Ironburg Inventions Ltd. v. Valve Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-04219
District Judge Mark H. Cohen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 11, 2018 at 5:30 AM DT (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ironburg Inventions Ltd., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Parks IP Law, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cynthia Renee Parks +1 678 325 6602 cparks@parksiplaw.com
v.
No Logo Valve Corporation, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 110 Motion to Transfer Case to the Western District of Washington. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/17. (jkl)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 12/4/15. (jpa) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
      Certificate of Interested Persons by Ironburg Inventions Ltd.. (Parks, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
        AO Form 120 forwarded to Commissioner. (jpa) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
          Electronic Summons Issued as to Valve Corporation. (jpa) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ironburg Inventions Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-6175483.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/04/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 463 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?