Nancy A Mikkelson
Bankruptcy Case Wisconsin Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 11-20489
District Judge Susan V. Kelley, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 10, 2019 at 2:43 AM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Mary B. Grossman, Trustee

Represented by Chapter 13 Milwaukee Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sue Chen +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2786 Sue.Chen@usdoj.gov

Represented by Chapter 13 Trustee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mary B. Grossman +1 414 271 3943 +1 414 271 9344
No Logo Nancy A Mikkelson, Debtor

Represented by DeLadurantey Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nathan E. DeLadurantey +1 414 377 0515 +1 414 755 0860 nathan@dela-law.com

Represented by Nickolai & Poletti, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/24/2012 Anton B. Nickolai +1 262 757 8444 +1 262 287 9725
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "Office of the U. S. Trustee"
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/11/2016, Entered: None
Objection to Confirmation of Plan with Notice and Certificate of Service (RE: 70 Motion to Modify Plan filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson) Hearing scheduled 2/2/2016 at 11:00 AM at Telephone Hearing. filed by Mary B. Grossman of Chapter 13 Trustee on behalf of Trustee Mary B. Grossman. (Grossman, Mary) (Entered: 01/11/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/9/2016, Entered: None
    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: 77 Order on Motion for Relief From Automatic Stay). Notice Date 01/09/2016. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/10/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
      Reclassification of Claim(s) number(s) 13,14 - Claims withdrawn pursuant to Order on 1/7/2016. (pcw) (pcw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None
        Order Granting Motion for Relief From Automatic Stay and Abandonment (Related Doc # 67). (pcw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          Affidavit of No Objection/Response/Answer filed by Shannon Kathleen Cummings on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., its successors, servicing agents, and/or assigns.. (RE: 67 Motion for Relief from Stay as to 1818 S 61st St, West Allis, WI 53214., Motion to Abandon ). (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter to Judge Kelley # 2 Affidavits of Service) (Cummings, Shannon) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: None
            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: 74 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 12/24/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/25/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
              Notice of Hearing to consider the Debtor's Objection to the Trustee's Motion to Modify the Plan (69). Hearing to be held on 1/12/2016 at 11:00 AM by telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-675-2535, and enter access code 9918878 before the scheduled hearing time. (pab, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                Certification of No Objection/Response/Answer Filed by Trustee Mary B. Grossman (Re: 61 Amended Chapter 13 Plan) (Grossman, Mary) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                  Certificate of Service filed by Anton B. Nickolai on behalf of Nancy A Mikkelson. (RE: 70 Motion to Modify Plan (RE: 4 Chapter 13 Plan) regarding 11 USC sec. 1329. ). (Nickolai, Anton) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                    Amended Schedule I, Schedule J, filed by Anton B. Nickolai on behalf of Nancy A Mikkelson. (Nickolai, Anton) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                      Motion to Modify Plan (RE: 4 Chapter 13 Plan) regarding 11 USC sec. 1329. with Notice of Motion filed by Anton B. Nickolai of Nickolai & Poletti, LLC on behalf of Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson. Objections due by 1/14/2016. (Nickolai, Anton) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: None
                        Objection Filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson (Re: 61 Amended Chapter 13 Plan filed by Trustee Mary B. Grossman) (Nickolai, Anton) (Entered: 12/21/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: 66 Order on Stipulation). Notice Date 12/16/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None
                            Motion for Relief from Stay as to 1818 S 61st St, West Allis, WI 53214., in addition to Motion to Abandon with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service filed by Shannon Kathleen Cummings of J Peterman Legal Group LTD on behalf of Creditor BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., its successors, servicing agents, and/or assigns.. Objections due by 12/30/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavits of Service # 2 Note, Mortgage, Assignment of Mortgage, Post Petition Payment History # 3 Declaration in Support of Motion for Relief) Fee Amount $176. (Cummings, Shannon) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None
                              Order Approving Substitution of Attorney for Debtor (RE: 65 Stipulation for Substitution of Attorney). (pcw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/14/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None
                                Stipulation for Substitution of Attorney for Debtors and Motion for Approval of Stipulation. (Nickolai, Anton) (Entered: 12/11/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/27/2015, Entered: None
                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: 63 Order on Motion To Limit Notice). Notice Date 11/27/2015. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/28/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                    Order Granting Motion To Limit Notice (Related Doc # 62). (pcw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                      Motion to Limit Notice (RE: 61 Amended Chapter 13 Plan) and Certificate of Service filed by Mary B. Grossman of Chapter 13 Trustee on behalf of Trustee Mary B. Grossman. (Grossman, Mary) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                        Amended Chapter 13 Plan with Notice and Certificate of Service. Plan was already confirmed, Filed by Mary B. Grossman on behalf of Mary B. Grossman (RE: 4 Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Anton B. Nickolai on behalf of Nancy A Mikkelson.). Objections due by 12/15/2015. (Grossman, Mary) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/31/2015, Entered: None
