DAUGHERTY et al v. SHEER et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-02034

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 14, 2020 at 6:30 PM DT (10.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Labmd, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bailey and Ehrenberg PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Herbert Ehrenberg +1 202 331 1331 +1 202 318 7071 jhe@becounsel.com
No Logo Michael J Daugherty, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bailey and Ehrenberg PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Herbert Ehrenberg +1 202 331 1331 +1 202 318 7071 jhe@becounsel.com
No Logo MICHAEL J. DAUGHERTY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bailey and Ehrenberg PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Herbert Ehrenberg +1 202 331 1331 +1 202 318 7071 jhe@becounsel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter Karl Tompa +1 202 331 4209 +1 202 318 7071 pkt@becounsel.com
v.
No Logo Alain H Sheer, Defendant
No Logo ALAIN H. SHEER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean Marie Cunningham +1 202 616 4164 +1 202 616 4314 jean.cunningham@usdoj.gov
No Logo Carl H Settlemyer, Defendant
No Logo CARL H. SETTLEMYER, III, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean Marie Cunningham +1 202 616 4164 +1 202 616 4314 jean.cunningham@usdoj.gov
No Logo DOES 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Ruth T Yodaiken, Defendant
No Logo RUTH T. YODAIKEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jean Marie Cunningham +1 202 616 4164 +1 202 616 4314 jean.cunningham@usdoj.gov
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Surreply
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Entry of Final Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by CARL H. SETTLEMYER, III, ALAIN H. SHEER, RUTH T. YODAIKEN. (Cunningham, Jean) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MICHAEL J. DAUGHERTY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tompa, Peter) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/20/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?