Equity Trust Company v. Robert Curtis
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 15-60355

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2017 at 12:45 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 2290 - Real Property: Other
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503281885 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None
JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. [15-60355] (JRS)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503281865 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [15-60355 Affirmed ] Judge: TMR , Judge: JES , Judge: CH. Mandate pull date is 01/14/2016 [15-60355] (JRS)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503198627 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
      APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED . # of Copies Provided: 0 E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Reply Brief due on 10/05/2015 for Appellant Equity Trust Company. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/28/2015 for Appellee Robert A. McDonald. [15-60355]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Appellee Mr. Robert A. McDonald. Date of service: 09/18/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Barber; Attorney for Appellees: Graben, Raab, Soni [15-60355] (Sushma Soni )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503170597 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
        RESPONSE filed by Attorney Mr. John Paul Barber for Appellant Equity Trust Company [7997112-1] to the show cause order for failure to submit paper copies [7991172-2] [15-60355]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Equity Trust Company [7997112-1] to the show cause order failure to submit paper copies filed by Mr. John Paul Barber in 15-60355 [7991172-2] Date of Service: 08/26/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Barber; Attorney for Appellees: Graben, Raab, Soni. [15-60355] (John Paul Barber )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503167630 Filed: 8/25/2015, Entered: None
          DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the response of attorney John Paul Barber to the court's show cause order because it must be filed electronically rather than in paper form [15-60355] (AGL)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503162138 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None
            RECORD EXCERPTS MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellant Equity Trust Company in 15-60355 [7975040-2]. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 08/25/2015 for Appellant Equity Trust Company. [15-60355] (SBS)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503161313 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
              SHOW CAUSE ORDER issued to Mr. John Paul Barber for Equity Trust Company for failure to submit paper copies of the appellant's brief [7991172-2] Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/24/2015 for Appellant Equity Trust Company. [15-60355] (AGL)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503148989 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellee's brief filed by Appellee Mr. Robert A. McDonald [7982274-2] Appellee's Brief due on 09/18/2015 for Appellee Robert A. McDonald. [15-60355] (AGL)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503148899 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                  UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Mr. Robert A. McDonald to extend time to file brief of appellee until 09/18/2015 [7982274-2]. Date of service: 08/11/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Barber; Attorney for Appellees: Graben, Raab, Soni [15-60355] (Sushma Soni )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503147761 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                    BRIEF MADE SUFFICIENT filed by Appellant Equity Trust Company in 15-60355 [7964043-2]. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 08/17/2015 for Appellant Equity Trust Company. [15-60355] (ADB)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503137765 Filed: 7/31/2015, Entered: None
                      RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require a Table of Contents, District Court Docket Sheets, Certificate of Service, and Tabs. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 08/19/2015 for Appellant Equity Trust Company [15-60355]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Equity Trust Company. Date of service: 07/31/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Barber; Attorney for Appellees: Graben, Raab, Soni [15-60355] (John Paul Barber )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503120483 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: None
                        APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED Instructions to Attorney: BRIEF INSUFFICIENT (BRIEF IS SCANNED, No Standard of Review, Record Excerpts Attached). PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Record Excerpts due on 07/31/2015 for Appellant Equity Trust Company. Sufficient Brief due on 08/06/2015 for Appellant Equity Trust Company.. Appellee's Brief due on 08/19/2015 for Appellee Robert A. McDonald [15-60355]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Equity Trust Company. Date of service: 07/17/2015 via email - Attorney for Appellant: Barber; Attorney for Appellees: Graben, Raab, Soni; US mail - Attorney for Appellees: Graben, Raab, Soni [15-60355] (John Paul Barber )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503065377 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                          BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/13/2015 for Appellant Equity Trust Company. [15-60355] (MRB)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503053166 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
                            INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [7920004-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [15-60355] (CB)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00503048738 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                              US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Equity Trust Company. [15-60355] (DLJ)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 181 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?