CryptoPeak Solutions, LLC v. Ally Financial Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-01787

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 6, 2018 at 11:17 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cryptopeak Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tadlock Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J Harvey, Jr. +1 214 906 8783 john@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 214 785 6014 keith@tadlocklawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles Craig Tadlock +1 214 785 6014 craig@tadlocklawfirm.com
v.
No Logo Ally Bank, Defendant
No Logo Ally Financial Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit Patent
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Denying Without Prejudice 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Ally Financial Inc., Ally Bank.. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 9/28/2016. (sm, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Sur-Reply to Reply to Response to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Notice of Readiness for Scheduling Conference
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/10/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Designation of Attorney in Charge
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?