Wiggains et al v. Reed
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Northern District Court, Case No. 3:15-cv-03121
District Judge Jorge A Solis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 11:03 AM EST (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Case Admin Sup, Notice Only

Represented by Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Case Admin Sup FW +1 817 333 6000 txnb_appeals@txnb.uscourts.gov
No Logo Diane G Reed, Appellee

Represented by Reed & Elmquist, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing David W. Elmquist +1 972 938 7339 +1 972 923 0430 delmquist@bcylawyers.com
No Logo Jeremy Wiggains, Debtor

Represented by Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Gerrit Michael Pronske +1 214 658 6500 +1 214 658 6509
No Logo Stacey G Jernigan, Bankruptcy Judge

Represented by United States Courts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stacey G Jernigan +1 214 753 2040 sgj_settings@txnb.uscourts.gov
No Logo Tanya Wiggains, Appellant

Represented by Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Bar Status: Admitted/In Good Standing Gerrit Michael Pronske +1 214 658 6500 +1 214 658 6509
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 0158
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
Supplemental Document by Tanya Wiggains as to 4 Notice (Other) Supplemental Statement in Support of Joint Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A, # 2 Exhibit(s) B, # 3 Exhibit(s) C) (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Joint Certification to Court of Appeals filed by Tanya Wiggains (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
      Notice of transmission of DEFICIENT bankruptcy record on appeal for bankruptcy case number 14-03064. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8010, the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted the record on appeal to the U.S. District Court. See District Court Local Bankruptcy Rules 8009.1 and 8006.6 and the Notice Regarding Application of Certain Local Bankruptcy Rules for information on briefing times and record requests. (Attachments: # 1 Mini Record Vol. 1, # 2 Appellant Record Vol. 2, # 3 Appellant Record Vol. 3, # 4 Appellant Record Vol. 4, # 5 Appellee Record Vol. 5) (Blanco - TXNB, Juan) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
        Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (aaa) (Entered: 09/28/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/25/2015, Entered: None
          Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8003(d), the bankruptcy clerk has transmitted notice of the appeal filed in bankruptcy case number 14-03064 and the notice of appeal has now been docketed in the district court in case 3:15-cv-3121. (The filing fee has been paid in the Bankruptcy Court.) Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009, before the record on appeal can be assembled and filed in the district court, designations of items to be included in the record on appeal and statements of issues must be filed in the bankruptcy case. If a sealed document is designated, the designating party must file a motion in the district court case for the document to be accepted under seal. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of appeal and supporting documentation) (Whitaker - TXNB, Sheniqua) (Entered: 09/25/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 233 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?