USA v. Tuzman et al
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00536-PGG

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 15, 2017 at 7:40 PM EST (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space A. Damian Williams +1 212 637 2290 damian.williams@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea Michelle Griswold +1 212 637 1205 +1 212 637 2443 andrea.griswold@usdoj.gov
Space Edward Young Kyu Kim +1 212 637 2401 +1 212 637 2527 edward.kim@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua Arditi Naftalis +1 212 637 2310 +1 212 637 2527 joshua.naftalis@usdoj.gov
No Logo Tuzman, Kaleil Isaza, Defendant (1)
Officially listed as "Kaleil Isaza Tuzman"

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amer Shahid Ahmed +1 212 351 2427 +1 212 351 6227 aahmed@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Reed Michael Brodsky +1 212 351 5334 +1 212 351 6235 rbrodsky@gibsondunn.com
Space David Francis Crowley-Buck +1 212 351 2633 dcrowleybuck@gibsondunn.com
Space Justine Marie Goeke +1 212 351 5372 jgoeke@gibsondunn.com
Space Marcellus A McRae +1 213 229 7675 mmcrae@gibsondunn.com
Space David Philip Salant +1 212 351 2486 dsalant@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Jeffrey Ilan Salomon +1 212 351 3971 +1 212 351 6371 jsalomon@winston.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Avi Weitzman +1 212 351 2465 aweitzman@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ilene B. Jaroslaw +1 917 763 9852 ijaroslaw@hnrklaw.com

Represented by Pedley & Millin, Pllc

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Foley Square
Filed 8/12/2015
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 2
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
1578J.F MANIPULATIVE AND DECEPTIVE DEVICES SECURITIES FRAUD)
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F ATTEMPT AND CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD; MAKE FALSE STATEMENTS IN ANNUAL AND QUARTERLY SEC REPORTS AND MAKE FALSE STATEMENTS TO AUDITORS)
Count 6
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
1578J.F MANIPULATIVE AND DECEPTIVE DEVICES (SECURITIES FRAUD)
Count 8-9
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78M.F
Offense Level 4
1578M.F PERIODICAL AND OTHER REPORTS (FALSE STATEMENTS IN ANNUAL AND QUARTERLY SEC REPORTS)
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 2s
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
1578J.F MANIPULATIVE AND DECEPTIVE DEVICES (SECURITIES FRAUD)
Count 3s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F ATTEMPT AND CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 4s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 5s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD, MAKE FALSE STATEMENTS IN ANNUAL AND QUARTERLY SEC REPORTS AND MAKE FALSE STATEMENTS TO AUDITORS
Count 6s
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
1578J.F MANIPULATIVE AND DECEPTIVE DEVICES (SECURITIES FRAUD)
Count 7s-8s
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78M.F
Offense Level 4
1578M.F PERIODICAL AND OTHER REPORTS (FALSE STATEMENTS IN ANNUAL AND QUARTERLY SEC REPORTS)
Count 4ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 5ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F ATTEMPT AND CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 6ss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F ATTEMPT AND CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 4sss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD
Count 5sss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F ATTEMPT AND CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT WIRE FRAUD
Count 6sss
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD, MAKE FALSE STATEMENTS IN SEC REPORTS & MAKE FALSE STATEMENTS TO AUDITORS
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (740) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 607 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: 12/15/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 12/15/2017 re: Requesting the appointment of Curcio counsel and approval to withdraw from the representation . Document filed by Irfan Amanat. (Shellow, Jill)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 606 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 LetterCourt Filing
    LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 12/14/2017 re: Relevance of Proposed Expert Testimony of Prof. Allen Ferrell (Weitzman, Avi)
      LREF
      Legal Document 605 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 14, 2017 re: Omar Amanat's Motion for Judgment of Acquittal . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 604 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 LetterCourt Filing
        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 12/14/2017 re: Dates of Production of Materials Related to Testimony of Dr. Albert Lyter (Weitzman, Avi)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 LetterCourt Filing
          AMENDED LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 12/14/17 re: Chronology of Lyter Disclosures Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 602 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
            MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Robin Smyth on re: [577] Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. Sentencing is adjourned to April 2, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. (Sentencing set for 4/2/2018 at 04:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/11/2017)(ft)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 601 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Stephen E Maiden on re: [576] Letter filed by USA. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. Sentencing is adjourned to April 4, 2018 at 4:00pm. (Sentencing set for 4/4/2018 at 04:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 12/16/2017)(ft)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 600 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 12/14/17 re: Chronology of Lyter Disclosures Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 599 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re [598] MOTION for Acquittal .. (Weitzman, Avi)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 598 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 Motion for Acquittal
                    MOTION for Acquittal . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Weitzman, Avi)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 597 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: 12/14/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                      LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 14, 2017 re: Jury Instructions Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) Modified on 12/14/2017 (ka).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document 596 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                        LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 13, 2017 re: Aiding and Abetting Investment Adviser Fraud Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 595 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                          LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 12, 2017 re: Amanat Exhibits 80, 81, 2008, and 2011 Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 594 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                            LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Dec. 11, 2017 re: government failure to produce evidence Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Weitzman, Avi)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank  Evidentiary Hearing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Evidentiary Hearing as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman held on 12/12/2017. Evidentiary hearing held as to defendant K. Isaza Tuzman only. (jw)
                                LREF
                                Blank  Evidentiary Hearing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Evidentiary Hearing as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman held on 12/12/2017. Evidentiary hearing held as to defendant K. Isaza Tuzman only. (jw)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 12/12/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 12/13/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 12/11/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 12/12/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Jury Trial
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 12/8/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 12/11/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 12/7/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 12/8/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 593 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                          LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 12-3-17 re: Ellington Testimony Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 592 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 12-6-17 re: Dkt Nos. 582, 584 Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 591 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                              LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Dec. 6, 2017 re: joining Dkt. 590, application for ongoing Maiden discovery Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 590 Filed: 12/6/2017, Entered: 12/6/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 6, 2017 re: Maiden Letter to DOJ employee Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Jackson, Randall)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 12/6/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 12/7/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 12/5/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 12/6/17 at 9:30 am (jw)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank  Jury Trial
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 12/4/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 12/5/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 589 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 12-3-17 re: Letter response to DKT 569 Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 588 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                          LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 12/3/2017 re: Admissibility of Unredacted Version of GX 2188-B Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 587 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                            LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 3, 2017 re [579] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 1, 2017 re: Admissibility of Unredacted Version of GX 2188-B .. (Williams, A.)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 586 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Dec. 3, 2017 re: testimony of Mr. Jess Ellington Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 585 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Wiliiams, Andrea M. Griswold, & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 12/3/17 re: Response to 12/1/17 Letter re: Testimony of Peter Carpi Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 584 Filed: 12/3/2017, Entered: 12/3/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 3, 2017 re: Objections to Additional Emails to be Introduced Through Diana Chau . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 583 Filed: 12/2/2017, Entered: 12/2/2017 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                    LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 12/2/2017 re: [579] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 1, 2017 re: Admissibility of Unredacted Version of GX 2188-B .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (GX 2188-A), # (2) Exhibit B (GX 2188-B), # (3) Exhibit C (Transcript Excerpts))(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 582 Filed: 12/2/2017, Entered: 12/2/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated December 2, 2017 re: Objections to Emails to Be Introduced Through Witness Diana Chau . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 581 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 12-1-17 re: Response to DKT 574, 575 Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 580 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Dec. 1, 2017 re: testimony of Mr. Peter Carpi Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 579 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: 12/1/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 1, 2017 re: Admissibility of Unredacted Version of GX 2188-B . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Williams, A.)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 578 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                              LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated November 30, 2017 re: Defendant Kaleil Isaza Tuzman to join in the request filed yesterday by Omar Amanat (Dkt. 574) to preclude the use of certain charts and exhibits (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Robin Smyth addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated November 30, 2017 re: Smyth Sentencing Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 11/30/2017, Entered: 11/30/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Stephen E Maiden addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated November 30, 2017 re: Maiden Sentencing Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 575 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Trial Brief
                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 574 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                      LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 29, 2017 re: Chau Charts Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: 11/29/2017 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S TRIAL BRIEF REGARDING THE ADMISSIBILITY OF EXPERT TESTIMONY OF DR. ALBERT H. LYTER III. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L)(Weitzman, Avi) Modified on 11/29/2017 (ka).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/29/2017, as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat( Jury Trial set for 12/4/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 12/4/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                            NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Notice to Attorney Avi Weitzman to RE-FILE Document [573] Memorandum of Law. Use the event type Trial Brief found under the event list Trial Documents. (ka)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 11/28/17 re: Post-Daubert Hearing Brief re Dr. Albert Lyter Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 571 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER as to Omar Amanat. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Amanat is authorized to spend from 12:00 noon to 9:00 p.m. on Saturdays with his children at his ex-wife's home at 308 West 78th Street in Manhattan. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/28/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 570 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 28, 2017 re: Government's Giglio obligations re False Information in Indictment Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/28/2017. Jury Trial continued to 11/29/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 568 Filed: 11/27/2017, Entered: 11/28/2017 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Defendant Kaleil Tuzman -- the former chief executive officer of KIT digital, Inc. -- is charged with conspiracy to commit securities fraud and wire fraud. (88 Indictment (Dkt. No.198)) A jury has been empaneled, and opening statements and the presentation of evidence began on October 30, 2017. Robin Smyth is the former chief financial officer of KIT digital. (Id. Paragraph 7) The Government claims, inter alia, that Tuzman, Smyth, and others conspired to inflate KIT digital's stock price and to hide its true financial condition from shareholders. Smyth pleaded guilty to conspiracy to commit securities fraud, securities fraud, and three counts of making false statements in KIT digital's SEC filings. (Diet. No. 47) Smyth entered into a cooperation agreement with the Government. His direct testimony has been taken (see Nov. 17, 2017 Trial Tr. at 2625), and he is presently in the middle of cross-examination. (See Nov. 27, 2017 Trial Tr. at 3227) In a November 21, 2017 letter -- submitted after Defendant Tuzman's cross-examination of Smyth had begun -- Tuzman seeks permission to cross-examine Smyth regarding his prior invocations of his Fifth Amendment privilege during a deposition in a state court civil action. (Nov. 21, 2017 Tuzman Ltr.) The Government argues that such questions should not be permitted because they have "little probative value and [a] great risk of unfair prejudice,"(See Footnote 1 on this Memorandum Opinion & Order] (Nov. 24, 2017 Gov't Ltr. at 1) For the reasons stated below, Tuzman will not be permitted to cross-examine Smyth about his invocations of his Fifth Amendment privilege at the civil deposition.... CONCLUSION: For the reasons stated above, Tuzman's application to cross-examine Smyth regarding his invocation of his Fifth Amendment right at a civil deposition is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/27/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/27/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 11/28/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 11/22/2017, Entered: 11/22/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Omar Amanat on re: [565] Letter, filed by Omar Amana to visit with his children on Saturdays, per the Court's prior order...ENDORSEMENT... This matter will be addressed after the trial day on November 27, 2017. The Pretrial Services Officer has identified numerous instances of apparent non compliance. In the meantime, the Pretrial Services Officer's supervision of weekend leave remain in effect. Officer is directed to attend the November 27, 2017 bail review proceeding (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/21/17)(jw)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/22/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 11/27/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 566 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 11.21.17 re: Letter in Response to DKT 565 Letter Motion re Amanat Weekend Request Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Pretrial Memorandum)(Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 565 Filed: 11/21/2017, Entered: 11/21/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 21, 2017 re: Mr. Amanat's Visits to His Children in Manhattan Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/21/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 11/22/17 at 9:30 am (jw)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 564 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: 11/20/2017 Affidavit in Opposition of Motion
