Holt v. Countrywide Home Loans
Federal Civil Lawsuit Indiana Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-00557

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 1:04 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS each of the Defendants' motions to dismiss 39 50 57 . The claims against Altisource are dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. The remaining claims are dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdict ion to the extent they seek to review or modify the judgment in the state court foreclosure proceeding, and for failure to state a claim to the extent they contest the manner in which the writ of assistance was executed, as explained. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in accordance with this order. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/10/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Response to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Notice - Other
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Brief in Support
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Dismiss
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Letter
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/18/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None Supplement
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?