                                          Financial Management Course Certificate filed by Nathan E. DeLadurantey on behalf of Nancy A Mikkelson. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 08/31/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Change of Address for a Creditor filed by ECMC. (ECMC) (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: 57 Order Confirming Modified Plan). Notice Date 10/29/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                Order Confirming Modified Plan. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                  BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: 55 Order on Application for Compensation). Notice Date 10/19/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/20/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Order Granting Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Related Doc # 43) Fees awarded: $7408.35.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Certification of No Objection/Response/Answer Filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson (Re: 43 Interim Application for Compensation for Nathan E. DeLadurantey, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $7408.35, Expenses: $.) (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 10/15/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                        PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/14/2014 11:14:02 AM ]. File Size [ 4520 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:25 ]. (Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of the Plan). (admin). (Entered: 10/14/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: 51 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 10/01/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Notice of Hearing to consider the Trustee's Objection to Confirmation of the Plan (50). Hearing to be held on 10/14/2014 at 11:00 AM by telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-675-2535, and enter access code 9918878 before the scheduled hearing time. (pab, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Objection to Confirmation of Plan with Notice and Certificate of Service (RE: 49 Motion to Modify Plan filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson) filed by Mary B. Grossman of Chapter 13 Trustee on behalf of Trustee Mary B. Grossman. (Grossman, Mary) (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Motion to Modify Plan (RE: 4 Chapter 13 Plan) regarding 11 USC sec. 1329. with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service filed by Nathan E. DeLadurantey of DeLadurantey Law Office on behalf of Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson. Objections due by 9/26/2014. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Correspondence and request to cancel hearing filed by Nancy A Mikkelson. (RE: 43 Interim Application for Compensation for Nathan E. DeLadurantey, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $7408.35, Expenses: $.). (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (RE: 46 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/16/2014. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/17/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Notice of Hearing to consider the Debtor's Objection to the Interim Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Attorneys' Fees and Costs (45). Hearing to be held on 9/2/2014 at 11:00 AM by telephone. To appear by telephone, you must call the Court conference line at 1-888-675-2535, and enter access code 9918878 before the scheduled hearing time. (pab, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Objection Filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson (Re: 43 Interim Application for Compensation for Nathan E. DeLadurantey, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $7408.35, Expenses: $. filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson) (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Certification of No Objection/Response/Answer Filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson (Re: 43 Interim Application for Compensation for Nathan E. DeLadurantey, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $7408.35, Expenses: $.) (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Interim Application for Compensation for Nathan E. DeLadurantey, Debtor's Attorney, Fee: $7408.35, Expenses: $. with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service filed by Attorney Nathan E. DeLadurantey. Objections due by 8/12/2014. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 07/29/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Withdrawal of Document. This document is being withdrawn because the fee listed on the PPFN have been waived filed by Scott D. Nabke on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., its successors, servicing agents, and/or assigns.. (RE: doc Notice of Post Petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Nabke, Scott) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                Brief in Support of the Debtor's Objection to the Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges and Certificate of Service filed by Nathan E. DeLadurantey on behalf of Nancy A Mikkelson. and Certificate of Service. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Affidavit of Henry Longres, Assistant Vice President, Bank of America filed by Nathan E. DeLadurantey on behalf of Nancy A Mikkelson. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 38 Order Regarding Matter (Bankruptcy)) Notice Date 08/21/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      Order Regarding Motion to Amend (RE: 37 Motion to Amend (related document(s)30 Audio File) Briefing Schedule). (Kelley, Susan) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        Motion to Amend (related document(s)30 Audio File) Briefing Schedule filed by Nathan E. DeLadurantey of DeLadurantey Law Office on behalf of Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Objection Filed by Creditor BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., its successors, servicing agents, and/or assigns. (Re: 33 Motion for 2004 Examination of Shannon Cummings filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson) and Certificate of Service (With attachments) (Nabke, Scott) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 34 Notice of Hearing) Notice Date 07/31/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/01/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Notice of Hearing to consider the Objection of Bank of America, N.A. to the Motion for 2004 Exam of Fernando Sepulveda (32). Hearing to be held on 8/6/2013 at 11:00 AM by telephone. (pab, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                Motion for 2004 Examination of Shannon Cummings with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service filed by Nathan E. DeLadurantey of DeLadurantey Law Office on behalf of Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson. Objections due by 8/5/2013. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 07/29/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Objection Filed by Creditor BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., its successors, servicing agents, and/or assigns. (Re: 31 Motion for 2004 Examination filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson) and Certificate of Service (With attachments) (Nabke, Scott) (Entered: 07/26/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Motion for 2004 Examination with Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service filed by Nathan E. DeLadurantey of DeLadurantey Law Office on behalf of Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson. Objections due by 7/26/2013. (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 07/19/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 07/09/2013 11:55:37 AM ]. File Size [ 1944 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:04:03 ]. (Debtor's Objection to the Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges filed by Bank of America, N.A.). (admin). (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 28 Notice of Hearing) Notice Date 06/19/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/20/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Notice of Hearing to consider the Debtor's Objection to the Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges filed by Bank of America, N.A. (27). Hearing to be held on 7/9/2013 at 11:00 AM by telephone. (pab, Judicial Assistant) (Entered: 06/17/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Objection Filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson (Re: doc Notice of Post Petition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges filed by Creditor BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., its successors, servicing agents, and/or assigns.) and Certificate of Service (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 25 Notice of Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC) Notice Date 05/01/2013. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/02/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Assignment/Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: HSBC Bank Nevada, N.A. (Claim No. 4) To PRA Receivables Management, LLC Court to send Notice of Transfer of Claim. Objections due within 21 days of the date of this notice. Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC (Garcia, Dolores) (Entered: 04/27/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Bank of America N.A., et al c/o Prober & Raphael, A Law Corporation. (Prober, Dean) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 22 Substitute an Attorney) Notice Date 07/26/2012. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/27/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Order Granting Substitution of Attorney. (Related Doc # 21) (rsb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Stipulation Regarding Substitution of Attorney for a Debtor . (DeLadurantey, Nathan) (Entered: 07/23/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 19 Notice of Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor Back Bowl I, LLC) Service Date 08/28/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/28/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Assignment/Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: TARGET NATIONAL BANK (Claim No. 7) To Back Bowl I, LLC Court to send Notice of Transfer of Claim. Objections due within 21 days of the date of this notice. Filed by Creditor Back Bowl I, LLC (Ralston, Richard) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 17 Notice of Transfer of Claim filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC) Service Date 06/03/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Assignment/Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Claim No. 6) To Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC Court to send Notice of Transfer of Claim. Objections due within 21 days of the date of this notice. Filed by Creditor PRA Receivables Management, LLC (Garcia, Dolores) (Entered: 05/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Assignment/Transfer of Claim. Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Nelnet on behalf of GLHEC (Claim No. 3) To ECMC Notice Waived Filed by Creditor ECMC (ECMC Group) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Withdrawal of Claim(s): 12 Filed by Creditor ECMC (ECMC Group) (Entered: 05/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 13 Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan) Service Date 04/08/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Mailing. (RE: 11 Notice to debtor(s) regarding the requirement to file form 23.) Service Date 04/03/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/1/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Notice to debtor(s) regarding the Requirement to File a Certification of Completion of Course Concerning Personal Financial Management. (adkt) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 8 Order to Pay Wages) Service Date 02/06/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 8 Order to Pay Wages) Service Date 02/06/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Order for Payroll Deduction from debtor's income. (Kelley, Susan) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: 4 Chapter 13 Plan filed by Debtor Nancy A Mikkelson) Service Date 01/20/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: 5 Meeting of Creditors (Chapter 13)) Service Date 01/20/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Meeting of Creditors to be held on 03/02/2011 at 10:30 AM in Milwaukee, U.S. Courthouse, Room 428. Proof of Claim due by 05/31/2011. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts 05/02/2011. (Nickolai, Anton) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Chapter 13 Plan. Filed by Anton B. Nickolai on behalf of Nancy A Mikkelson. (Nickolai, Anton) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Concerning Debtor's Schedules , Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor , Schedule A , Schedule B , Schedule C , Schedule D , Schedule E , Schedule F , Schedule G , Schedule H , Schedule I , Schedule J , Statement of Current Monthly Income - Form 22 ., Statement of Financial Affairs , Statistical Summary, Summary of Schedules Filed by Anton B. Nickolai on behalf of Nancy A Mikkelson. (Nickolai, Anton) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Credit Counseling Filed by Anton B. Nickolai on behalf of Nancy A Mikkelson. (Nickolai, Anton) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition . Filed by Nancy A Mikkelson Fee Amount: . (Nickolai, Anton) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?