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Rick DaSilva in Opposition by Piksel, Inc as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [476] MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION, PUBLICLY FILED WITH REDACTIONS, TO COMPEL PIKSEL TO COMPLY WITH RULE 17 SUBPOENA.. [Supplemental Affidavit in Opposition to Motion to Compel] (Lucks, Steven)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/20/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 11/21/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Daubert Hearing
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Daubert Hearing as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman held on 11/20/2017 (jw)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/17/2017, as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat( Jury Trial set for 11/20/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 11/20/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 16, 2017 re: Potential Suppression Motion re Chris Peavy Identification Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 562 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT denying [236] Motion for Discovery as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1). ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons stated above, Defendant Tuzman's application for discovery and an evidentiary hearing concerning the Government's alleged outrageous conduct is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/16/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 561 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 560 Filed: 11/16/2017, Entered: 11/16/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 559 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: 11/15/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 11/15/17 re: Response to Tuzman's 11/12/17 Letter re Analyst and Investor Witnesses Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Rigas Tr.))(Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/15/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 11/17/17 at 9:30 am. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 558 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Gavin Campion. It is hereby ORDERED that the sentencing in this action currently scheduled for November 15, 2017 is adjourned to February 15, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Sentencing set for 2/15/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/14/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/14/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat held. Jury Trial continued to 11/15/17 at 9:30 am. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 557 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/14/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 11/13/2017 re: Inadmissibility of Statements in Smyth Notebooks Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) GX 2188-A, # (2) GX 2189-A, # (3) GX 2189-C, # (4) GX 2190-A)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 556 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated November 13, 2017 re: Admissibility of Smyth Exhibits Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 555 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 11/13/2017 re: Admissibility of Travel Reimbursement Practices Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A, # (2) Ex. B, # (3) Ex. C)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 554 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 Affidavit in Opposition of Motion
                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Arturo Rodriguez in Opposition by Piksel, Inc as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [476] MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION, PUBLICLY FILED WITH REDACTIONS, TO COMPEL PIKSEL TO COMPLY WITH RULE 17 SUBPOENA.. [submitted pursuant to Court's November 9, 2017 Order] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Lucks, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 553 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: 11/13/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated November 13, 2017 re: Smyth exhibits Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/13/2017. Jury Trial continued to 11/14/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 11/12/2017, Entered: 11/12/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Nov. 12, 2017 re: excluding equity analyst testimony on materiality (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 551 Filed: 11/12/2017, Entered: 11/12/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Nov. 12, 2017 re: calling government agent to impeach government witness (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 550 Filed: 11/12/2017, Entered: 11/12/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 11-12-17 re: Letter Motion Dkt. 549 Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 549 Filed: 11/10/2017, Entered: 11/10/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 10, 2017 re: Request to Call Inspector Atkin Out of Order. Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/10/2017. Jury Trial continued to 11/13/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 548 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 11/9/17 re: Maiden-Tuzman Texts and Uncharged Co-Conspirator Issue Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 547 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated November 9, 2017 re: Response to the Government's Motion to Preclude AX 907 Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 545 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. It is HEREBY ORDERED that Piksel provide the Court with an affidavit or declaration from an individual with personal knowledge of Piksel's records and the search efforts discussed in Piksel's Opposition by Monday, November 13, 2017. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/9/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 544 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [542] LETTER MOTION to respectfully request a temporary modification of the conditions of Irfan Amanat's pretrial release so that he can join his family in Minnesota for some time around Thanksgiving. In general he would like to leave New Jersey on or after Tuesday, November 21 and return on or about November 27, 2017...ENDORSEMENT...The Application is granted. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/9/17) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 543 Filed: 11/9/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 11/9/2017 re: Admissibility of Mr. Isaza Tuzmans Statements In Maiden Text Messages Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/9/2017. Jury trial continued to 11/10/17 at 9:30am (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 542 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017, Terminated: 11/9/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 11/08/2017 re: Temporary Modification of Bail Conditions to travel for Thanksgiving holiday . Document filed by Irfan Amanat. (Shellow, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 541 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: 11/8/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 11-8-17 re: Motion to Preclude Amanat Exhibit 907 . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/8/2017. Jury Trial continued to 11/9/17 at 9:30 am (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/7/2017. Jury trial continued to 11/8/17 at 9:30 (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/6/2017. Jury trial continued to 11/7/17 at 9:30am (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 540 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/6/2017 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [538] Motion for Gary V. Mauney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Gary V. Mauney, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. Applicant having requested admission Pro Hac Vice to appear as an interested party and as counsel for a third party group of former investors in the Maiden Capital Opportunity Fund, LP". Applicant has declared that he is a member in good standing of the bar of the State of North Carolina. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/3/17) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/3/2017. Jury trial continued to 11/6/17 at 9:30am (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 539 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Omar Amanat. For the reasons set forth in the Court's November 2, 2017 sealed ex parte order, the motions to quash by non-parties Alston & Bird LLP, Michael A. Kaeding, Ryan P. Ethridge, and Jessica Corley and Gary V. Mauney are granted. (Dkt. Nos. 525, 525). (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 11/2/2017)(ft) Modified on 11/3/2017 (ft).
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 538 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: 11/2/2017, Terminated: 11/3/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Gary V. Mauney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Subpoena, # (2) Exhibit Declaration, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Mauney, Gary)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [538] MOTION for Gary V. Mauney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (CORRECTED). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/2/2017. Jury trial continued to 11/3/17 at 9:30am (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 537 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated November 1, 2017 re: [533] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 11/1/2017 re: Request to Strike Answers to Hypothetical Questions in Mullin Testimony .. (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A, # (2) Ex. B, # (3) Ex. C, # (4) Ex. D, # (5) Ex. E)(Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 536 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 533 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 11/1/2017 re: Request to Strike Answers to Hypothetical Questions in Mullin Testimony . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 11/1/2017. Jury trial continued to 11/2/17 at 9:30am (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 546 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 11/9/2017 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Stephen E Maiden. (Signed by Judge Judge Paul G. Gardephe) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 535 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: For the reasons set forth in this Court's October 31, 2017 sealed ex paiie order, the motions to quash filed by the Government and Robin Smyth are granted. (Dkt. Nos. 458, 494) Tuzman's request for Smyth and Campion's communications and telephone records is denied. (Diet. No. 489) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/31/2017) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 31, 2017 re: Response to October 31, 2017 Letter from Attorney Gary Mauney Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/20/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: Conference held on 10/20/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/21/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: 10/31/2017 Response in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gary V. Mauney dated 10/31/2017 re: [524] MOTION to Quash Defendant Omar Amanat's Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum.. (Mauney, Gary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Irfan Amanat held on 10/31/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat continued. Jury Trial continued to 11/1/17 at 9:30 am. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 10/31/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat continued. Jury trial continued to 11/1/17 at 9:30am (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Defendant Tuzman's motions for Rule 17(c)subpoenas directed to Parker Poe and Jones Day/Alvarez are denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/30/2017) (See ORDER as set forth) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 528 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 30, 2017 re: Motion to Quash of Gary Mauney Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 527 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re [524] MOTION to Quash Defendant Omar Amanat's Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Subpoena, # (2) Exhibit Amended Complaint (Part 1 of 2), # (3) Exhibit Amended Complaint (Part 2 of 2), # (4) Exhibit Subpoena, # (5) Exhibit Jackson Email, # (6) Exhibit Stipulated Protective Order, # (7) Exhibit Jackson Letter)(Mauney, Gary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 526 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM in Support by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re [524] MOTION to Quash Defendant Omar Amanat's Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum.. (Mauney, Gary) Modified on 10/31/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 525 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017, Terminated: 11/2/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jessica P. Corley dated 10/30/2017 re: Motion to Quash Subpoena Issued by Amanat to Alston & Bird LLP, Michael A. Kaeding, Ryan P. Ethridge, Jessica Corley . Document filed by Ryan Ethridge, Michael Kaeding, Jessica Corley, Alston & Bird LLP as to Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Subpoena Issued to Alston & Bird LLP, Michael A. Kaeding, Ryan P. Ethridge, Jessica Corley)(Corley, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 524 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017, Terminated: 11/2/2017 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash Defendant Omar Amanat's Fed. R. Crim. P. 17(c) Subpoena Duces Tecum. Document filed by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Mauney, Gary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: 10/30/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Omar Amanat. Non-party Gary V. Mauney is directed to respond to the October 24, 2017 subpoena served on him by Omar Amanat by October 30, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/30/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Irfan Amanat held on 10/30/2017. Jury trial as to defendants K. Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat began. Jury Trial continued to 10/31/17 at 9:30 am. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 10/30/2017. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 522 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jessica Corley dated 10/27/2017 re: Adding of interested parties. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/27/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 521 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman, dated 10/27/2017, re: Counsel for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman writes to request the Court's permission to bring the following items to Courtroom 110 for support during trial: 17-inch LCD computer monitor, Rolling book cart, Exhibit boxes, White Flip chart. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/27/2017) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 520 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: 10/27/2017, Terminated: 10/27/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Gary Vance Mauney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14294303. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Gary V. Mauney as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Subpoena, # (2) Exhibit Declaration, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Mauney, Gary) Modified on 10/27/2017 (bcu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Irfan Amanat held on 10/27/2017. Final pretrial conference held. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Final Pretrial Conference as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 10/27/2017. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat to RE-FILE Document No. [520] MOTION for Gary Vance Mauney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14294303. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of North Carolina;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 519 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: 10/26/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Gary V. Mauney dated 10/26/2017 re: Added as an interested party. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/26/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 518 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 25, 2017 re: Reply to Government's October 25, 2017 Letter Re Bernard Madoff (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 517 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: as to (S8-15-Cr-536-) Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. The motion of Christopher Brett Leach, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. Applicant has declared that he is a member in good standing of the bars of the State of New York and of the District of Columbia; and that his contact information is as follows:...[See this Order]... Applicant having requested admission Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman in the above captioned action; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the action captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/25/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 516 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: 10/25/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 10-24-17 re: O. Amanat MIL re Madoff References Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Irfan Amanat held on 10/25/2017. Jury selection completed. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Selection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Selection as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 10/25/2017 (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 515 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 514 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Omar Amanat on re: [509] Letter filed by Omar Amanat. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/24/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 513 Filed: 10/24/2017, Entered: 10/24/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. For the reasons stated above, Tuzman is ordered to disclose forthwith any tangible results of the physical and Thin Layer Chromatography tests performed by Dr. Lyter that are relevant to his testimony. Any rebuttal expert disclosure from the Government concerning this issue is due November 8, 2017. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/24/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Jury Trial as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Irfan Amanat held on 10/24/2017. Jury selection continued. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Selection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Selection as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 10/24/2017 (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Jury Selection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Jury Selection as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Irfan Amanat held on 10/23/2017. Jury Selection began. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Selection
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Jury Selection as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 10/23/2017 (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Voir Dire held on 10/23/2017 as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Irfan Amanat. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Voir Dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Voir Dire held on 10/23/2017 as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 10/22/2017, Entered: 10/22/2017 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated October 22, 2017 re [465] MOTION in Limine .. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 10/22/2017, Entered: 10/22/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [464] MOTION in Limine (Daubert Hearing re: Albert H. Lyter III). . (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [467] MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Peter J. Melley. . (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 20, 2017 re: Modification in Bail Conditions Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [507] MOTION for Christopher Brett Leach to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14266082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/20/2017 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Defendants Kaleil Isaza Tuzman and Omar Amanat are charged with conspiracy to commit wire fraud, wire fraud, investment advisor fraud, and conspiracy to commit securities fraud. The Government claims that Tuzman - the former chief executive officer of KIT digital, Inc. - and Omar Amanat of Enable Invest Ltd., conspired with others, including Stephen Maiden, to have Maiden's hedge fund purchase and hold KIT digitali's stock to artificially inflate its price and trading volume, and to hide losses Maiden's hedge fund had sustained in Enable. Tuzinan is also charged with making false statements to the public and to auditors about these transactions and KIT digital's finances. Tuzman has moved for a bill of particulars and an order dismissing the S8 Indictment as violating the rule against specialty. (Dkt. No. 262) Omar Amanat has moved to dismiss Count Four as duplicitous and to strike certain language in the S8 Indictment as surplusage. (Dkt. No. 269) Both Defendants have also moved for a severance. For the reasons stated above, Defendants' pretrial motions are denied (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/19/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017, Terminated: 10/25/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Christopher Brett Leach to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14266082. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Good Standing - NY, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing - DC, # (3) Declaration, # (4) Proposed Order)(Leach, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 10/19/2017 re: Opposition to Smyth Letter-Motion to Quash Subpoena Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brian David Mogck appearing for Gavin Campion. Appearance Type: Retained. (Mogck, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [476] MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION, PUBLICLY FILED WITH REDACTIONS, TO COMPEL PIKSEL TO COMPLY WITH RULE 17 SUBPOENA. . (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [500] LETTER MOTION as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1). ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/19/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 502 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 10-19-17 re: Isaza Tuzman Rule 17(c) Subpoena on BOP (Dkt Nos. 458, 478, 479) Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 501 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: 10/19/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 10-19-17 re: Response to Letter Motion re Various Allegations (Dkt. 489) Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: 10/18/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Steven M. Lucks dated October 18, 2017 re: [487] Response in Opposition to Motion, re: Request to File Unredacted Version of Opposition under Seal . Document filed by Piksel, Inc as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Lucks, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nancy Elizabeth Hart appearing for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. Appearance Type: Retained. (Hart, Nancy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 498 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat ( Pretrial Conference set for 10/20/2017 at 12:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.)It is hereby ORDERED that the final pretrial conference in this action previously scheduled for October 18, 2017 will be held on October 20, 2017 at 12:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/17/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: Conference held on 9/6/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 495 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 17, 2017 re: Personal Electronic Devices for Trial . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Michael Bachner, Esq. dated October 16, 2017 re: Quash Rule 17 Subpoena Issued By Kaleil Tuzman. Document filed by Robin Smyth. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weiner, Howard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of AMER AHMED in Opposition as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [464] MOTION in Limine (Daubert Hearing re: Albert H. Lyter III).. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Robin Smyth: Notice to Attorney Howard S. Weiner to RE-FILE Document [488] MOTION to Quash Rule 17 Subpoena. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/17/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [464] MOTION in Limine (Daubert Hearing re: Albert H. Lyter III).. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 491 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [465] MOTION in Limine .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: [467] MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Peter J. Melley. . (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 489 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated October 16, 2017 re: response and issues to be raised at the final pretrial conference (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 488 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017, Terminated: 10/16/2017 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Quash Rule 17 Subpoena. Document filed by Robin Smyth. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Weiner, Howard) Modified on 10/17/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by Piksel, Inc as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: [476] MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION, PUBLICLY FILED WITH REDACTIONS, TO COMPEL PIKSEL TO COMPLY WITH RULE 17 SUBPOENA.. (Lucks, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated October 16, 2017 re: [472] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 5, 2017 re: Preclusion of Argument that Mr. Amanat is an Unindicted Coconspirator .. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 10/15/2017 re: Government's October 11, 2017 Letter (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat: Notice to Attorney Steven Miles Lucks to RE-FILE Document [484] Notice (Other. Use the event type Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Piksel, Inc.'s Opposition to Tuzman's Motion to Compel as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: [476] MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION, PUBLICLY FILED WITH REDACTIONS, TO COMPEL PIKSEL TO COMPLY WITH RULE 17 SUBPOENA., [477] Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Lucks, Steven) Modified on 10/16/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 483 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE of of Appearance of Non-Party Piksel, Inc. as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat (Lucks, Steven) Modified on 10/16/2017 (db). As per ecf_error email correspondence received on 10/16/17 @ 12:55pm.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: 10/13/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated October 13, 2017 re: Diplomatic Note Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Diplomatic Note)(Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: 10/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. The Government is directed to submit a copy of any diplomatic note from the United States to Columbia regarding the Defendant's extradition following the Columbia Supreme Court's March 16, 2016 ruling by Friday, October 13, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/12/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Notice to Attorney A. Damian Williams to RE-FILE Document [480] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: 10/11/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: [390] MOTION in Limine . . (Williams, A.) Modified on 10/12/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [478] MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF BRADY AND GIGLIO MATERIAL FROM THE BUREAU OF PRISONS.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 478 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: 10/10/2017 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF BRADY AND GIGLIO MATERIAL FROM THE BUREAU OF PRISONS. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [476] MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION, PUBLICLY FILED WITH REDACTIONS, TO COMPEL PIKSEL TO COMPLY WITH RULE 17 SUBPOENA.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 476 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel / DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION, PUBLICLY FILED WITH REDACTIONS, TO COMPEL PIKSEL TO COMPLY WITH RULE 17 SUBPOENA. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated October 6, 2017 re: recent government allegations (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/5/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: 10/6/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Omar Amanat re: Conference held on 9/5/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 10/5/2017, Entered: 10/5/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated October 5, 2017 re: Preclusion of Argument that Mr. Amanat is an Unindicted Coconspirator . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/6/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: Conference held on 9/6/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 10/3/2017, Entered: 10/3/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [463] LETTER MOTION filed by Irfan Amanat (7), addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Attorney Jill R. Shellow dated 09/29/2017 re: Temporary Modification of Terms of Pretrial Release. Mr. Amanat is not requesting specific dates for this travel, as it will depend on when he can find the least expensive airfare, but generally he is requesting to leave New Jersey sometime between October 4 and 7 and to return between October 10 and 12. As soon as he purchases his ticket, he will provide PTS and me with his itinerary. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 10/3/2017) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [467] MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Peter J. Melley.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, Part 1, # (5) Exhibit D, Part 2, # (6) Exhibit D, Part 3, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 467 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Motion to exclude
