Bergeron v. Ridgewood Electric Power Trust V et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-10622
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 3, 2017 at 5:56 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Paul Bergeron, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nystrom Beckman & Paris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William C. Nystrom +1 617 778 9100 +1 617 778 9110 wnystrom@nbparis.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael G. Paris +1 617 856 8125 +1 617 856 8201 mparis@nbparis.com
v.
No Logo Arbutus Energy Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
No Logo Ridgewood Electric Power Trust V, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
No Logo Ridgewood Energy Holding Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
No Logo Ridgewood Power Growth Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
No Logo Ridgewood Renewable Power, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
No Logo Ridgewood ROC 2003, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
No Logo Ridgewood ROC II 2003, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
No Logo Ridgewood ROC III 2003, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
No Logo Ridgewood ROC IV 2004, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
No Logo Ridgewood U.K. LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
No Logo Robert E. Swanson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Downs Rachlin Martin, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Walter E. Judge, Jr. ,. +1 802 863 2375 +1 802 862 7512 wjudge@drm.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns : MEMORANDUM AND ORDER on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and Defendants' Motion to Consolidate, ENTERED. "...motion to remand allowed."(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None
    STATE COURT Record, filed (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Flaherty, Elaine) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      Opposition re 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ridgewood Renewable Power, LLC, Ridgewood Energy Holding Corp., Robert E. Swanson, Ridgewood U.K. LLC, Ridgewood ROC 2003, LLC, Ridgewood ROC II 2003, LLC, Ridgewood ROC III 2003, LLC, Ridgewood ROC IV 2004, LLC, Ridgewood Electric Power Trust V, Ridgewood Power Growth Fund. (Judge, Walter) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE by Ridgewood Renewable Power, LLC, Ridgewood Energy Holding Corp., Robert E. Swanson, Ridgewood U.K. LLC, Ridgewood ROC 2003, LLC, Ridgewood ROC II 2003, LLC, Ridgewood ROC III 2003, LLC, Ridgewood ROC IV 2004, LLC, Ridgewood Electric Power Trust V, Ridgewood Power Growth Fund of Filing Papers with Clerk's Office (certified copies of state court record) (Judge, Walter) (Entered: 04/14/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in Support re 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Paul Bergeron. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter)(Paris, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
            MOTION to Remand to State Court by Paul Bergeron.(Paris, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Suffolk Superior, case number 07-1205 BLS1. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) EXHIBIT NOT SCANNED BECAUSE OF SIZE.(Folan, Karen) (Entered: 03/30/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 98 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?