KING v. CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-02061

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 9:20 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Extraction
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MEMORANDUM OPINION: For the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum Opinion, Plaintiffs' motion to strike, Dkt. 5 , will be denied. The Court further concludes that venue is improper in the United States District Court for the District of Columbia and orders that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Maryland. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/28/2016. (lcrdm1, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Strike
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Dismiss
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None Summons Returned as to private individual or business
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?