DISH Network L.L.C. v. Robert Thomas Boshae
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 5:15-cv-02377

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2018 at 3:43 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Set Aside Default
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Reply (Motion related)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/13/2016, Entered: None Set Aside Default
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Abstract of Judgment Issued
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Writ of Execution - Issued
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None For Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Affidavit and Request for Issuance of Writ of Execution
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald, in favor of DISH Network L.L.C., EchoStar Technologies L.L.C., NagraStar LLC against Robert Thomas Boshae: In accordance with the Court's Order Granting Motion for Default Judgme nt (Docket No. 15), and pursuant to Rule 54 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED as follows: 1. Damages Pursuant to 47 U.S.C. ยง 605(e)(3)(C)(i)(II), Plaintiffs DISH Network, LLC, EchoStar Technologi es, LLC, and NagraStar LLC are hereby awarded final judgment against Defendant in the sum of $3,600,000. 2. Permanent Injunction: After receiving actual notice of this Judgment, Defendant and any person acting in active concert or participation with Defendant are hereby permanently enjoined from: (a) manufacturing, importing, offering to the public, providing, or otherwise trafficking in passcodes to the NFPS service, any other code or password used in accessing an IKS server, and any othe r technology or part thereof that is used in circumventing DISH Network's security system or receiving DISH Network programming without authorization; (b) circumventing or assisting others in circumventing the DISH Network security system, or re ceiving or assisting others in receiving DISH Networks satellite signal without authorization; and (c) testing, analyzing, reverse engineering, manipulating, or extracting code, data, or information from DISH Networks satellite receivers, smart cards , satellite stream, or any other part or component of the DISH Network security system. 3. The Court's Jurisdiction: The Court retains jurisdiction over this action for a period of two years for purposes of enforcing this final judgment and permanent injunction. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated). (bm)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None For Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?