Rosetta-Wireless Corp. v. LG Electronics Co. et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-10608
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 22, 2017 at 5:31 PM EDT (7.9 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Rosetta-Wireless Corp., Plaintiff

Represented by Kobre & Kim LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Kai Ng +1 415 582 4800 +1 415 582 4811 michael.ng@kobrekim.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Amon Zaheer +1 415 582 4800 +1 415 582 4811 daniel.zaheer@kobrekim.com

Represented by Stadheim & Grear, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle L Harvey +1 312 755 4400 +1 312 755 4408 harvey@stadheimgrear.com
LG Electronics USA, Inc. LG Electronics USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Figliulo & Silverman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Figliulo +1 312 251 4600 jfigliulo@fslegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Michelle Mazzone +1 312 251 4600 lmazzone@fslegal.com

Represented by Ipn Ip

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Lieberman +1 202 783 6040 slieberman@rothwellfigg.com

Represented by Leeney, Hugo Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joo Mee Kim +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 jkim@rfem.com

Represented by Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenny Leigh Colgate +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 jcolgate@rfem.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Andrew Tollefson +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 btollefson@rothwellfigg.com
v.
No Logo LG Electronics Co., Defendant

Represented by Figliulo & Silverman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Nicole Eubanks +1 312 251 5268 meubanks@fslegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Figliulo +1 312 251 4600 jfigliulo@fslegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Michelle Mazzone +1 312 251 4600 lmazzone@fslegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Daniel Warman +1 312 251 4600 twarman@fslegal.com

Represented by Ipn Ip

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Lieberman +1 202 783 6040 slieberman@rothwellfigg.com

Represented by Leeney, Hugo Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joo Mee Kim +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 jkim@rfem.com

Represented by Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenny Leigh Colgate +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 jcolgate@rfem.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Andrew Tollefson +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 btollefson@rothwellfigg.com
LG Electronics USA, Inc. LG Electronics USA, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Figliulo & Silverman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Nicole Eubanks +1 312 251 5268 meubanks@fslegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Figliulo +1 312 251 4600 jfigliulo@fslegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lisa Michelle Mazzone +1 312 251 4600 lmazzone@fslegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Daniel Warman +1 312 251 4600 twarman@fslegal.com

Represented by Ipn Ip

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Lieberman +1 202 783 6040 slieberman@rothwellfigg.com

Represented by Leeney, Hugo Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joo Mee Kim +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 jkim@rfem.com

Represented by Rothwell, Figg, Ernst & Manbeck, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jenny Leigh Colgate +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 jcolgate@rfem.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Andrew Tollefson +1 202 783 6040 +1 202 783 6031 btollefson@rothwellfigg.com
No Logo Rosetta-Wireless Corp., Counter-Defendant

Represented by Kobre & Kim LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Kai Ng +1 415 582 4800 +1 415 582 4811 michael.ng@kobrekim.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Amon Zaheer +1 415 582 4800 +1 415 582 4811 daniel.zaheer@kobrekim.com

