Richardson v. The City Of New York ,et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-05775
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 25, 2019 at 3:45 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Luke Richardson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stecklow Cohen & Thompson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Allen Thompson +1 212 566 8000 +1 212 202 4952 dthompson@wylielaw.com
v.
No Logo Chao Li, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer, (Shield No. 28060)
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Charles Carey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer, (Shield No. 1361)
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a municipal entity
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a municipal entity
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo David Scott, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer, (Shield No. 8533)
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Det. Solomon Chinery, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Everett Reyes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer, (Shield No. 14434)
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Former Mayor Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Halima Smith, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer, (Shield No. 3680)
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Ivan Bautista, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer, (Shield No. 10074) Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo James McNamara, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Deputy Chief
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Deputy Chief
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Esposito, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Former NYPD Chief of Patrol
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Former NYPD Chief of Patrol
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Luven Gilbert-Figeroa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer, (Shield No. 9189)
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Nelson Frias, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer, (Shield No. 4054)
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo NYPD "John Doe" Squad 1 Sergeant, Defendant
No Logo NYPD "John Doe' Cap Wearing Officer, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Captain Mark Iocco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo NYPD Officer "John Doe" Squad 1 Officer 1, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Officer "John Doe" Squad 2 Officer, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Officer "John Doe" Squad Officer 3, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Officer "John Doe" Squads Lieutenant, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Officer "John Doe" Third Sergeant, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Officer "John Doe' Second Captain, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Officer "John Doe' Squad Officer 2, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Officer John Doe, Defendant
No Logo NYPD Sergeant John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Police Commissioner Ray Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Former NYPD
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Former NYPD
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Raymundo Flete, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Officer, (Shield No. 14271)
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Regina Vailes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Shield No. 4132
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Sergeant Carleton Suddler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Steven Anger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Deputy Chief
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Deputy Chief
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Thomas P. Purtell, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Assistant Chief
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Joy Tolulope Anakhu +1 212 356 2323 janakhu@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Assistant Chief
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Vallison Isaac, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer, (Shield No. 1647)
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Vito Campanelli, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by NYC Law Department, Office of the Corporation Counsel (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NYPD Officer, (Shield No. 31604)
TERMINATED: 09/30/2016 Andrew J. Lucas +1 212 788 1273 +1 212 788 9776 alucas@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Order of Dismissal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 84 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 83 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, . . Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 89 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 84 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 83 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, . . Document filed by Ivan Bautista, Mark Iocco, Carleton Suddler. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 10/28/2016)
                        LREF