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Peter J. Melley. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated October 2, 2017 re: update the Court on the status of our computer forensic expert's progress (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Young Disclosure, # (2) Exhibit Bennett Disclosure, # (3) Exhibit Ferrell Disclosure, # (4) Exhibit Klein Disclosure)(Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: 10/2/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine (Daubert Hearing re: Albert H. Lyter III). Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Lyter Report), # (2) Exhibit B (Lyter GC/MS Test Result), # (3) Exhibit C (Declaration of Gerald M. LaPorte, M.S.F.S.))(Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017, Terminated: 10/3/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 09/29/2017 re: Temporary Modification of Terms of Pretrial Release . Document filed by Irfan Amanat. (Shellow, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Omar Amanat re: Conference held on 9/19/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Omar Amanat re: Conference held on 9/19/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/18/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Omar Amanat: It is hereby ORDERED that the application of Eric Creizman and Melissa Madrigal of Creizman PLLC to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Omar Amanat is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/26/2017) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: 9/27/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat: It is hereby ORDERED that the trial in this matter previously scheduled for October 10, 2017 will begin on October 23, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 110 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. It is further ORDERED that the final pre-trial conference in this action previously scheduled for September 28, 2017 will be held on October 18, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 10/23/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 110, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/18/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/26/2017) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Attorney update in case as to Omar Amanat. Attorney Eric M. Creizman and Melissa Madrigal terminated (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 458 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST MOTION to Quash BOP Subpoena. Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 9/26/2017, Entered: 9/26/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 9-25-17 re: Agreement to Moot Motion to Quash Harvard/Goldman Subpoenas Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat: Notice to Attorney Andrea Michelle Griswold to RE-FILE Document [456] Response to Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 456 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: [427] MOTION to Quash - DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION TO QUASH THE GOVERNMENT'S IMPROPER RULE 17(C) SUBPOENAS.. Agreement to Moot Motion (Griswold, Andrea) Modified on 9/26/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 9-25-17 re: [452] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 24, 2017 re: Friday Notice of Witnesses and Exhibits for the Following Week .. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated September 25, 2017 re: Reciprocal Rule 16 Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 9/25/2017, Entered: 9/25/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated September 25, 2017 re: informing the Court of expert witness motion scheduling (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 9/24/2017, Entered: 9/24/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 24, 2017 re: Friday Notice of Witnesses and Exhibits for the Following Week . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 451 Filed: 9/22/2017, Entered: 9/22/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joanna Christine Wright appearing for Omar Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Wright, Joanna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/21/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 21, 2017 re: Peremptory Challenges Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: 9/21/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Sept. 21, 2017 re: electronic discovery from SEC Action (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 19, 2017 re: Requests to Charge of the Government and Defendant Isaza Tuzman Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: 9/20/2017 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: [390] MOTION in Limine ., [398] MOTION in Limine .. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 446 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [390] MOTION in Limine .. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [393] Proposed Voir Dire Questions filed by USA . (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [391] Request to Charge filed by USA . (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re [399] MOTION in Limine Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motions., [398] MOTION in Limine .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (1/8/17 Letter), # (2) Exhibit B (Lumiere Transcript))(Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Omar Amanat re [409] MOTION in Limine No. 2., [407] MOTION in Limine No. 1., [411] MOTION in Limine No. 3.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman on [433] ETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Sept. 14, 2017 re: Leave to travel for Jewish holidays. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/19/2017) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: 9/19/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Robin Smyth (2), Stephen E Maiden (3), Omar Amanat (4), Rima Jameel (5), Gavin Campion (6), Irfan Amanat (7) granting [437] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated September 15, 2017 re: Request for Melissa Madrigal to appear in my place at the status conference scheduled for Tuesday, September 17, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/19/2017) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Status Conference as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 9/19/2017, as ( Jury Trial set for 10/30/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) Defendant Kaliel Isaza Tuzman present with attorneys Avi Weitzman, Amer Ahmed and Marcollus McRae. Defendant Omar Amanat present with attorney Randall Jackson. AUSAs Andrea Griswold, Damian Williams and Joshua Naftalis present. Court reporter Carol Ganley present. Jury trial adjourned to 10/30/17 at 9:30 am with jury selection to take place on 10/23/17. Speedy trial time is excluded from 9/19/17 to 10/23/17. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated September 18, 2017 re: update the Court on the status of our computer forensic expert (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re [424] MOTION to Suppress Contents of the Robin Smyth Laptop or, In the Alternative, for a Continuance.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Williams Declaration, # (2) Exhibit July 20, 2016 Cover Letter, # (3) Exhibit July 5, 2017 Email Chain, # (4) Exhibit September 12, 2017 Email Chain, # (5) Exhibit Transcript)(Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated September 15, 2017 re: Request for Melissa Madrigal to appear in my place at the status conference scheduled for Tuesday, September 17, 2017 . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: 9/15/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 15, 2017 re: Modification of Pre-Trial Release Conditions . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated September 14, 2017 re: Update on Trial Procedures Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 434 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated September 14, 2017 re: request for a schedule for rebuttal expert witness disclosures (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: 9/14/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Sept. 14, 2017 re: Leave to travel for Jewish holidays (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated September 13, 2017 re: Trial Procedures Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: 9/13/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on September 19, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 9/19/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/13/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Sept. 12, 2017 re: Rule 15 deposition of Andy Steward (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order granting Rule 15 deposition)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Randall W. Jackson dated September 12, 2017 re: Trial Procedures . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [427] MOTION to Quash - DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION TO QUASH THE GOVERNMENT'S IMPROPER RULE 17(C) SUBPOENAS.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash - DEFENDANT KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN'S MOTION TO QUASH THE GOVERNMENT'S IMPROPER RULE 17(C) SUBPOENAS. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Avi Weitzman in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [424] MOTION to Suppress Contents of the Robin Smyth Laptop or, In the Alternative, for a Continuance.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [424] MOTION to Suppress Contents of the Robin Smyth Laptop or, In the Alternative, for a Continuance.. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: 9/12/2017 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Suppress Contents of the Robin Smyth Laptop or, In the Alternative, for a Continuance. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Notice to Attorney Avi Weitzman to RE-FILE Document [423] MOTION to Quash Government's Improper Rule 17(c) Subpoenas. ERROR(S): Filing Error of Attachment#1. Supporting Memorandum must be filed indiviudually. Use event code Memorandum in Support of Motion located under Replies, Opposition and Supporting documents.***NOTE: Separate docket entry for each. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Notice to Attorney Avi Weitzman to RE-FILE Document [421] MOTION to Suppress Contents of the Robin Smyth Laptop or, In the Alternative, for a Continuance. ERROR(S): Filing Error of Attachments 1 & 2. Supporting documents must be filed individually. Event codes located under Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents.***NOTE:Separate docket entry for each. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017, Terminated: 9/11/2017 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Quash Government's Improper Rule 17(c) Subpoenas. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Isaza Tuzman's Motion to Quash Government's Improper Rule 17(c) Subpoenas, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D)(Weitzman, Avi) Modified on 9/12/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Sept. 11, 2017 re: update on Rule 16(b) reciprocal discovery (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017, Terminated: 9/11/2017 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Suppress Contents of the Robin Smyth Laptop or, In the Alternative, for a Continuance. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendant Kaleil Isaza Tuzmans Motion to Suppress Contents of the Robin Smyth Laptop or, In the Alternative, for a Continuance, # (2) Affidavit Declaration of Avi Weitzman, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G, # (10) Exhibit H, # (11) Exhibit I, # (12) Exhibit J, # (13) Exhibit K, # (14) Exhibit L, # (15) Exhibit M, # (16) Exhibit N, # (17) Exhibit O, # (18) Exhibit P, # (19) Exhibit Q)(Weitzman, Avi) Modified on 9/12/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated September 11, 2017 re: [387] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, and Joshua A. Naftalis dated 9/1/17 re: Motion to Compel Discovery / Preclude Testimony re: Mr. Lyter .. - Letter in Further Response to the Government's Reply Letter dated September 8, 2017 (Dkt. 417) (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1): It is hereby ORDERED that the conditions of Defendant's bail are modified to allow Martin Feinberg as a co-signer on the Defendant's bond and to release Edward Mullen as a co-signer upon Mr. Feinberg's signature. It is further ORDERED that the bail review hearing scheduled for September 11, 2017 is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/11/2017) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: 9/11/2017, Terminated: 9/11/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 9-11-17 re: Joint Request to Modify Conditions of Release . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Terminate Deadlines and Hearings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: 9/11/2017 Bail Review Hearing Terminated. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 9/8/17 re: Reply in Further Suppor of Motion to Compel Discovery / Preclude re: Alan Lyter Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Sample Lyter Test Result))(Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: 9/8/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. It is hereby ORDERED that a bail review hearing will take place on September 11, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Bond Hearing set for 9/11/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/8/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 9/7/2017, Entered: 9/7/2017 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated Sept. 7, 2017 re: [414] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 9-6-17 re: Conference re Bail Conditions .. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 9-6-17 re: Conference re Bail Conditions . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Proposed Examination of Jurors
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat re [411] MOTION in Limine No. 3.. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine No. 3. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat re [409] MOTION in Limine No. 2.. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine No. 2. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat re [407] MOTION in Limine No. 1.. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine No. 1. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated September 5, 2017 re: [387] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, and Joshua A. Naftalis dated 9/1/17 re: Motion to Compel Discovery / Preclude Testimony re: Mr. Lyter .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [398] MOTION in Limine .. in support of omnibus motion (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Proposed Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) Modified on 9/6/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 proposed jury instructions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Draft Verdict Sheet)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017, Terminated: 9/6/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine No. 3. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) Modified on 9/6/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017, Terminated: 9/6/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine No. 2. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall) Modified on 9/6/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Status Conference as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 9/6/2017, as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat( Jury Trial set for 10/30/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) Defendant Kaliel Isaza Tuzman present with attorneys Avi Weitzman, Amer Ahmed and Marcollus McRae. Defendant Omar Amanat present with attorney Randall Jackson. AUSAs Andrea Griswold, Damian Williams and Joshua Naftalis present. Court reporter Carol Ganley present. Jury trial adjourned to 10/30/17 at 9:30 am with jury selection to take place on 10/23/17. Speedy trial time is excluded from 9/6/17 to 10/23/17. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Status Conference as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat held on 9/6/2017 ( Jury Trial set for 10/10/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) Defendant Kaliel Isaza Tuzman present with attorneys Avi Weitzman, Amer Ahmed and David Crowley-Burk. Defendant Omar Amanat present with attorneys Eric Criezman and Randall Jackson. AUSAs Andrea Griswold, Damian Williams and Joshua Naftalis present. Court reporter Raquel Robles present. Jury trial adjourned to 10/10/17 at 9:30 am. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Omar Amanat: Notice to Attorney Randall Wade Jackson to RE-FILE Document [402] MOTION in Limine No. 3. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Omar Amanat: Notice to Attorney Randall Wade Jackson to RE-FILE Document [404] Proposed Voir Dire Questions. Use the event type Proposed Examination of Jurors found under the event list Trial Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Omar Amanat: Notice to Attorney Randall Wade Jackson to RE-FILE Document [401] MOTION in Limine No. 2. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Notice to Attorney Avi Weitzman to RE-FILE Document [399] MOTION in Limine Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motions. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat: Notice to Attorney Andrea Michelle Griswold to RE-FILE Document [393] Proposed Voir Dire Questions. Use the event type Proposed Examination of Jurors found under the event list Trial Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Notice to Attorney Avi Weitzman to RE-FILE Document [392] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Use the event type Response to Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/6/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine No. 1. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017, Terminated: 9/5/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION in Limine Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motions. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Weitzman, Avi) Modified on 9/6/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Proposed Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated September 5, 2017 re: update the Court on the information extracted from witness's laptop (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [394] MOTION To Pose a Written Questionnaire to prospective jurors in advance of Voir Dire .. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION To Pose a Written Questionnaire to prospective jurors in advance of Voir Dire . