Carr v. Authoria, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-13416
District Judge Patti B. Saris, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 12:41 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JEFFREY T CARR, Plaintiff

Represented by Shilepsky Hartley Robb Casey Michon LLP

v.
No Logo Authoria, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hirsch Roberts Weinstein Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Roberts +1 617 348 4300 +1 617 348 4343 sroberts@hrwlawyers.com
No Logo PEOPLEFLUENT HOLDINGS CORP., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hirsch Roberts Weinstein Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Roberts +1 617 348 4300 +1 617 348 4343 sroberts@hrwlawyers.com

Represented by Kauff McGuire & Margolis LLP

No Logo Peoplefluent, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hirsch Roberts Weinstein Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott A. Roberts +1 617 348 4300 +1 617 348 4343 sroberts@hrwlawyers.com

Represented by Kauff McGuire & Margolis LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1330
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT against PEOPLEFLUENT HOLDINGS CORP., PEOPLEFLUENT, INC., Authoria, Inc., filed by JEFFREY T CARR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Kenneth A. Margolis. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
    Assented to MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Kenneth A. Margolis Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5836113 by Authoria, Inc., PEOPLEFLUENT HOLDINGS CORP., PEOPLEFLUENT, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration and Certificate of Kenneth A. Margolis, Esq.)(Roberts, Scott) (Entered: 11/10/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      Chief Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered..... Granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to 11/18/15 as to All Defendants. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 10/27/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to November 18, 2015 to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Authoria, Inc., PEOPLEFLUENT HOLDINGS CORP., PEOPLEFLUENT, INC..(Roberts, Scott) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/22/2015, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott A. Roberts on behalf of Authoria, Inc., PEOPLEFLUENT HOLDINGS CORP., PEOPLEFLUENT, INC. (Roberts, Scott) (Entered: 10/22/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
            Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
              Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Appearance by Harold James Hartley on behalf of JEFFREY T CARR (Hartley, Harold) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Chief Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                    COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5757107 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by JEFFREY T CARR. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Sheet, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Hannon, Patrick) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 1,048 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?