                        Blank 88 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 84 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 83 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, ., 86 MOTION for Reconsideration Amended Memorandum of Law. Formatting errors have been corrected for the convenience of the court. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 84 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 83 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, . Refiled as instructed.. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Reconsideration Amended Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Luke Richardson.(Thompson, David) Modified on 10/17/2016 (db). (Entered: 10/15/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Reconsideration Memorandum of Law. Document filed by Luke Richardson.(Thompson, David) Modified on 10/17/2016 (db). (Entered: 10/15/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MOTION for Reconsideration re; 83 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,, . Document filed by Luke Richardson.(Thompson, David) (Entered: 10/14/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 83 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' motion to dismiss, (Dkt. No. 68), is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, all claims are dismissed except for Richardson's false arrest and First Amendment retaliation claims against defendants Captain Iocco, Officer Bautista, and Sergeant Suddler. Richardson's motion to amend is also denied in part and granted in part. The PAC is deemed filed, asserting claims by Richardson for false arrest and First Amendment retaliation against Captain Iocco, Officer Bautista, and Sergeant Suddler. All claims against the City of New York, Mayor Bloomberg, NYPD Commissioner Kelly, Chief of Department Esposito, Assistant Chief Purtell, Deputy Chief Anger, Deputy Chief McNamara, Officer Vailes, Officer Scott, Officer Smith, Officer Li, Officer Frias, Officer Flete, Officer Isaac, Officer Reyes, Officer Gilbert-Figueroa, Officer Campanelli, Detective Chinnery, Officer Carey, Second Captain, Squad 1 Sergeant, Squad 1 Officer 1, Squad 1 Officer 2, Squad 1 Officer 3, Squad 2 Officer, Squads Lieutenant, Third Sergeant and Cap Wearing Officer are dismissed and they are no longer parties to this action. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/30/2016) (kko) (Entered: 09/30/2016)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 82 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, Michael Bloomberg, Vito Campanelli, Charles Carey, Solomon Chinery, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Raymundo Flete, Nelson Frias, Luven Gilbert-Figeroa, Mark Iocco, Vallison Isaac, Ray Kelly, Chao Li, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, Everett Reyes, David Scott, Halima Smith, Carleton Suddler, Regina Vailes. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 81 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated March 25, 2016 re: Proposed Amended Complaint. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - Redline of Proposed Amended Complain)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joseph Lucas on behalf of Joseph Esposito, Raymundo Flete, Nelson Frias, Luven Gilbert-Figeroa, Mark Iocco, Vallison Isaac, Ray Kelly, Chao Li, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, Everett Reyes, David Scott, Halima Smith, Carleton Suddler, Regina Vailes. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 03/08/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: 1. Time to serve Officer Scott extended through March 2, 2016 under Rule 4(m). 2. Assuming Officer Scott is represented by Corporation Counsel, the Notice of Motion to Dismiss is deemed amended to include Officers Scott and Issac. 3. Plaintiff's time to respond to the motion is extended to March 25, 2016. Plaintiff will annexed a proposed amended complaint marked to show changes. Defendants time to reply is set for April 15, 2016 and may include arguments under the futility doctrine. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Responses due by 3/25/2016.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/26/2016) (spo) Modified on 2/26/2016 (spo). (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 77 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew Lucas dated 2/24/2016 re: Supplemental information regarding Officer Scott offered prior to the February 26, 2016 conference. Document filed by Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, Michael Bloomberg, Vito Campanelli, Charles Carey, Solomon Chinery, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Raymundo Flete, Nelson Frias, Luven Gilbert-Figeroa, Mark Iocco, Vallison Isaac, Ray Kelly, Chao Li, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, Everett Reyes, Halima Smith, Carleton Suddler, Regina Vailes.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 02/24/2016)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 76 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER granting 74 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Time to respond to motion is stayed. Counsel shall appear at a conference on Feb. 26, 2016 at 12:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/18/2016) (spo) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated February 17, 2016 re: Defendants' SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER MOTION. Document filed by Luke Richardson.(Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for plaintiff to serve PO Scott under 4(m) and regarding 12(b) motion, addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew Lucas dated 2/17/2016. Document filed by Vallison Isaac.(Lucas, Andrew) Modified on 2/19/2016 (ldi). (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joseph Lucas on behalf of Vallison Isaac. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated February 16, 2016 re: Extension of time to serve and to respond to pending motion. Document filed by Luke Richardson.(Thompson, David) (Entered: 02/16/2016)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting 66 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; granting 67 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application granted, DE 66 and DE 67. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/1/2016) (spo) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, Michael Bloomberg, Vito Campanelli, Charles Carey, Solomon Chinery, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Raymundo Flete, Nelson Frias, Luven Gilbert-Figeroa, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, Chao Li, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, Everett Reyes, Luke Richardson, Halima Smith, Carleton Suddler, Regina Vailes. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Joy Anakhu in Support re: 68 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, Michael Bloomberg, Vito Campanelli, Charles Carey, Solomon Chinery, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Raymundo Flete, Nelson Frias, Luven Gilbert-Figeroa, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, Chao Li, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, Everett Reyes, Luke Richardson, Halima Smith, Carleton Suddler, Regina Vailes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, Michael Bloomberg, Vito Campanelli, Charles Carey, Solomon Chinery, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Raymundo Flete, Nelson Frias, Luven Gilbert-Figeroa, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, Chao Li, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell, Everett Reyes, Halima Smith, Carleton Suddler, Regina Vailes.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b) Briefing Papers addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Joy Anakhu dated January 29, 2016. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Fed. R. Civ. P.12(b) Briefing Papers addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Joy T. Anakhu dated January 28, 2016. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell.(Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joy Tolulope Anakhu on behalf of Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph Esposito. (Anakhu, Joy) (Entered: 01/28/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 12/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 62 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated 12/16/2015 re: Response to defendants pre-motion letter. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants are free to make their motion provided it is filed by January 29, 2016. Plaintiff's response is due February 26, 2016. Any reply is due March 10, 2016. Any prior conference date is vacated. Discovery is stayed. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 1/29/2016. Responses due by 2/26/2016. Replies due by 3/10/2016.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/22/2015) (adc) (Entered: 12/23/2015)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 62 Letter re: Response to defendants pre-motion letter re: 12b6 motion, filed by Luke Richardson. ENDORSEMENT: City to Provide or confirm business addresses for Scott, Carey and Issac by January 15, 2016. For good cause shown time to serve said individuals is extended to February 16, 2016. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/16/2015) (spo) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated 12/16/2015 re: Response to defendants pre-motion letter re: 12b6 motion. Document filed by Luke Richardson.(Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Halima Smith served on 12/16/2015, answer due 1/6/2016. Service was accepted by PO DEL-LLANO. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Everett Reyes served on 12/16/2015, answer due 1/6/2016. Service was accepted by PO DEL-LLANO. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Regina Vailes served on 12/16/2015, answer due 1/6/2016. Service was accepted by PO DEL-LLANO. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Carleton Suddler served on 12/16/2015, answer due 1/6/2016. Service was accepted by PO DEL-LLANO. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Luven Gilbert-Figeroa served on 12/16/2015, answer due 1/6/2016. Service was accepted by PO DEL-LLANO. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Ivan Bautista served on 12/16/2015, answer due 1/6/2016. Service was accepted by PO DEL-LLANO. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Nelson Frias served on 12/15/2015, answer due 1/5/2016. Service was accepted by Raymundo Flete. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Raymundo Flete served on 12/15/2015, answer due 1/5/2016. Service was accepted by Raymundo Flete. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated December 16, 2015 re: Pre-motion letter requesting motion for extension of time to serve process. Document filed by Luke Richardson.(Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Solomon Chinery served on 12/15/2015, answer due 1/5/2016. Service was accepted by PPA K. Hawkins. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Vito Campanelli served on 12/15/2015, answer due 1/5/2016. Service was accepted by PPA K. Hawkins. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Chao Li served on 12/15/2015, answer due 1/5/2016. Service was accepted by PO Schropfer. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 12/15/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew Lucas dated 12/14/2015. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Mark Iocco, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting 45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Granted. Application granted. (Steven Anger answer due 12/14/2015.) (Michael Bloomberg answer due 12/14/2015.) (City of New York answer due 12/14/2015.) (Ray Kelly answer due 12/14/2015.) (James McNamara answer due 12/14/2015.) (Thomas P. Purtell answer due 12/14/2015.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/14/2015) (spo) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew Lucas dated 10/14/15., CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew Lucas dated 10/14/15. Document filed by Steven Anger, Michael Bloomberg, City of New York, Ray Kelly, James McNamara, Thomas P. Purtell.(Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ivan Bautista, Vito Campanelli, Charles Carey, Solomon Chinery, Raymundo Flete, Nelson Frias, Luven Gilbert-Figeroa, Vallison Isaac, Chao Li, Everett Reyes, David Scott, Halima Smith, Carleton Suddler, Regina Vailes. (moh) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD OFFICER IVAN BAUTISTA (SHIELD NO. 10074), NYPD OFFICER NELSON FRIAS (SHIELD NO. 4054), NYPD OFFICER HALIMA SMITH (SHIELD NO. 3680), NYPD OFFICER EVERETT REYES (SHIELD NO. 14434), NYPD OFFICER DAVID SCOTT (SHIELD NO. 8533), NYPD OFFICER CHARLES CAREY (SHIELD NO. 1361), NYPD OFFICER RAYMUNDO FLETE (SHIELD NO. 14271), NYPD OFFICER VALLISON ISAAC (SHIELD NO. 1647), SERGEANT CARLETON SUDDLER, NYPD OFFICER REGINA VAILES (SHIELD NO. 4132), NYPD OFFICER LUVEN GILBERT-FIGUEROA (SHIELD NO. 9189), NYPD OFFICER VITO CAMPANELLI (SHIELD NO. 31604), NYPD OFFICER CHAO LI (SHIELD NO. 28060), DET. SOLOMON CHINNERY, re: 29 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 10/06/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Ray Kelly served on 9/24/2015, answer due 10/15/2015. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana, Document Clerk NYC Law Dept. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Michael Bloomberg served on 9/24/2015, answer due 10/15/2015. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana, Document Clerk NYC Law Dept. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. City of New York served on 9/24/2015, answer due 10/15/2015. Service was accepted by Madelyn Santana, Document Clerk NYC Law Dept. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/24/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Thomas P. Purtell served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by David Goldfarb Legal Bureau. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. James McNamara served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by David Goldfarb Legal Bureau. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Mark Iocco served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by PAA Calvin Jeetoo. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Joseph Esposito served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by David Goldfarb Legal Bureau. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,,. Steven Anger served on 9/22/2015, answer due 10/13/2015. Service was accepted by Desk Officer Molina #10137. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 27 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by City of New York. ENDORSEMENT: The amended complaint having been filed, plaintiff's application is denied without prejudice to the right to seek the requested information in pretrial discovery. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/21/2015) (spo) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ray Kelly. (moh) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Bloomberg. (moh) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Bloomberg, re: 29 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ray Kelly, re: 29 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Stecklow, Wylie) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 28 Amended Complaint,,,,, 1 Complaint,,,,,, against Steven Anger, Ivan Bautista, Michael Bloomberg, Vito Campanelli, Charles Carey, Solomon Chinery, City of New York, Joseph Esposito, Raymundo Flete, Nelson Frias, Luven Gilbert-Figeroa, Mark Iocco, Vallison Isaac, Ray Kelly, Chao Li, James McNamara, NYPD "John Doe' Cap Wearing Officer, NYPD "John Doe" Squad 1 Sergeant, NYPD Officer "John Doe' Second Captain, NYPD Officer "John Doe' Squad Officer 2, NYPD Officer "John Doe" Squad 1 Officer 1, NYPD Officer "John Doe" Squad 2 Officer, NYPD Officer "John Doe" Squad Officer 3, NYPD Officer "John Doe" Squads Lieutenant, NYPD Officer "John Doe" Third Sergeant, Thomas P. Purtell, Everett Reyes, David Scott, Halima Smith, Carleton Suddler, Regina Vailes with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Luke Richardson. Related document: 28 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Luke Richardson, 1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Luke Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint,,,,,, against NYPD Deputy Chief Steven Anger, City of New York, John Doe, John Doe, NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 1647), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 8533), NYPD Officer John Doe(Squad 1 Officer 3), NYPD Officer John Doe(Squad 1, Officer 1), NYPD Officer John Doe(Second Captain), NYPD Officer John Doe(Third Sergeant), Former NYPD Chief of Patrol Joseph Esposito, NYPD Captain Mark Iocco, NYPD Deputy Chief James McNamara, NYPD Assistant Chief Thomas P. Purtell, Raymod E. Kelly, Michael R. Bloomberg, Ivan Bautista, Nelson Frias, Halima Smith, Everett Reyes, David Scott, Charles Carey, Raymundo Flete, Vallison Isaac, Carleton Suddler, Regina Vailes, Luven Gilbert-Figeroa, Vito Campanelli, Chao Li with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Luke Richardson. Related document: 1 Complaint,,,,,, filed by Luke Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U)(Thompson, David) Modified on 9/18/2015 (moh). (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Andrew Lucas dated 9/16/15 re: 24 LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated September 10, 2015. . Document filed by City of New York. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 09/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 24 Letter Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff's letter was faxed to Chambers at 4PM on a Thursday. Monday is a religious holiday. Plaintiff's counsel first raised the issue with the City on August 11 and seeks to have the Court force responses on an accelerated basis. I will order counsel for defendants to respond by 2PM on September 16, 2015.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/10/2015) (spo) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Joseph Lucas on behalf of City of New York. (Lucas, Andrew) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Discovery addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from David A. Thompson, Esq. dated September 10, 2015. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit July 23, 2015 letter re identification of officers, # 2 Exhibit August 11, 2015 letter re identification of officers)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Doe, John Doe, NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 1647), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 8533), NYPD Officer John Doe(Squad 1 Officer 3), NYPD Officer John Doe(Squad 1, Officer 1), NYPD Officer John Doe(Second Captain), NYPD Officer John Doe(Third Sergeant), NYPD Officer John Doe(Squads Lieutenant), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 4132), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 31604), NYPD Officer John Doe(Sunglasses), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 1361), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 3680), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shild No. 10074), NYPD Officer John Doe(Squad 1, Officer 2), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 4054), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 1470), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 9189), NYPD Officer John Doe(Squad 2 Officer), NYPD Officer John Doe(Shield No. 14434), NYPD Sergeant John Doe(Squad 2), NYPD Sergeant John Doe(Squad 1). (moh) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/5/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NYPD JOHN DOE CAP WEARING OFFICER, NYPD JOHN DOE SQUAD 2 SERGEANT, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 4132, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SQUAD 1 OFFICER 2, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 1470, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 1647, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SQUAD 1 OFFICER 1, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SQUAD 1 OFFICER 3, NYPD JOHN DOE ASSISTANT OFFICER TO THIRD SERGEANT, NYPD JOHN DOE SQUAD 1 SERGEANT, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SECOND CAPTAIN, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 31604, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 9189, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SUNGLASSES, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE THIRD SERGEANT, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SQUAD 2 OFFICER, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SQUADS LIEUTENANT, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 10074, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 1361, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 14434, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 3680, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 4054, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 8533, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/22/2016 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/24/2015) (spo) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYPD Assistant Chief Thomas P. Purtell. (moh) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYPD Deputy Chief James McNamara. (moh) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYPD Captain Mark Iocco. (moh) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Former NYPD Chief of Patrol Joseph Esposito. (moh) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to NYPD Deputy Chief Steven Anger. (moh) (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. City of New York served on 7/23/2015, answer due 8/13/2015. Service was accepted by Betty Mazyck. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Purtell, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James McNamara, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Iocco, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Anger, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Esposito, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Anger, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (rch) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Iocco, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph Esposito, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Thomas Purtell, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven Anger, re: 1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Steven Anger, Mark Iocco, James McNamara, NYPD JOHN DOE CAP WEARING OFFICER, NYPD JOHN DOE SQUAD 2 SERGEANT, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 4132, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SQUAD 1 OFFICER 2, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 1470, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 1647, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SQUAD 1 OFFICER 1, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SQUAD 1 OFFICER 3, NYPD JOHN DOE ASSISTANT OFFICER TO THIRD SERGEANT, NYPD JOHN DOE SQUAD 1 SERGEANT, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SECOND CAPTAIN, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 31604, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 9189, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SUNGLASSES, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE THIRD SERGEANT, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SQUAD 2 OFFICER, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SQUADS LIEUTENANT, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 10074, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 1361, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 14434, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 3680, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 4054, NYPD OFFICER JOHN DOE SHIELD NO. 8533, Thomas Purtell, The City Of New York,, Joseph esposito. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11186441)Document filed by Luke Richardson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Ex B, # 3 Exhibit Ex C, # 4 Exhibit Ex D, # 5 Exhibit Ex E, # 6 Exhibit Ex F, # 7 Exhibit Ex G, # 8 Exhibit Ex H, # 9 Exhibit Ex I, # 10 Exhibit Ex J, # 11 Exhibit Ex K, # 12 Exhibit Ex L, # 13 Exhibit Ex M, # 14 Exhibit Ex N, # 15 Exhibit Ex O, # 16 Exhibit Ex P, # 17 Exhibit Ex Q, # 18 Exhibit Ex R, # 19 Exhibit Ex S, # 20 Exhibit Ex T, # 21 Exhibit Ex U)(Thompson, David) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 368 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?