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Proposed Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - Proposed Voir Dire Questions by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Griswold, Andrea) Modified on 9/6/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [387] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, and Joshua A. Naftalis dated 9/1/17 re: Motion to Compel Discovery / Preclude Testimony re: Mr. Lyter .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A to Opp to Ltr Mot re Lyter Disclosure, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B to Opp to Ltr Mot re Lyter Disclosure, # (3) Exhibit Ex. C to Opp to Ltr Mot re Lyter Disclosure, # (4) Exhibit Ex. D to Opp to Ltr Mot re Lyter Disclosure)(Weitzman, Avi) Modified on 9/6/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Request to Charge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request To Charge by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Irfan Amanat. Defendant Irfan Amanat and his counsel are excused from attending the conference in this matter scheduled for September 6, 2017. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 9/5/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: 9/5/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Justine Marie Goeke appearing for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. Appearance Type: Retained. (Goeke, Justine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Status Conference as to Omar Amanat held on 9/5/2017. Defendant O. Amanat present with attorneys Randall Jackson and Eric Criezman. AUSAs Andrea Griswold and Joshua Naftalis present. Court reporter Lisa Fellis present. Bail continued. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 9/1/2017, Entered: 9/1/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, and Joshua A. Naftalis dated 9/1/17 re: Motion to Compel Discovery / Preclude Testimony re: Mr. Lyter . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (July 21, 2017 Email), # (2) Exhibit B (Aug. 21, 2017 Lyter Report), # (3) Exhibit C (Aug. 25, 2017 Gov't Letter), # (4) Exhibit D (Aug. 26-30, 2017 Emails))(Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat ( Status Conference set for 9/6/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on September 6, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courthouse 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. The Government and all Defendants are directed to attend. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/31/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: 8/31/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Omar Amanat ( Status Conference set for 9/5/2017 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on September 5, 2017 at 11:45am in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall US Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, NY, NY. The Government and other Defendants need not appear. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/31/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: 8/29/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Randall Wade Jackson appearing for Omar Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: 8/28/2017 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated August 28, 2017 re [379] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 08/25/2017 re: Conference Regarding Recent Breaches of Government's Discovery Obligations .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 8/26/2017, Entered: 8/26/2017 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Williams, Griswold, Naftalis dated 8/26/17 re: [379] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 08/25/2017 re: Conference Regarding Recent Breaches of Government's Discovery Obligations .. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Irfan Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/9/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Irfan Amanat re: Conference held on 8/9/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/25/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 08/25/2017 re: Conference Regarding Recent Breaches of Government's Discovery Obligations . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017, Terminated: 8/25/2017 Motion for Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Conference Regarding Breaches Of The Government's Discovery Obligations. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S)(Weitzman, Avi) Modified on 8/25/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Notice to Attorney Avi Weitzman to RE-FILE Document [378] MOTION for Conference Regarding Breaches Of The Government's Discovery Obligations. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Harold K. Gordon dated August 24, 2017 re: [371] Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, re: Requesting Leave to File Sur-Reply . Document filed by Jones Day as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Gordon, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 376 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: 8/24/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Hoguet Newman Regal & Kenney, LLP dated August 24, 2017 re: cc of Letter to Justice Kornreich Regarding Public Filing of Smyth Deposition Transcript as directed in Order Dated August 17, 2017 Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Jaroslaw, Ilene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, and Joshua A. Naftalis dated 8/23/17 re: Response to Tuzman's 8/22/17 Letter Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: 8/23/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL as to Omar Amanat. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/22/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 373 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: 8/22/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated August 22, 2017 re: response to Government's August 18, 2017 letter on pretrial discovery (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 372 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: 8/18/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, and Joshua A. Naftalis dated 8/18/17 re: Response to Tuzman's Aug. 14, 2017 Letter Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: [340] FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ilene Jaroslaw, for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman dated 07/28/2017 re: Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoenas to Jones Day and Alvarez & Marsal. . (Jaroslaw, Ilene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from John G. Moon dated 8/14/2017 re: Refiling of Opposition. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/17/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: 8/17/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. It is hereby ORDERED that any materials produced in response to any Government-issued trial subpoena and any accompanying cover letter in this matter that requests production prior to trial on October 2, 2017 shall be provided to the Court without review by the Government pending the Courts ruling on this issue. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/17/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated August 14. 2017 re: joining in Tuzman's motion opposing the government's improper use of Rule 17(c) subpoenas and reiterating previous request for the adjournment of trial proceedings on Jewish holidays. . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 367 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated August 14, 2017 re: Request to Suspend Trial Days for Religious Observance . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amer Shahid Ahmed appearing for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. Appearance Type: Retained. (Ahmed, Amer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 365 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated August 14, 2017 re: Government Abuse of Rule 17(c) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - letter and subpoena)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Jones Day as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from John G. Moon dated August 11, 2017 re: [340] FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ilene Jaroslaw, for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman dated 07/28/2017 re: Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoenas to Jones Day and Alvarez & Marsal.. (Moon, John) Modified on 8/14/2017 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 Declaration in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Harold K. Gordon in Opposition by Jones Day as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [340] FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ilene Jaroslaw, for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman dated 07/28/2017 re: Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoenas to Jones Day and Alvarez & Marsal.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Gordon, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 362 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Jones Day as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [340] FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ilene Jaroslaw, for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman dated 07/28/2017 re: Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoenas to Jones Day and Alvarez & Marsal.. (Gordon, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat. Trial in this matter is scheduled to begin on October 2, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. The following schedule will apply to expert witness disclosures and pretrial submissions: 1. The Government's expert disclosures are due August 21, 2017. 2. Defense expert disclosures are due September 11, 2017, except that disclosure for any expert intended to off er testimony on ink or authenticity issues is due August 21, 201 7. 3. In the event that any Defendant designates an expert on ink or authenticity issues on August 21, 2017, the Government shall make any expert disclosures on that issue by September 11, 2017. It is further ORDERED that pre-trial submissions in this matter - motions in limine, proposed voir dire, and proposed requests to charge - are due on September 5, 2017, with responsive papers due on September 19, 2017. It is further ORDERED that there shall be a final pre-trial conference in this action on September 28, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 6B of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. (Motions due by 9/5/2017, Responses due by 9/19/2017, Jury Trial set for 10/2/2017 at 09:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe, Pretrial Conference set for 9/28/2017 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/10/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: 8/10/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance of John G. Moon, Esq. on behalf of non-party Alvarez & Marsal as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat (Moon, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: 8/9/2017 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER as to (S8-15-Cr-536-01) Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. On the motion of the United States of America, by Preet Bharara, United States Attorney, through his counsel, Damian Williams and Andrea Griswold, Assistant United States Attorneys ("the Government"), pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d), on consent of the defendant, through his counsel, Avi Weitzman, Esq., and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. With exceptions of (1) publicly available materials, (2) materials that become public, and (3) materials that were or are obtained by the defendant through means other than receipt of discovery materials from the Government in this case, all materials, including documents and the information contained therein, electronic data, and other audio or visual materials that are provided by the Government to the defendant in this action pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, Title 18, United States Code, Section 3500; Brady v. Maryland; or United States v. Giglio, (hereinafter "Government Materials") are considered "Confidential Information." 2. Absent further order of the Court, Confidential Information disclosed to the defendant or to his counsel in this case during the course of proceedings in this action: (a) Shall be used by the defendant and his counsel only for purposes of def ending this criminal action and S.E.C. v. Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (the "SEC Action"); (b) Shall not be disclosed in any form by the defendant or his counsel except as set forth in paragraph 2(c) below; and (c) May be disclosed by the defendant or his counsel in this action only to the following persons (hereinafter "Designated Persons"):...[See this Protective Order]... 7. The provisions of this Order shall not be construed as preventing the disclosure of any information in any motion, hearing or trial held in this action or to any district or magistrate judge of this Court for purposes of this action. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/9/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Irfan Amanat: Jury Trial set for 2/5/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe:Status Conference as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat held on 8/9/2017. Defendant Kaleil Isaza Tuzman present with attorneys Avi Weitzman and Marcellus McRae. Defendant Omar Amanat present with attorney Eric Creizman. Defendant Irfan Amanat present with attorneys Jill Shellow and Benjamin Silverman. AUSAs Andrea Michelle Griswold and Joshua Naftalis present. Court reporter Kelly Surina present. Jury trial as to defendant Irfan Amanat set for 2/5/18 at 9:30 am. Bail continued. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: 8/8/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [353] LETTER MOTION as to Robin Smyth (2). ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. Sentencing is adjourned to Nov. 28, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/8/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 8/8/2017, Entered: 8/8/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [355] LETTER MOTION as to Stephen E Maiden (3). ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. Sentencing is adjourned to Dec. 1, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/8/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Robin Smyth: Sentencing set for 11/28/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Stephen E Maiden: Sentencing set for 12/1/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated August 7, 2017 re: Protective Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017, Terminated: 8/8/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 8.7.17 re: Adjournment of Sentencing Date . Document filed by USA as to Stephen E Maiden. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ilene Jaroslaw, for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman dated August 7, 2017 re: Addendum to Letter Requesting Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum to Jones Day and Alvarez & Marsal (Dkt. 340) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Letter from Counsel for Alvarez & Marsal to U.S. Magistrate Judge James L. Cott dated July 18, 2017)(Jaroslaw, Ilene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: 8/7/2017, Terminated: 8/8/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 8.7.17 re: Adjournment of Sentencing Date . Document filed by USA as to Robin Smyth. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 08/04/2017 re: Reply In Support of Subpoena to Parker Poe (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: 8/4/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Jones Day as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from James P. Loonam dated August 4, 2017 re: response to defendant's letter motion dated July 28, 2017 (Dkt. #340) Document filed by Jones Day. (Loonam, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 350 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 8.3.17 re: Entry of Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 349 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: 8/2/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat ( Status Conference set for 8/9/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on August 9, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/2/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Apperance of behalf of Non-party Jones Day as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (Klotz, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: 8/1/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Apperance of behalf of Non-party Jones Day as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (Loonam, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Philip Salant appearing for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. Appearance Type: Retained. (Salant, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Francis Crowley-Buck appearing for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. Appearance Type: Retained. (Crowley-Buck, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 344 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated July 31, 2017 re: Isaza Tuzman Adjournment Request Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: 7/31/2017 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Non-party Jones Day as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (Gordon, Harold)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 342 Filed: 7/30/2017, Entered: 7/30/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated July 30, 2017 re: Expert witness disclosures (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 341 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 07/28/2017 re: Response to Irfan Amanat's 7/26/17 Letter and USAs 7/27/17 Letter regarding Motion to Sever, Adjourn Trial, and Schedule Status Conference Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Ilene Jaroslaw, for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman dated 07/28/2017 re: Issuance of Rule 17(c) Subpoenas to Jones Day and Alvarez & Marsal. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Jones Day Subpoena, # (2) Exhibit Alvarez & Marsal Subpoena, # (3) Exhibit Isaza Tuzman Motion to Compel, # (4) Exhibit Jones Day Response to MTC, # (5) Exhibit SEC Subpoena to Piksel)(Jaroslaw, Ilene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: 7/28/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ilene B. Jaroslaw appearing for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. Appearance Type: Retained. (Jaroslaw, Ilene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 7/27/17 re: Rule 16 Expert Witness Disclosure Schedule . Document filed by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: 7/27/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Damian Williams, Andrea M. Griswold, & Joshua A. Naftalis dated 7/27/17 re: Response to Irfan Amanat's 7/26/17 Letter to Sever and Adjourn Trial Document filed by USA. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman ( Replies due by 8/4/2017.)Non-party Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein, LLP is directed to respond to Defendant's July 24, 2017 letter seeking a Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 17(c) subpoena, (Dkt. No. 334), by August 2, 2017. Defendant's Reply, if any, is due by August 4, 2017. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/26/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: 7/26/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 07/26/2017 re: [301] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 05/27/2017 re: request for trial adjournment . re: Adjournment of 10/2/17 trial date and Conference to address the issue . Document filed by Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Julie de Almeida, Esq.)(Shellow, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: 7/24/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated July 24, 2017 re: Issuance of a Subpoena Duces Tecum . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (S8-15-Cr-536-01) Kaleil Isaza Tuzman on re: [317] LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated June 12, 2017 re: relieving Serpe Ryan LLP as counsel. We write respectfully to request that Your Honor enter an order, as required by Local Civil Rule 1.4, permitting Serpe Ryan LLP to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Kaleil Isaza Tuzman in the above-captioned matter. In addition, in conjunction with our withdrawal, we respectfully request that Your Honor order the Clerk of Court to terminate the transmission of Notices of Electronic Filing (NEFs) to both Paul W. Ryan and Silvia L. Serpe in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/20/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: 7/21/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (S8-15-Cr-536-01) Kaleil Isaza Tuzman on re: [317] LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Attorney Avi Weitzman dated June 12, 2017 re: relieving Serpe Ryan LLP as counsel. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/20/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1). Attorney Paul W. Ryan and Silvia L. Serpe terminated. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: 7/20/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman on re: [330] Letter filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/20/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated July 19, 2017 re: visitation/permission to travel [REDACTED] (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of AVI WEITZMAN in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [327] MOTION to Take Deposition from Andy Steward pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 15.. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [327] MOTION to Take Deposition from Andy Steward pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 15.. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: 7/19/2017 Motion to Take Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Take Deposition from Andy Steward pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 15. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: 7/18/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [325] LETTER MOTION as to Irfan Amanat (7). ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/18/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Irfan Amanat: Notice to Attorney Jill R. Shellow to RE-FILE Document [323] Reply to Response to Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017, Terminated: 7/18/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill Shellow dated July 12, 2017 re: Temporary Modification of Bail Conditions . Document filed by Irfan Amanat. (Silverman, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: 7/5/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated July 5, 2017 re: Stephen Maiden / Parker Poe Discovery in SEC Action (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Irfan Amanat re [301] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 05/27/2017 re: request for trial adjournment ., [299] MOTION to Sever Defendant and To Remedy Count Six's Duplicity.. (Shellow, Jill) Modified on 7/14/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: 6/29/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [321] LETTER MOTION filed by USA as to Gavin Campion (6), addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 6.28.17 re: Adjournment of Sentencing Control Date for at least 90 days, currently scheduled for June 29, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. Sentencing is adjourned to Nov. 15, 2017 at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/29/2017) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Gavin Campion (6): Sentencing set for 11/15/2017 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [320] MOTION for MARCELLUS ANTONIO McRAE to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13840813. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017, Terminated: 6/29/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 6.28.17 re: Adjournment of Sentencing Control Date . Document filed by USA as to Gavin Campion. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for MARCELLUS ANTONIO McRAE to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-13840813. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Marcellus Antonio McRae, # (2) Certificates of Good Standing: State of California, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(McRae, Marcellus)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 20, 2017 re: Proposed Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Protective Order)(Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: 6/16/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Irfan Amanat re [299] MOTION to Sever Defendant and To Remedy Count Six's Duplicity.. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated June 12, 2017 re: relieving Serpe Ryan LLP as counsel (Attachments: # (1) Attachment - Letter from Serpe Ryan LLP requesting to be relieved, # (2) Attachment - Tuzman's Notarized Consent to Relief)(Weitzman, Avi) Modified on 6/15/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE to Motion by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated June 5, 2017 re: [313] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 6.5.17 re: Limiting Scope of Today's Bail Hearing .. (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated June 4, 2017 re: supplemental submission in further support of severance (Refiling of Docket Entry 312) (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated June 3, 2017 re: [311] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to eliminate condition of home detention. re: Modify Conditions of Release to Eliminate Condition of Home Detention . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Transcript of 7-13-16 Bail Hearing, # (2) Exhibit B-Judge Gropper Jan. 2005 Opinion, # (3) Exhibit C-Judge Gropper Oct. 2007 Opinion, # (4) Exhibit D-Judge Gropper March 2009 Opinion, # (5) Exhibit E-Judge Gropper March 2010, # (6) Exhibit F-UK Opinion, # (7) Exhibit G-Ronald Minkoff Aff. - Peak Venture Partners)(Creizman, Eric) Modified on 6/6/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 6.5.17 re: Limiting Scope of Today's Bail Hearing . Document filed by USA as to Omar Amanat. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Notice to Attorney Eric M. Creizman to RE-FILE Document [312] Memorandum in Support of Motion. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Omar Amanat: Notice to Attorney Eric M. Creizman to RE-FILE Document [311] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to eliminate condition of home detention. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 6/4/2017, Entered: 6/4/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re [269] MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re [266] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count. Supplemental Submission in support of a severance. (Creizman, Eric) Modified on 6/5/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 6/3/2017, Entered: 6/3/2017, Terminated: 6/3/2017 motion to modify conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to eliminate condition of home detention. Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Transcript of 7-13-2016 Bail Hearing, # (2) Exhibit B-Judge Gropper Jan. 2005, # (3) Exhibit C-Judge Gropper Oct. 2007 Opinion, # (4) Exhibit D-Judge Gropper March 2009 Opinion, # (5) Exhibit E-Judge Gropper March 2010, # (6) Exhibit F-UK Opinion, # (7) Exhibit G-Ronald Minkoff Aff.-Peak Venture Partners)(Creizman, Eric) Modified on 6/5/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 6/3/2017, Entered: 6/3/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda Shoffel appearing for Omar Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Shoffel, Amanda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [307] LETTER MOTION as to Irfan Amanat (7). ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/2/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: 6/2/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated June 2, 2017 re: Irfan Amanat Trial Adjournment Request Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: 6/1/2017, Terminated: 6/2/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 06/01/2017 re: Request permission to file interim vouchers . Document filed by Irfan Amanat. (Shellow, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Omar Amanat( Bail Hearing set for 6/5/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) It is hereby ORDERED that the bail review hearing in this matter currently scheduled for June 2, 2017 will take place on Monday, June 5, 2017 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/31/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Omar Amanat on re: [288] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to permit Omar Amanat to attend his son's high school graduation ceremonies on June 7, 2017...ENDORSEMENT...The application is granted. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/31/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated May 30, 2017 re: status update on motion practice as to the Maiden documents pursuant to the Court's May 3, 2017 Order (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSAs Griswold, Williams, Naftalis dated 5.30.17 re: Date of Bail Review Hearing . Document filed by USA as to Omar Amanat. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/30/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to (15-Cr-536-04) Omar Amanat. It is hereby ORDERED that a bail review hearing in this matter will take place on Friday, June 2, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/30/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/27/2017, Entered: 5/27/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 05/27/2017 re: request for trial adjournment . Document filed by Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Email 5/15/17)(Shellow, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by Irfan Amanat re [299] MOTION to Sever Defendant and To Remedy Count Six's Duplicity.. (Silverman, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 motion to sever defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Sever Defendant and To Remedy Count Six's Duplicity. Document filed by Irfan Amanat. (Silverman, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 5/26/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated May 26, 2017 re: response to Government's May 25, 2017 letter (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: 6/5/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL: as to (15-Cr-536-04) Omar Amanat. Upon the motion by counsel for Defendant Omar Amanat, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion by Creizman PLLC to withdraw the appearance of Caroline Johnston Polisi in the above-referenced action is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/26/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Attorney update in case as to Omar Amanat (4). Attorney Caroline Johnston Polisi terminated. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/25/2017, Entered: 5/25/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated May 25, 2017 re: October 2, 2017 Trial Date Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: 5/24/2017, Terminated: 6/5/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Caroline Johnston Polisi to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated May 15, 2017 re: [288] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to permit Omar Amanat to attend his son's high school graduation ceremonies on June 7, 2017. re: temporary modification of Omar Amanat's bail conditions to permit him to attend his son's high school graduation on June 7, 2017 . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated May 15, 2017 re: Response to Pretrial Services' submission regarding Omar Amanat, dated May 11, 2017 Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric M. Creizman dated May 23, 2017 re: (1) joining in Kaleil Isaza Tuzman's motion for an adjournment of the trial to November 2017; (2) in the alternative, that no pretrial or trial proceedings in the case be held on certain dates; (3) that any hearing on Pretrial Services' memorandum concerning Mr. Amanat's bail not be held on May 31 or June 1, 2017 . Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: 5/23/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated May 23, 2017 re: brief adjournment of trial (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: 5/19/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [289] LETTER MOTION filed by Gavin Campion (6), addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Attorney Jim Walden dated May 17, 2017 re: Exception from travel restriction. We are writing to respectfully request the Court's permission for Mr. Campion to travel for two days to a specific country in the Far East for important business meetings related to consulting work he performs for an Australian technology company. We have provided the full details regarding Mr. Campion's proposed travel to the U.S. Attorney's Office (destination, street address of the meetings, flight and hotel details), and we will also provide an itinerary to that Office and Pre-Trial Services in advance. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/18/2017) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: 5/17/2017, Terminated: 5/19/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jim Walden dated May 17, 2017 re: Exception from travel restriction . Document filed by Gavin Campion. (Walden, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Omar Amanat: Notice to Attorney Eric M. Creizman to RE-FILE Document [287] Response. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Omar Amanat: Notice to Attorney Eric M. Creizman to RE-FILE Document [288] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to permit Omar Amanat to attend his son's high school graduation ceremonies on June 7, 2017. