Linda Lamb v. GMAC Mortgage, LLC, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 11-10473

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 1:57 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3230 - Real Property: Rent Lease Ejectment
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106235916 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: None
ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R.42-1(b), this appeal is DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Linda Faye Lamb has failed to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106219724 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None
    ORDER: Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Linda Faye Lamb is DENIED [6254251-2] SM
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106187451 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
      APPEARANCE of Counsel filed by Attorney Teah N. Glenn for Appellee GMAC Mortgage, LLC in 11-10473.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106179105 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
        According to our records, Teah N. Glenn for FNM and GMAC Mortgage, LLC is not a member of the Elevent Circuit bar. An appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and return the required application for admission.
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106179100 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None
          APPEARANCE of Counsel filed by Attorney Alexandria Reyes for Appellee GMAC Mortgage, LLC in 11-10473.
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106179082 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
            Amended Notice of Appeal filed by Party Linda Faye Lamb.
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01106179033 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None
              MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Party Linda Faye Lamb. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [6254251-1]
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 90 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?