Conover v. Burnsville Chevrolet-Buick Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Western District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00267

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 16, 2018 at 6:48 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/10/2017, Entered: None Report of Mediation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None extension of time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None extension of time
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Filing
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Filing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER that the 19 Rule 26 Disclosures filed by the Defendants in this matter are hereby ORDERED to be STRICKEN and removed from the record due to Defendant's violation of LCvR 26.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/17/2016. (khm)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER Allowing 11 Consent Motion to Stay Initial Attorney's Conference. The time for filing the Certificate of Initial Attorney's Conference is hereby STAYED until fourteen (14) days after the joinder of issues in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/30/16. (emw) (Main Document 12 replaced on 3/30/2016) NEF regenerated. (emw).
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Stay
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None extension of time
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Affidavit of Service
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?