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017, Terminated: 5/15/2017 motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release to permit Omar Amanat to attend his son's high school graduation ceremonies on June 7, 2017. Document filed by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) Modified on 5/16/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: 5/15/2017 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat to Memorandum, dated May 11, 2017, submitted by Pretrial Services alleging violations of bail conditions. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Text Messages between Amanat and Pretrial Services dated May 7, 2017, # (2) Exhibit B-Proof of O. Amanat Call to Pretrial Services on May 6, 2017, # (3) Exhibit C-Email from E. Creizman to AUSAs on May 10, 2017, # (4) Exhibit D-Email from AUSAs to E. Creizman on May 10, 2017)(Creizman, Eric) Modified on 5/16/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/6/2017, Entered: 5/6/2017 Declaration in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Eric M. Creizman in Support as to Omar Amanat re: [269] MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re [266] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Memorandum and Order of Judge Matsumoto in United States v. Martin Shkreli, 15-CR-627 (KAM) (EDNY Apr. 24, 2017))(Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/6/2017, Entered: 5/6/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Omar Amanat re: [269] MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re [266] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count Four. (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: 5/5/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat re: [262] MOTION Miscellaneous Pretrial Relief. . (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: 5/3/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 4/21/2017 re: We respectfully request to update the Court further regarding Maiden's privilege invocations in one month, by May 21, 2017..ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. Defense counsel must be prepared to advise the Court by May 21, 2017. Don't they wish to proceed concerning the documents (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/2/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 282 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat re: [269] MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re [266] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count . (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 281 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: 4/21/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated April 21, 2017 re: update on status of privilege issues relating to the production of documents by Stephen Maiden (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 280 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: 4/19/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Benjamin Adam Silverman appearing for Irfan Amanat. Appearance Type: CJA Appointment. (Silverman, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 279 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: 4/14/2017 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [276] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jeffrey Ilan Salomon withdrawn from case as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion by Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP to withdraw the appearance of Jeffrey Ilan Salomon as counsel for Tuzman in the above-referenced action is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/13/2017) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 278 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/11/2017 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO STRIKE DOCKET ENTRIES [272] Motion to Strike Document No. [266, 267 and 268] as to Omar Amanat. Respectfully move to strike docket entries 266, 267, and 268, in which we inadvertently filed incorrect documents. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/10/2017) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 277 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated 3/31/2017 re: We respectfully submit this letter on behalf of our client, Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, to update the Court on the status of privilege issues relating to the production of documents by Stephen Maiden ("Maiden"). Accordingly, on behalf of Mr. Isaza Tuzman, we respectfully request to update the Court further regarding Maiden's privilege invocations in three weeks, by April 21, 2017....ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/10/2017)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Note Regarding Stricken Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***STRICKEN DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [266, 267 and 268] from the case record, as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. The document was stricken from this case pursuant to [278] Order on Motion to Strike (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017, Terminated: 4/14/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Jeffrey Ilan Salomon to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 275 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Joshua Arditi Naftalis appearing for USA. (Naftalis, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 274 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: 4/4/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [261] LETTER MOTION as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1). ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/4/2017) (ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 273 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Silvia L. Serpe dated 4/3/2017 re: Request to modify travel restrictions (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Note Rejection of Duplicate Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. [270], as to Omar Amanat, HAS BEEN REJECTED. THIS IS A DUPLICATED DOCUMENT. Note to Attorney Eric M. Creizman : This is a Duplicate Document. Do Not Re-File. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Note Rejection of Duplicate Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. [267], as to Omar Amanat, HAS BEEN REJECTED. THIS IS A DUPLICATED DOCUMENT. Note to Attorney Eric M. Creizman : This is a Duplicate Document. Do Not Re-File. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 272 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 4/10/2017 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike Document No. [266, 267, and 268] because those documents were inadvertently filed in support of Omar Amanat's pretrial motions. Docket Entries 269, 270, and 271 represent the motion papers we intended to file. Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 271 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Eric M. Creizman in Support as to Omar Amanat re: [269] MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re [266] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-9/19/2016 Letter requesting bill of particulars regarding Indictment S-7, # (2) Exhibit B-3/15/2017 Letter requesting bill of particulars regarding Indictment S-8, # (3) Exhibit C-7/13/2016 Transcript of O. Amanat Bail Hearing)(Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat re [269] MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re [266] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count. CORRECTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Creizman, Eric) Modified on 4/3/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 269 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 10/19/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Notice of Omar Amanat's Pretrial Motions re [266] MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count 4ss for duplicity. MOTION to Strike Document No. [Portions of the Indictment] . MOTION to Compel . MOTION for Discovery . MOTION for Release of Brady Materials . MOTION Exhibit List and Witness List . . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 265 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Avi Weitzman dated March 31, 2017 re: update on status of privilege issues relating to the production of documents by Stephen Maiden (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Silvia L. Serpe in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [262] MOTION Miscellaneous Pretrial Relief.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1/11/17 Emails, # (2) Exhibit 3/6/17 Letter, # (3) Exhibit 3/2017 Emails, # (4) Exhibit 3/2017 Emails, # (5) Exhibit Extradition Order, # (6) Exhibit Extradition Package, # (7) Exhibit Highlighted S8 Indictment, # (8) Exhibit Extradition Treaty, # (9) Exhibit Extradition Resolution, # (10) Exhibit Colombian Treatise, # (11) Exhibit UK Decision, # (12) Exhibit FINRA Decision, # (13) Exhibit Fortune Article, # (14) Exhibit NYT Article, # (15) Exhibit SEC Decision)(Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [262] MOTION Miscellaneous Pretrial Relief.. (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 262 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017, Terminated: 10/19/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Miscellaneous Pretrial Relief. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 261 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017, Terminated: 4/4/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Silvia L. Serpe dated March 27, 2017 re: Endorsement of Agreement with Government regarding Bill of Particulars . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 260 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: 3/27/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Silvia L. Serpe dated March 27, 2017 re: Response to Gov't Letter (Dkt. 259) (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 259 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated March 24, 2017 re: Walters Decision Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 258 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Malgorzata W. Witek in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: 3/20/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Amanda L. Blaurock in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Flight Receipt, # (2) Exhibit Flight Receipt, # (3) Exhibit Email)(Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Notice to Attorney Silvia L. Serpe to RE-FILE Document [255] Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion. Use the event type Declaration in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman: Notice to Attorney Silvia L. Serpe to RE-FILE Document [254] Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion. Use the event type declaration in support of motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 256 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Silvia L. Serpe dated March 17, 2017 re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct. re: Request for Oral Argument on Motion (Dkt. 236) . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 255 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Malgorzata W. Witek in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Serpe, Silvia) Modified on 3/20/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Reply Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Amanda L. Blaurock in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Flight Receipt, # (2) Exhibit Flight Receipt, # (3) Exhibit Email)(Serpe, Silvia) Modified on 3/20/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: 3/17/2017 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct. . (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 252 Filed: 3/11/2017, Entered: 3/13/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [251] LETTER MOTION filed by USA as to Stephen E. Maiden (3), addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated March 9, 2017 re: Maiden Sentencing. The Government respectfully submits this letter, with consent of defense counsel, to request that the Court adjourn Stephen Maiden's March 13, 2017 sentencing control date for at least 90 days. ENDORSEMENT: Sentencing is adjourned to August 15, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/13/2017) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to (S4-15-Cr-536-03) Stephen E. Maiden: Sentencing set for 8/15/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 251 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: 3/9/2017, Terminated: 3/11/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated March 9, 2017 re: Maiden Sentencing . Document filed by USA as to Stephen E Maiden. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 250 Filed: 3/8/2017, Entered: 3/8/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [248] LETTER MOTION filed by USA as to Robin Smyth (2), addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated March 3, 2017 re: Smyth Sentencing. The Government respectfully submits this letter, with the consent of defense counsel, to request that the Court adjourn the sentencing control date in the above-referenced case for 90 days. ENDORSEMENT: Sentencing is adjourned to August 8, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/7/2017) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to (S2-15-Cr-536-02) Robin Smyth: Sentencing set for 8/8/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Castro Declaration, # (2) Affidavit Cobar Declaration, # (3) Exhibit Cobar Exhibit 1, # (4) Exhibit Cobar Exhibit 2, # (5) Exhibit Cobar Exhibit 3, # (6) Exhibit Cobar Exhibit 4, # (7) Exhibit Cobar Exhibit 5, # (8) Exhibit Cobar Exhibit 6, # (9) Exhibit Cobar Exhibit 7, # (10) Exhibit Cobar Exhibit 8, # (11) Exhibit Cobar Exhibit 9, # (12) Affidavit Quintero Declaration, # (13) Affidavit Ramirez Declaration, # (14) Affidavit Williams Declaration)(Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 248 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017, Terminated: 3/8/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated March 3, 2017 re: Smyth Sentencing . Document filed by USA as to Robin Smyth. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 247 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: 3/3/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated March 3, 2017 re: Maiden documents Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 246 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to (15-Cr-536-04) Omar Amanat on re: [234] LETTER MOTION filed by Omar Amanat, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Attorney Eric M. Creizman dated 1/31/17 re: Motion to Modify Conditions of Release. ENDORSEMENT: The application for split residences is denied. Permitting a defendant to reside in two districts presents significant logistical and practical difficulties for the Pretrial Services Office. Acknowledging the parents' medical condition, the Defendant's brother lives with them, and can attend to their needs. Accordingly, it is not necessary fro the Defendant to maintain two residences in order to address his parents' medical needs. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/2/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 245 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: 3/1/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [244] LETTER MOTION filed by Irfan Amanat (7), addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Attorney Jill R. Shellow dated 02/27/2017 re: Request for Additional Time to File Pretrial Motions. I am writing pursuant to Your Honor's Order of January 20, 2017 setting the schedule for defendants' pretrial motions. For the reasons explained below, I am writing to request an additional 60 days for Irfan Amanat's pretrial motions to be filed. I propose that his motions be filed on May 26, 2017, that the Government response by filed by June 16, and that Irfan Amanat's reply, if any, be filed by June 30. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is granted. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 3/1/2017) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Irfan Amanat (7): Motions (by Defendant) due by 5/26/2017. Responses (by Government) due by 6/16/2017. Replies (by Defendant) due by 6/30/2017. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 244 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: 2/27/2017, Terminated: 3/1/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 02/27/2017 re: Request for Additional Time to File Pretrial Motions . Document filed by Irfan Amanat. (Shellow, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 243 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of KALEIL ISAZA TUZMAN in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 242 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: 2/17/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL: as to (S8-15-Cr-536-) Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1), Omar Amanat (4), Irfan Amanat (7). WHEREAS, on February 14, 2017, Kaleil Isaza Tuzman filed a motion for discovery and a hearing on the government's conduct (Dkt. #236); WHEREAS, on February 14, 2017, Mr. Isaza Tuzman publicly filed on ECF, among other supporting documents, a redacted version of the Declaration of Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, dated February 14, 2017 ("Isaza Tuzman Declaration")(Dkt. #239), which redacted highly personal and sensitive facts; WHEREAS, an additional word, referencing a highly personal and sensitive fact, should have been redacted from the redacted version of the Isaza Tuzman Declaration publicly filed on ECF as Dkt. #239; WHEREAS, by letter dated February 16, 2017, Mr. Isaza Tuzman, through counsel, requests that the Court order that the previously filed Declaration of Mr. Isaza Tuzman (Dkt. #239) be sealed in its entirety and Mr. Isaza Tuzman will re-file a corrected redacted version of the declaration; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The defendant's application is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall expeditiously place under seal Dkt. #239 (the Declaration of Mr. Isaza Tuzman) in the above-captioned action. Defendant will file a properly redacted version of the declaration by Feb. 21, 2017. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/17/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk: as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1), Omar Amanat (4), Irfan Amanat (7). Transmitted re: [242] ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANT'S APPLICATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing of document. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1): Brief (Declaration by defendant) due by 2/21/2017. [*** NOTE: Refer to Order, doc.#242. ***] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Jonathan B. New in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Redacted Emails, # (2) Exhibit Redacted Emails, # (3) Exhibit Redacted Emails)(Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 240 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Amanda L. Blaurock in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit Letters, # (4) Exhibit Email, # (5) Exhibit)(Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 239 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Kaleil Isaza Tuzman in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Miami Herald Nov. 24, 2015 Article, # (2) Exhibit Miami Herald Aug. 26, 2016 Article, # (3) Exhibit Huffington Post March 4, 2016 Article)(Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 238 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Silvia L. Serpe in Support as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Nov. 14, 2016 Letter, # (2) Exhibit Nov. 18, 2016 Letter, # (3) Exhibit Nov. 27, 2016 Letter, # (4) Exhibit Nov. 30, 2016 Letter, # (5) Exhibit Excerpt of 2014 Human Rights Report, # (6) Exhibit Excerpt of 2015 Human Rights Report, # (7) Exhibit Proposed Order)(Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re [236] MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct.. (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 236 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: 2/14/2017, Terminated: 11/16/2017 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Discovery & A Hearing on the Government's Conduct. Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 235 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: 2/10/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea M. Griswold dated 2.10.17 re: Joint Update Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 234 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017, Terminated: 3/2/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric Creizman dated 1/31/17 re: Motion to Modify Conditions of Release . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Polisi, Caroline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 233 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [229] LETTER MOTION Reschedule Sentencing as to Gavin Campion...ENDORSEMENT..Sentencing is adjourned to June 29, 2017 at 2:30pm. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/30/2017) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 232 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Damian Williams and Andrea M. Griswold dated 1/28/2016 re: The Government respectfully submits this letter jointly with counsel for defendants to update the Court on the status of privilege issues relating to the production of documents by Stephen Maiden ("Maiden"). The parties respectfully propose to jointly update the Court by February 10, 2017....ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/30/2017)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 231 Filed: 1/30/2017, Entered: 1/30/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 1.28.17 re: Update re Maiden Documents Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Gavin Campion: Sentencing set for 6/29/2017 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat: Notice to Attorney Andrea Michelle Griswold to RE-FILE Document [230] Letter. ERROR(S): Incorrect Letter date. Docket text letter date reads January 28, 2017, Letter date(PDF) reads January 28, 2016. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 1/28/2017, Entered: 1/28/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold re: 1.28.17 Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea) Modified on 1/30/2017 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: 1/27/2017, Terminated: 1/30/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 1.27.17 re: Adjournment of Sentencing Date - Gavin Campion . Document filed by USA as to Gavin Campion. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 228 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/10/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat re: Conference held on 1/10/17 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/27/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 226 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jill R. Shellow appearing for Irfan Amanat. Appearance Type: CJA Appointment. (Shellow, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 225 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Caroline Johnston Polisi appearing for Omar Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Polisi, Caroline)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 224 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: 1/20/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat( Motions due by 3/31/2017., Replies due by 5/5/2017., Responses due by 4/21/2017) It is hereby ORDERED that the following amended schedule will apply to Defendants' pretrial and discovery-related motions in this matter: Defendants' motions are due on March 31, 2017. The Government's opposition is due on April 21, 2017. Defendants' replies, if any, are due on May 5, 2017. It is further ORDERED that Defendant Irfan Amanat may - within thirty days of receipt of discovery - request additional time to prepare pretrial and discovery-related motions, in the event that additional time proves necessary (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/20/2017)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 223 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated 1.18.17 re: Motion Schedule Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 222 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Damian Williams and Andrea M. Griswold dated 1/13/2016 re: The Government respectfully submits this letter jointly with counsel for defendants to update the Court on the status of privilege issues relating to the production of documents by Stephen Maiden ("Maiden"). The parties respectfully propose to update the Court in two weeks, on January 27, 2017....ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/17/2017)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 268 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Eric M. Creizman in Support as to Omar Amanat re: 266 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count 4ss for duplicity. MOTION to Strike Document No. [Portions of the Indictment] . MOTION to Compel . MOTION for Discovery . MOTION for Release of Brady Materials . MOTION Exhibit List and Witness List .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9/19/2016 Letter requesting bill of particulars re Indictment S-7, # 2 Exhibit 3/15/2017 Letter requesting bill of particulars regarding Indictment S-8, # 3 Exhibit 7/13/2016 Tr. of O. Amanat Bail Hearing)(Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 221 Filed: 1/18/2017, Entered: 1/18/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat ( Motions due by 2/14/2017., Replies due by 3/17/2017., Responses due by 3/7/2017) It is ORDERED that Defendant Isaza Tuzman's motion to dismiss the indictment based on outrageous government conduct will proceed separately from Defendants' other pretrial motions, and will be briefed on the following schedule: Defendant's motion is due February 14, 2017. The Government's opposition is due March 7, 2017. Defendant's reply, if any, is due on March 17, 2017 (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/17/2017)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Omar Amanat re 266 MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss. MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman. MOTION to Dismiss Count 4ss for duplicity. MOTION to Strike Document No. [Portions of the Indictment] . MOTION to Compel . MOTION for Discovery . MOTION for Release of Brady Materials . MOTION Exhibit List and Witness List .. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 220 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: 1/16/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jill R. Shellow dated 01/16/2017 re: Motions Schedule . Document filed by Irfan Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. (Shellow, Jill)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Separate Trial on Counts Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss from Counts 5ss, 6ss., MOTION to Sever Defendant O. Amanat from K Tuzman., MOTION to Dismiss Count 4ss for duplicity., MOTION to Strike Document No. [Portions of the Indictment] ., MOTION to Compel ., MOTION for Discovery ., MOTION for Release of Brady Materials ., MOTION Exhibit List and Witness List . Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric) (Entered: 03/31/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 219 Filed: 1/16/2017, Entered: 1/16/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST LETTER by Omar Amanat as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Eric Creizman dated 1/16/17 re: Motion Schedule Document filed by Omar Amanat. (Creizman, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 218 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: 1/13/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Andrea Griswold dated Jan. 13, 2017 re: Update re Maiden Privilege Issue Document filed by USA. (Griswold, Andrea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 217 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to (15-Cr-536-01) Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. It is hereby ORDERED that the applications of Michael Beys, Joshua Liston, Amanda Lee Blaurock, and Jason Berland to withdraw as counsel for Defendant Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (Dkt. Nos. 205, 206, 209) are granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/12/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 216 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: 1/12/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to (15-Cr-536-07) Irfan Amanat. Jill Shellow is appointed to represent Defendant Irfan Amanat in this matter, pursuant to the Criminal Justice Act. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/12/2017)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Attorney update in case as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1). Attorneys: Amanda Lee Blaurock; Joshua Donovan Liston; Jason Hunt Berland; and Michael Petros Beys - terminated. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: 1/11/2017 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by (15-Cr-536-07) Irfan Amanat. APPROVED: (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/10/2017); CJA Attorney Jill R. Shellow. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G. Gardephe: Arraignment as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1) Count 4sss,5sss,6sss and Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss,4ss and Irfan Amanat (7) Count 1,2,3,6 held on 1/10/2017. Plea entered by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman (1) Count 4sss,5sss,6sss and Omar Amanat (4) Count 1ss,2ss,3ss,4ss and Irfan Amanat (7) Count 1,2,3,6 Not Guilty. Arraignment on (S8) superseding indictment held. Defendant Isaza Tuzman present with attorney Silva Serpe and Paul Ryan. Defendant Omar Amanat present with attorney Caroline Polisi. Defendant Irfan Amanat present with attorney Jill Shellow. AUSAs Andrea Griswold and Damian Williams present. Potal Inspector Melissa Atkins present. Court reporter Even Giniger present. The defendant's enter a plea of not guilty to the S8 indictment. Speedy trial time is excluded from 1/10/17 until 2/14/17. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Attorney update in case as to (15-Cr-536-07) Irfan Amanat. Attorney Jill R. Shellow for Irfan Amanat added. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 214 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address as to Gavin Campion. New Address: Walden Macht & Haran LLP, One Battery Park Plaza, 34th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10004, 212-335-2031. (Walden, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 213 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat, Irfan Amanat. It is hereby ORDERED that the conference currently scheduled for January 6, 2017 at 11 :00 a.m. is adjourned to January 10, 2017 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 1/10/2017 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/6/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 212 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman on re: [209] Letter filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted subject to Mr. Tuzman's consent at the upcoming conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/5/2017)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 211 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 12/9/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman re: Hearing held on 12/9/16 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 209 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Jason H. Berland dated January 3, 2017 re: to be relieved as counsel at upcoming status conference (Liston, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 208 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Amanda Lee Blaurock dated 1/3/2017 re: I write respectfully to be relieved as counsel for Mr. Isaza Tuzman at the upcoming status conference, currently scheduled for Friday, January 6th at 11 a.m....ENDORSEMENT... The application to be relieved as counsel is granted, subject to defendant Tuzman's consent. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/3/2017)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 207 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat (Status Conference set for 1/6/2017 at 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G. Gardephe) It is hereby ORDERED that a conference in this matter will take place on January 6, 2017 at 11 :00 a.m. in Courtroom 705 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/3/2017)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 206 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Amanda Lee Blaurock dated January 3, 2017 re: to be relieved as counsel at upcoming status conference (Weitzman, Avi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 205 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017, Terminated: 1/12/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Joshua D. Liston dated January 3, 2017 re: For Michael Beys and Joshua Liston to Withdraw as Counsel . Document filed by Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. (Liston, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 204 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Damian William and Andrea M. Griswold dated 12/30/2016 re: The Government respectfully submits this letter to update the Court on the status of the privilege review being conducted by counsel for Stephen Maiden ("Maiden")..ENDORSEMENT... SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 1/3/2017)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 203 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: 1/3/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul W. Ryan appearing for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman. Appearance Type: Retained. (Ryan, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 202 Filed: 1/2/2017, Entered: 1/2/2017 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Silvia L. Serpe appearing for Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Robin Smyth, Stephen E Maiden, Omar Amanat, Rima Jameel, Gavin Campion, Irfan Amanat. Appearance Type: Retained. (Serpe, Silvia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 201 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Kaleil Isaza Tuzman, Omar Amanat addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from AUSA Damian Williams dated December 30, 2016 re: Maiden Computer Update Document filed by USA. (Williams, A.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 16,848 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?