Represented by Stadheim & Grear, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle L Harvey +1 312 755 4400 +1 312 755 4408 harvey@stadheimgrear.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Counterclaim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
AMENDED status report 34 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ng, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
STATUS Report by Rosetta-Wireless Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ng, Michael) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction regarding 32 . (rm, ) (Entered: 02/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that, for reasons of judicial efficiency, coordinated pretrial proceedings in the cases listed below should be presided over by a single district judge as provided for by IOP 13(e) and that a single magistrate judge should be designated for these cases; and It further appearing that the Hon. John H. Lefkow, has agreed to preside over these proceedings; and It further appearing that Magistrate Judge Susan E. Cox the designated Magistrate Judge in 15 C 799, Rosetta-Wireless Corp. v. Apple Inc. et al, shall be the designated magistrate judge in these proceedings; therefore It is hereby ordered that Judge Lefkow shall preside over pretrial proceedings, in the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Susan E. Cox shall be the designated Magistrate Judge in the cases listed below; and It is further ordered that these cases shall remain pending on the calendars of the judges to whom they are currently assigned, and that an order be entered in each case by Judge Lefkow at such time as coordinated pretrial proceedings have concluded. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/1/2016. (rm, ) (Docket Text Modified by the Clerk's Office on 2/5/2016) (rm, ). (Entered: 02/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
ORDER: By agreement of all assigned judges, the following cases are referred to the Executive Committee for consolidation under Internal Operating Procedure 13(e) with Case No. 15 C 799, Rosetta- Wireless Corp v. Apple, Inc., for pretrial proceedings: 15 C 10603 Rosetta-Wireless Corp. v. High Tech Computer Corp. et al, 15 C 10605 Rosetta-Wireless Corp. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al. 15 C 10608 Rosetta-Wireless Corp. v. LG Electronics Co. et al 15 C 10611 Rosetta-Wireless Corp. v. Motorola Mobility LLC. Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/27/2016. mailed notice(tg, ) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Status hearing set for 03/10/2016 at 10:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Additionally, the parties must read Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures on the Court's website; those Procedures are considered standing orders in this case. Judge Chang's Case Management Procedures were revised in December 2014.Emailed notice (Attachments: # 1 Status Report Requirements) (slb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that the Hon. Joan H. Lefkow has determined numerous parties were improperly joined in case 15 C 799, Rosetta-Wireless Corp. v. Apple Inc. et al, and were dismissed with leave to file new cases; and It further appearing plaintiff designated the new cases as refilings and they were assigned directly to the calendar of the Hon. Joan H. Lefkow instead of randomly; therefore It is hereby ordered that the Clerk of Court is to randomly reassign the cases listed below to other judges and randomly designate a magistrate judge in each case. Case reassigned to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/25/2016.(mr, ) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LG Electronics Co., LG Electronics USA Inc. by Melissa Nicole Eubanks (Eubanks, Melissa) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LG Electronics Co., LG Electronics USA Inc. by Thomas Daniel Warman (Warman, Thomas) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow:Motion hearing held on 1/12/2016. Plaintiff's motion for alternative service 14 is granted. Plaintiff is permitted to serve LG Electronics Co. and LG Electronics USA via its U.S. counsel. Defendants are given until 4/11/2016 to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's complaint.Mailed notice (mad, ) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None
REPLY by Plaintiff Rosetta-Wireless Corp. to answer to complaint, counterclaim 18 (Zaheer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE by LG Electronics Co.in Opposition to MOTION 14 Opposition of LG Electronics, Inc. to Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.4(f)(3), or in the alternative, for Clarification (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Jenny L. Colgate in Support of Opposition of LG Electronics, Inc. to Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service Pursuant to F.R.C.P.4(f)(3) or in the alternative for Clarification)(Mazzone, Lisa) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by LG Electronics USA Inc. re answer to complaint, counterclaim 18 (Mazzone, Lisa) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Counterclaim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Daniel A. Zaheer for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 14 before Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 1/12/2016 at 11:00 AM. (Zaheer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION 14 & notice of filing 15 . (kp, ) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE by Rosetta-Wireless Corp. re other, 14 for Presentment of Motion for Alternative Service (Zaheer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
MOTION for Alternative Service by Rosetta-Wireless Corp. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service, # 2 Declaration of Daniel A. Zaheer in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Alternative Service, # 3 Exhibits to Declaration of Daniel A. Zaheer)(Zaheer, Daniel) (Docket Text modified by Clerks Office). (kp, ). (Entered: 12/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LG Electronics Co., LG Electronics USA Inc. by Lisa Michelle Mazzone (Mazzone, Lisa) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants LG Electronics Co., LG Electronics USA Inc. by James R. Figliulo (Figliulo, James) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosetta-Wireless Corp. as to LG Electronics USA Inc. on 12/2/2015, answer due 12/23/2015. (Zaheer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (kp, ) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rosetta-Wireless Corp. by Kyle L. Harvey (Harvey, Kyle) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rosetta-Wireless Corp. by Daniel A. Zaheer (Zaheer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Rosetta-Wireless Corp. by Michael K Ng (Ng, Michael) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Rosetta-Wireless Corp. RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Harvey, Kyle) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 82 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?