this case. Plaintiff shall file a letter request concurrent with the filing of the Complaint seeking amendment of the caption and the docket sheet reflecting the sole new plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/30/2015) (spo) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elissa B. Jacobs dated September 25, 2015 re: no opposition to plaintiff's motion to amend. Document filed by Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City.(Jacobs, Elissa) (Entered: 10/01/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE to Motion re: 76 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint. . Document filed by Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City. (Jacobs, Elissa) Modified on 9/30/2015 (db). (Entered: 09/25/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: WHEREAS, by stipulation and partial order of dismissal received by Chambers on September 17, 2015, the parties stipulated and agreed that the above-referenced action be dismissed with prejudice, but requested that the Court maintain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the terms of the settlement agreement, it is hereby ORDERED that, if the parties wish the Court to retain jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement, the parties shall place the terms of the agreement on the public record in accordance with Individual Rule I.C.4 by September 28, 2015. The parties may either provide a copy of the agreement for the Court to endorse or include the terms of their settlement agreement in their stipulation of settlement and dismissal. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/21/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Fred Lichtmacher in Support re: 76 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint.. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. (Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 76 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint. . Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letters of Administration, # 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                              FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct the Complaint. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. Return Date set for 10/2/2015 at 09:30 AM.(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 73 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct . . Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letters of Administration and Decree, # 2 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Complaint)(Lichtmacher, Fred) Modified on 8/31/2015 (ldi). (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Fred Lichtmacher in Support re: 73 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct .. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. (Lichtmacher, Fred) Modified on 8/31/2015 (ldi). (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct . Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. Return Date set for 10/2/2015 at 09:30 AM.(Lichtmacher, Fred) Modified on 8/31/2015 (ldi). (Entered: 08/28/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER: WHEREAS, the parties appeared for a status conference on July 30, 2015, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file any motion to amend no later than August 28, 2015. Defendants' response, if any, shall be filed no later than September 25, 2015. Any reply shall be filed no later than October 2, 2015. The parties shall comply with the Court's Individual Rules regarding page limits, exhibits and courtesy copies. It is further ORDERED that within two business days of the resolution of the motion to amend, the parties shall file a proposed briefing schedule for Defendants' anticipated motion for summary judgment. Any ruling on the need for an economic expert is deferred to after resolution of the summary judgment motion. Motions due by 8/28/2015. Responses due by 9/25/2015 Replies due by 10/2/2015. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/31/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elissa B. Jacobs dated July 23, 2015 re: joint pre-conference letter. Document filed by Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Previously filed pre-motion conference request)(Jacobs, Elissa) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting 69 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 16, 2015, is hereby adjourned to July 30, 2015, at 11:40 a.m. The parties shall file the status letter as described in the order at Dkt. No. 67 no later than July 23, 2015.( Initial Conference set for 7/30/2015 at 11:40 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lorna G. Schofield)(Text Only Order) (Schofield, Lorna) (Entered: 07/09/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elissa B. Jacobs dated July 8, 2015., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File status report addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Elissa B. Jacobs dated July 8, 2015. Document filed by Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City.(Jacobs, Elissa) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the proceeding in this matter, previously scheduled for July 16, 2015 at 11:30 a.m., shall be rescheduled for July 16, 2015 at 9:45 a.m., due to a conflict in the Court's schedule. Status Conference set for 7/16/2015 at 09:45 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/7/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER: WHEREAS, by letter dated June 29, 2015, Plaintiffs requested that the stay entered in this case on March 19, 2013, be lifted, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs' application is GRANTED. The stay is hereby lifted. It is further ORDERED that no later than July 9, 2015, the parties shall file a joint letter, not to exceed six pages, providing the following information herein in separate paragraphs. It is further ORDERED that all parties shall appear for a status conference on July 16, 2015, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 1106 at the Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/29/2015) (kgo) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fred Lichtmacher dated June 29, 2015 re: Lifting the Stay. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fred Lichtmacher dated 6/4/2015 re: Status. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 06/04/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from The Law Office of Fred Lichtmacher P.C. dated 3/23/2015 re: The Stay. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                        STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 02/18/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                          STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 12/12/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fred Lichtmacher dated 11/17/2014 re: Status Report. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 11/17/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 59 Status Report filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. ENDORSEMENT: On July 8, 2014, the parties were directed to file a joint letter no later than October 8, 2014. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' response, if any, to the issues raised in this letter shall be filed by October 16, 2014. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter in this matter, updating the Court about the status of the Surrogate's Court proceedings, every 30 days from the date of this order. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/10/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                                STATUS REPORT. in Compliance with the Court's Order Dated July 8, 2014 Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Halperin, Steven) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 57 Letter filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file a joint letter advising the Court of the status of the case no later than October 8, 2014. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/8/2014) (kgo) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fred Lichtmacher dated 7/8/2014 re: Status. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 55 Letter filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. ENDORSEMENT: No later than July 8, 2014, the parties shall file a joint letter advising the Court of the status of the action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/9/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from The Law Office of Fred Lichtmacher P.C. dated 4/9/14 re: Status. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 53 Letter, filed by Johnny Banks. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file a joint status letter no later than April 7, 2014. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 1/6/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fred Lichtmacher dated 12/23/2013 re: I was unable to reach adversary counsel, probably due to the holiday season. The Surrogates Court papers have been fully submitted and Plaintiffs are awaiting those papers before applying to the Court to amend to include the new Plaintiff and to proceed with this matter. Document filed by Johnny Banks et al.(cd) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 51 Letter filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall submit a joint status letter no later than December 23, 2013. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/23/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fred Lichtmacher dated September 20, 2013 re: jointly reporting on the status of this matter. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Flamm, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elissa Beth Jacobs on behalf of Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City. (Jacobs, Elissa) (Entered: 09/20/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Fred Lichtmacher dated 6/20/2013 re: Counsel for plaintiffs writes to inform the court that the Surrogate's matter remains pending and shall inform the Court by letter when the Surrogate's matter is resolved. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall submit an additional status letter to the Court on or before September 18, 2013. The parties shall promptly inform the Court if the Surrogate's Court proceeding is resolved prior to September 18, 2013. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/21/2013) (rsh) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Judge J. Paul Oetken is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 03/22/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Fred Lichtmacher dated 3/18/2013 re: Plaintiff's counsel writes to request a stay of proceedings pending resolution of an ongoing, related Surrogate's Court proceeding pending in Queens County. ENDORSEMENT: The requested stay of proceedings (including summary judgment deadline) is hereby granted pending further order provided that (1) the parties shall inform the Court by letter upon the resolution of the Surrogate's Court proceedings, and (2) the parties shall submit a status letter in any event on or before June 20, 2013. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 3/19/2013) (ago) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Katherine A. Macfarlane dated 1/31/13 re: Counsel writes to request that the 2/6/13 pre-motion conference be moved to 11 am. ENDORSEMENT: Conference will be held at 11:00 a.m. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/6/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 2/1/2013) (mro) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Letter addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Fred Lichtmacher dated 1/11/2013 re: Co-counsel writes for the above stated reasons, Plaintiffs intend to defend against Defendants' motion and to ask the Court to retain jurisdiction on Plaintiffs' state law claims. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(js) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge J Paul Oetken from Katherine A. Macfarlane dated 1/7/2013 re: Counsel for defendants request a pre-motion conference regarding defendants' proposed motion for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel shall appear for pre-motion conference on 2/6/2013 at 10:00 a.m. So Ordered. ( Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/6/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/16/2013) (js) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Katherine A. Macfarlane dated 11/19/12 re: Counsel writes to request a 30 day extension o the discovery deadline, from 11/30/12 to 12/31/12 and that the date by which a pre-motion conference letter must be submitted also be advanced by 30 days to 1/7/13. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. ( Discovery due by 12/31/2012.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/20/2012) (mro) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Katherine A. Macfarlane dated 9/4/2012 re: Defendants respectfully request a 45-day extension of the discovery deadline, from September 21, 2012, to November 6, 2012. The parties also respectfully request that the upcoming status conference, currently scheduled for September 27, 2012, remain on calendar. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted., ( Discovery due by 11/6/2012.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 9/7/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J Paul Oetken from Fred Lichtmacher dated 8/28/2012 re: Request that the parties be allowed to produce expert damage reports post dispositive motions. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 8/31/2012) (cd) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Alice MacFarlane on behalf of Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City (MacFarlane, Katherine) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Barry Myrvoid dated 7/3/2012 re: counsel for defendants respectfully request an adjournment of the July 6, 2012 status conference to a date convenient to the Court anytime between July 9 and July 30, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The July 9 conference is adjourned to July 20, 2012, at noon., ( Status Conference set for 7/20/2012 at 12:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/3/2012) (pl) (Entered: 07/03/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: Counsel for the parties in this case shall appear for a status conference on July 6, 2012, at 11:15 AM at the United States Court House, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, in Courtroom 15D. ( Status Conference set for 7/6/2012 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/15/2012) (mro) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Fred Lichtmacher dated 12/19/2011 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs request a 4 month enlargement of the fact and expert discovery. ENDORSEMENT: A four-month enlargement of time for fact and expert discovery is hereby granted. This will be the final extension barring truly exceptional circumstances. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/20/2011) (ft) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                REVISED CIVIL SCHEDULING ORDER: All Discovery due by 2/28/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 1/31/2012. Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2012. Motions in Limine or Motions to Bifurcate due by 1/31/2012. The parties shall be ready for trial on 48 hours notice on or after 3/23/2012. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 7/6/2011) (ab) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Fred Lichtmacher dated 6/29/2011 re: request a 6 month enlargement of the fact and expert discovery. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. No further extensions without an affidavit showing very good cause. The parties should submit a revised scheduling order by 7/8/2011. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/29/2011) (jar) (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    REVISED CIVIL SCHEDULING ORDER: that, Except for good cause shown, all discovery, including expert discovery, shall be commenced in time to be completed by 6/30/2011. Dispositive motions, if any, are to be completed by 7/29/11. Unless dispositive motions are filed, a joint pretrial order, together with any motions in limine or motions to bifurcate, shall be submitted by 8/26/2011. The parties shall be ready for trial on 48 hours notice on or after 9/9/2011. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/9/11) (pl) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Barry Myrvold, dated 3/31/2011, re: Counsel for the defendants The City of New York, Lieutenant Patrick Hennessy, Officer Aaron Krulik and Detective Shumom Mahbub writes jointly on behalf of the plaintiffs and defendants, to request a three month enlargement of the discovery schedule from March 31, 2011 to June 30, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The parties should submit a revised scheduling order by April 8, 2011. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/31/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Shumon Mahbub.(Myrvold, Barry) (Entered: 02/15/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Hennessy, Aaron Krulik.(Myrvold, Barry) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Hennessy, Aaron Krulik.(Myrvold, Barry) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Barry Myrvold dated 1/4/2011 re: In Opposition to plaintiffs' application for an order directing The City of New York to disclose the identity of individuals, other than plaintiff, who contracted meningococcal infections around the same time as plaintiff's decedent Edwin Carrington. Document filed by New York City.(mbe) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Fred Lichmacher dated 1/4/2011 re: The scope of the disclosure pursuant to the Court's prior signing of the Unsealing Order and Protective Order. Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(mbe) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER This determination is without prejudice to a renewed application by the plaintiffs if they are able to demonstrate that the medical principles set forth by the defendants (and relied on here) are not accurate. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 1/18/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jmi) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by New York City.(Myrvold, Barry) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City served on 12/23/2010, answer due 1/13/2011. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Robbin Lynn Purvis; Johnny Banks. (Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 12/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 8 Amended Complaint against Hennessy, Aaron Krulik, Shumon Mahbub, New York City, Unidentified Correction Officers, Unidentified Police Officers with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Robbin Lynn Purvis, Johnny Banks. Related document: 8 Amended Complaint filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(rdz) (rdz). (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV from Fred Lichtmachter dated 12/28/10 re: At the conference on December 14,2010, Your Honor stated that you wished to decide the res judicata motion first. We merely request that the Court make express what was implicit in its decision: that Hearst's obligation to respond to Plaintiff's summary judgment motion is stayed pending the Court's decision on Hearst's res judicata motion, and that, in the event a response is required at some future time, the Court will set an appropriate briefing schedule ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/29/10) (djc) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            CONFIDENTIALITY (PROTECTIVE) ORDER: Regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/23/10) (db) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Fred Lichtmacher dated 12/17/2010 re: Requesting permission to file and serve a Second Amended Complaint, dated December 13, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/21/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                UNSEALING ORDER FOR DOCUMENTS SEALED PURSUANT TO C.P.L. § 160.50. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the prison logs identifying all persons who were being held in custody at Queens Central Booking on April 17, 2009 through April 19, 2009, in holding cells with the plaintiffs decedent Edwin Carrington, which were ordered sealed pursuant to N.Y. C.P.L. § 160.50, be unsealed pursuant to N.Y. C.P.L. § 160.50 and made available to Michael Cardozo, Corporation Counsel of the City of New York, or to his authorized representatives for inspection, photocopying, and use in this action and that the logs shall thereafter be sealed; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the use of the above-referenced logs by plaintiffs hereto is restricted to use in this civil rights action, and that copies of all such logs in the possession of the parties hereto shall be destroyed at the conclusion of this case. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James C. Francis on 12/17/10) (rjm) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute-Discovery Dispute. Referred to Magistrate Judge James C. Francis. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/13/10) (mro) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Fred Lichtmacher, dated 12/8/2010, re: Co-counsel for the plaintiff writes: The discovery schedule is expiring and I write to respectfully request an enlargement of three months. This is the first such enlargement requested. Defendants join in this application. This is a complex matter with numerous witnesses. Defendants' new counsel Barry Myrvold first entered his Notice of Appearance on August 20, 2010. Mr. Myrvold credibly indicated he needed time to learn the file. The parties have already conducted extensive document discovery; and depositions are slated to begin on December 17, 2010. The parties respectfully request an enlargement for fact discovery until March 31, 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. No further adjournments except with an affidavit supported by good cause. SO ORDERED. (Discovery due by 3/31/2011) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/8/2010) (lnl) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry K. Myrvold on behalf of New York City (Myrvold, Barry) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brian G. Maxey dated 6/14/2010 re: Requesting that plaintiffs time to amend be extended to August 2, 2010 and that the plaintiffs' request for a discovery conference be tabled pending the defendants' production of discovery this coming Friday. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/15/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kimberly Dorothy Conway on behalf of New York City (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/18/2010. Discovery due by 12/3/2010. Joinder of Parties due by 5/21/2010. Motions due by 1/28/2011., Pretrial Order due by 1/28/2011. Status Report due by 5/21/2010. Ready for Trial by 2/11/2011. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 3/25/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by New York City. Related document: 8 Amended Complaint filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis.(Maxey, Brian) (Entered: 03/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brian G. Maxey dated 2/25/2010 re: Requesting an extension of time until March 24, 2010 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 2/28/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/12/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City served on 2/11/2010, answer due 3/4/2010. Service was accepted by Dimitri Aronov, Process Clerk. Document filed by Johnny Banks; Robbin Lynn Purvis. (Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 02/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven T. Halperin on behalf of Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis (Halperin, Steven) (Entered: 01/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Unidentified Correction Officers, New York City, Unidentified Police Officers.Document filed by Johnny Banks, Robbin Lynn Purvis. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Johnny Banks.(mbe) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: All parties are directed to appear for a pretrial conference, to be held on Monday, February 22, 2010 at 4:30pm in Courtroom 12B, in front of the Honorable John G. Koeltl. All requests for adjournments must be made in writing to the Court. For any further information, please contact the Court at (212) 805-0107. Don Fletcher, Courtroom Case Manager. (db) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, New York City answer due 2/26/2010; Unidentified Police Officers answer due 2/26/2010.( Status Conference set for 3/25/2010 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl.) (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 1/11/10) (djc) (Entered: 01/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Guenther Maxey on behalf of New York City (Maxey, Brian) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2010 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 12B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (tve) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. New York City served on 11/17/2009, answer due 2/5/2010. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana, Docketing clerk. Document filed by Johnny Banks. (Lichtmacher, Fred) (Entered: 12/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Brian G. Maxey dated 12/8/09 re: counsel for Defendant respectfully request that the Court grant the City's application to extend its time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint from December 7, 2009 until February 5, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 12/08/09). (pl) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against New York City, Unidentified Police Officers. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 705463)Document filed by Johnny Banks.(ama) (ama). (Entered: 11/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 149 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?