MRL Development I, LLC, et al v. Whitecap Investment Corp, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 14-4738

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 24, 2017 at 11:56 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012130801 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
Oral Argument Notification for Monday, 12/07/2015. (CMH)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012103193 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
    ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney John S. Baker, IV, Esq. for Appellee Great Southern Wood Preserving Inc. Certificate of Service dated 10/16/2015. (JSB)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012099444 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
      ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Thomas G. Wilkinson, Jr., Esq. for Appellants MRL Development I LLC and Michael R. Lucht. Certificate of Service dated 10/13/2015. (TGW)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012098675 Filed: 10/12/2015, Entered: None
        ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by Attorney Robert A. Carlson, Esq. for Appellees Putnam Lumber and Export Co and Putnam Family Properties Inc. Certificate of Service dated 10/12/2015. (RAC)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012098344 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
          ECF FILER: ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT filed by from Alex M. Moskowitz on behalf of Appellee(s) Whitecap Investment Corp. d/b/a Paradise Lumber.--[Edited 10/14/2015 by CMH] (AMM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003012097813 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: None
            Calendared for Wednesday, 12/09/2015 in St. Croix, USVI. (CMH)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011988903 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
              ECF FILER: STATUS REPORT received from Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC in 14-4738.. Certificate of Service dated 06/11/2015. [14-4738, 15-1921, 15-1922, 15-1923] (PMP)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011987371 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC REPLY BRIEF on behalf of Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC, filed. Certificate of Service dated 06/10/2015 by ECF. (JDB)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011976973 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                  ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to BRIEF on behalf of Appellees Putnam Family Properties Inc and Putnam Lumber and Export Co , filed. Certificate of Service dated 05/29/2015 by ECF. (RAC)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011976836 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                    NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellees Putnam Family Properties Inc and Putnam Lumber and Export Co regarding the brief filed on 05/27/2015. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 06/01/2015. This Order does not change the deadline for filing the next brief. (MCW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011974470 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellees Putnam Family Properties Inc and Putnam Lumber and Export Co, filed. Certificate of Service dated 03/27/2015 by ECF. (RAC)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011974425 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Whitecap Investment Corp, filed. Certificate of Service dated 05/27/2015 by ECF, US mail. --[Edited 05/28/2015 by EAF - Event modified] (AMM)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 003011973561 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                          ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF on behalf of Appellee Great Southern Wood Preserving Inc, filed. Certificate of Service dated 05/27/2015 by US mail. (SAK)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011945973 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                            ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC, filed. Certificate of service dated 04/27/2015 by ECF. (JDB)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011945883 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                              NON COMPLIANCE Order issued to Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC regarding the appendix filed on 04/27/2015. Please open the attachment for the full text of the Order. Compliance due by 04/30/2015. This Order does not change the deadline for filing the next brief. (MCW)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011945193 Filed: 4/27/2015, Entered: None
                                ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Appendix Volume I attached on behalf of Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC in 14-4738, filed. Certificate of Service dated 04/27/2015 by ECF. [Removed from 15-1921/15-1922/15-1923] (JDB)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011906301 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                  BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC due on or before 04/27/2015. Appendix due on or before 04/27/2015. (JK)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011906241 Filed: 3/17/2015, Entered: None
                                    ECF FILER: LETTER from Attorney Jared D. Bayer, Esq. for Appellants MRL Development I LLC and Michael R. Lucht Request a briefing schedule. Certificate of Service dated 03/17/2015. (JDB)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011904739 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
                                      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Robert A. Carlson on behalf of Appellee(s) Putnam Lumber & Export Company and Putnam Family Properties, Inc.. (RAC)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011901357 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jared D, Bayer on behalf of Appellant(s) MRL Development I LLC and Michael R. Lucht. (JDB)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011882317 Filed: 2/19/2015, Entered: None
                                          ORDER (Clerk) granting motion by Paul Platte, Esq. to the extent that Mr. Platte seeks to withdraw as counsel. No action will be taken on counsel's request for a stay as the case was stated by previous order. New counsel for Appellant, Thomas G. Wilkinson, Esq. is directed to advise the Clerk in writing within 10 days of the date of this order whether he intends to order transcripts. If counsel needs transcripts, a transcript purchase order must also be filed. If counsel does not need transcripts, the briefing schedule will be issued, filed. (SLC)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011875028 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None
                                            ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas G. Wilkinson on behalf of Appellant(s) MRL Development I LLC and Michael R. Lucht. (TGW)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011859847 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from S. Andrew Kelly on behalf of Appellee(s) Great Southern Wood Preserving, Inc.. (SAK)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011858582 Filed: 1/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lee Maxwell Hollis on behalf of Appellee(s) Great Southern Wood Preserving, Inc.. (LMH)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011855168 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John Stewart Baker, IV on behalf of Appellee(s) Great Southern Wood Preserving, Inc.. (JSB)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011851054 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION by Attorney Paul M. Platte, Esq. to Withdraw, Request to be Taken Off Service List, Motion for One Month Stay, and Memorandum of Law. Response due on 01/23/2015. Certificate of Service dated 01/10/2015. (TMK)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011845358 Filed: 1/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                      ORDER (Clerk) granting request for stay of case until Appellant's retain new counsel or reansfer case to prior counsel's new firm. The appeal is herebt stayed for thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Prior to the expiration of the stay, Appellants must either have new counsel enter an appearance in the case or prior counsel, Paul M. Platte, Esq. must inform the Court, in writing that he or his new firm will be handeling the case, filed. (TMK)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011845341 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: None
                                                        LETTER from Law Firm Rogers Townsend & Thomas P.C. requesting stay of case until Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC retain new counsel or transfer case to prior counsel's new firm. Certificate of Service dated 01/06/2015. (TMK)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011838229 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                          Notice to Counsel. (TNH)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011837493 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                            ECF FILER: NOT PARTICIPATION LETTER from Attorney Paul M. Platte, Esq. for Appellants MRL Development I LLC and Michael R. Lucht. Certificate of Service dated 01/02/2015.--[Edited 01/05/2015 by TMK] (PMP)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011834968 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                              ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC, received. (PMP)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011832242 Filed: 12/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                FOLLOW UP LETTER to Paul M. Platte, Esq. for MRL Development I LLC and Michael R. Lucht requesting the following document(s): Concise Summary on or before 01/07/2015. (TMK)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011832068 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC, filed. (PMP)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011832043 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC, filed. (PMP)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011831940 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I LLC advising this court that transcripts are not needed. (PMP)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011831870 Filed: 12/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Paul Martin Platte, Esquire on behalf of Appellant(s) MRL Development I, LLC and Michael R. Lucht. (PMP)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011829200 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Putnam Lumber and Export Co, filed. (LMK)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011829180 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Putnam Family Properties Inc, filed. (LMK)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011829166 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lisa Michelle Komives on behalf of Appellee(s) Putnam Lumber & Export Company; Putnam Family Properties, Inc.. (LMK)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011828307 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Great Southern Wood Preserving Inc, filed. (DCB)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011828304 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Daryl C. Barnes on behalf of Appellee(s) Great Southern Wood Preserving, Inc. (DCB)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011825876 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (AMM)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011825866 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Alex M. Moskowitz on behalf of Appellee(s) Whitecap Investment Corporation d/b/a Paradise Lumber. (AMM)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011824876 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        ORDER (Clerk) tentatively listing case for December 2015, filed. (OM)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 003011824767 Filed: 12/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Michael R. Lucht and MRL Development I, LLC in District Court No. 3-13-cv-00048.--[Edited 12/17/2014 by LML] (OM)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?