Khaimov v. City of New York
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. Unknown

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 2:31 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Roman Khaimov, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 141-63 73 Terr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roman Khaimov +1 718 600 4384
v.
No Logo Audi, Defendant
No Logo BMW, Defendant
No Logo Canadian Darpa, Defendant
No Logo Chevy, Defendant
No Logo CIA DARPA, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Cyberwarefare, Defendant
No Logo DARPA Russian Military KGB Duplication, Defendant
No Logo Docomo, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo EDNY, Defendant
No Logo Hollis Hill Queens Hospital, Defendant
No Logo HP, Defendant
No Logo IBM, Defendant
No Logo LIJ, Defendant
No Logo Mercedez Benz, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
Gates, William Henry Gates, William Henry, Defendant
Officially listed as "Microsoft Bill Gates"
Microsoft Corporation Unknown Role, Microsoft Corporation
Unknown Role, Icos Corp / De
Unknown Role, Alpha G Inc
Unknown Role, Nbh Inc
Unknown Role, Ecolab Inc.
Unknown Role, DEERE & CO
Unknown Role, Planetout Inc.
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gates Ventures, LLC
No Logo NYPD Sex Cyber, Defendant
No Logo Russian Spy Agency, Defendant
No Logo St Jhons University, Defendant
No Logo US Enterprise Architecture Framework, Defendant
No Logo US Military ROTC, Defendant
No Logo Volvo, Defendant
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
CIVIL JUDGMENT. Pursuant to the order issued February 16, 2016, dismissing the complaint, IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/16/2016) (adc) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. By order dated December 14, 2015, the Court directed Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within sixty days. That order specified that failure to comply would result in dismissal of the complaint. Plaintiff has not filed an amended complaint. Accordingly, the complaint, filed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1), is dismissed under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/16/2016) (adc) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER TO AMEND. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. All of Plaintiff's claims that do not relate to his alleged forced hospitalization and medication are dismissed. The Clerk of Court is directed to amend the caption of this action to replace the NYPD and FDNY with the City of New York and to dismiss all other defendants. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. Plaintiff must submit the amended complaint to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, caption the document as an "Amended Complaint," and label the document with docket number 15-CV-9001 (LAP). An Amended Complaint form is attached to this order. No summons will issue at this time. If Plaintiff fails to comply within the time allowed, and he cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the complaint will be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff's motion to seal (ECF #3) is denied. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). Motion(s) terminated: 3 MOTION to Seal filed by Roman Khaimov. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/14/2015) (rjm). (Entered: 12/15/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/19/2015) (sbr) (Entered: 11/19/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
          MOTION to Seal. Document filed by Roman Khaimov.(rdz) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against Audi, BMW, Michael Bloomberg, CIA DARPA, Canadian Darpa, Chevy, Cyberwarefare, DARPA Russian Military KGB Duplication, Docomo, EDNY, Bill Gates, HP, Hollis Hill Queens Hospital, IBM, LIJ, Mercedez Benz, NYPD Sex Cyber, Russian Spy Agency, St Jhons University, Donald Trump, US Enterprise Architecture Framework, US Military ROTC, Volvo. Document filed by Roman Khaimov.(rdz) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
              REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Roman Khaimov.(rdz) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 122 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?