Metcalf v. Yale University
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-01696

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 2, 2019 at 5:43 PM DT (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William Metcalf, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Garrison Levin-Epstein Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph D. Garrison +1 203 777 4425 jgarrison@garrisonlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ethan A. Levin-Epstein +1 203 777 4425 elevin-epstein@garrisonlaw.com
v.
Yale University Yale University, Defendant
Unknown Role, Mark Centers Trust
Unknown Role, JBG SMITH Properties
Unknown Role, Douglas Emmett Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Donahue, Durham & Noonan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M. Noonan +1 203 458 9168 +1 203 458 4424 pnoonan@ddnctlaw.com
No Logo Yale University Art Gallery, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 623
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (116) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Objection
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None Settlement Conference
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/20/2019, Entered: None Continue
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Response
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Response
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/14/2019, Entered: None Proposed Verdict Form
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/13/2019, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Proposed Verdict Form
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions/Request to Charge
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Proposed Voir Dire
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Trial Memo
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None Preclude
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 2/5/2019, Entered: None In Limine
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Clarification
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Response
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Clarification
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Order on Sealed Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Continue
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 53 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/27/2017. (Riegel, J.)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Sealed Document
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Sealed Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Seal
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/15/2017. (Chen, C.)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Entered in Error - Duplicate Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2017. Taking under advisement 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by William Metcalf. 22 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Chen, C.) Modified on 2/10/2017 (Gould, K.). (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2017 re 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by William Metcalf. Motion taken under advisement. Total time: 20 minutes(Court Reporter Sharon Montini.) (Gould, K.)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom Two, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge Victor A. Bolden. (Chen, C.) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by William Metcalf. (Garrison, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT Signed By Jason Killheffer filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition re 33 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 34 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. The Scheduling Order is amended to provide that: Defendant's response to Plaintiff's pending Motion to Compel due 1/11/2017; Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's response due 1/26/2017, if he chooses to file such a Reply; Discovery due 6/17/2017; Dispositive Motions Due 7/28/2017; Joint Trial Memorandum due within 30 days of the ruling on dispositive motions, should such motions be filed, or within 30 days after the parties notify one another that dispositive motions will not be filed; Trial Ready Date within 30 days after the submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/28/2016. (Chen, C.) (Entered: 12/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: 12/27/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 24 Scheduling Order,, by William Metcalf.Responses due by 1/17/2017 (Levin-Epstein, Ethan)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Discovery by William Metcalf.Responses due by 1/11/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Attachments)(Garrison, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Discovery Dispute Conference held on 12/6/2016. The parties shall confer and file a proposal regarding a briefing schedule for the Motion to Compel. 40 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Chen, C.) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by William Metcalf (Plaintiff's Submission Regarding Discovery Dispute) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1 & 2)(Garrison, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/6/2016 01:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Once all parties are on the line, Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562. (Chen, C.) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 28 Motion for Conference. A Telephonic Status Conference is therefore scheduled for 12/6/2016, 1:00 PM. Once all parties are on the line, Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/22/2016. (Chen, C.) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: 11/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION for Discovery Conference by William Metcalf. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-6, # 2 Exhibit 7-12)(Levin-Epstein, Ethan)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Metcalf.(Garrison, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/14/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 11, 2016 to Answer 2/10/16 Discovery Requests by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2016; Damages analysis due 6/1/2016; Discovery due by 3/3/2017; Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/17/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Victor A. Bolden; Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2017; Joint Trial Memorandum due within 30 days of the ruling on dispositive motions, should such motions be filed, or within 30 days after the parties notify one another that dispositive motions will not be filed; Trial Ready Date within 30 days after the submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/7/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/7/2016; granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time; APPROVING 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and ADOPTING the proposed case management plan therein as modified on the call. Time: 14 minutes (Court Reporter S. Montini.) (Shin, D.) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until March 31, 2016 to Object or Respond to Defendant's Interrogatories and Request for Production by William Metcalf. (Garrison, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/7/2016 04:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Counsel shall call Chambers at 203-579-5562 after all parties are on the line. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: 1/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Yale University.(Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant is granted a fourteen day extension to answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading by 1/25/2016. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/12/2016. (Shin, D.) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION re 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 10, 2015to Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint filed by William Metcalf. (Garrison, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: 1/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until February 10, 2015to Respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Clerk on 12/10/15. (Gould, K.) (Entered: 12/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time Plead 1 Complaint by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Yale University Art Gallery by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: 12/2/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Metcalf. Yale University served on 11/20/2015, answer due 12/11/2015; Yale University Art Gallery served on 11/20/2015, answer due 12/11/2015. (Garrison, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Yale University. (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M. Noonan on behalf of Yale University (Noonan, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Yale University, Yale University Art Gallery* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ethan A. Levin-Epstein* *Garrison Levin-Epstein Richardson Fitzgerald & Pirrotti PC* *405 Orange St.* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by William Metcalf, 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph D. Garrison on behalf of William Metcalf, 5 Standing Protective Order, 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Ethan A. Levin-Epstein on behalf of William Metcalf, 7 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols, 6 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2015.(Fazekas, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 11/18/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Protocol Form)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Electronic Filing Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/18/2015.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/18/2015.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 2/18/2016. Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2016. Discovery due by 5/19/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2016. Signed by Clerk on 11/18/2015.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Garrison on behalf of William Metcalf (Garrison, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan A. Levin-Epstein on behalf of William Metcalf (Levin-Epstein, Ethan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Yale University, Yale University Art Gallery ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3806472.), filed by William Metcalf.(Levin-Epstein, Ethan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?