United States v. Campo Flores
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00765
District Judge Paul A. Crotty, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 1, 2020 at 7:09 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas, Defendant (2)

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Defenders of New York, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Jonathan Andrew Marvinny +1 212 417 8792 +1 212 571 0392 jonathan_marvinny@fd.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Vincent Michael Southerland +1 212 417 8768 +1 212 571 0392 vincent_southerland@fd.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones & Mayer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Miles Ballard +1 714 446 1400 +1 714 446 1448 mmb@jones-mayer.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
          ENDORSED LETTER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Attorney Kafahni Nkrumah, Counsel for Defendant Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, dated February 25, 2016 re: I am respectfully writing to this Honorable Court to request an adjournment of the February 29, 2016 at 12:00pm status conference in the above referenced matter. There have been no prior adjournment request made by Mr. Campos Flores in this matter, although Mr. Campos Flores is aware that there has been a prior request, for an adjournment, Mr. Franqui Flores De Freitas, Mr. Vincent Southerland, Esq. who joins in counsel' request for an adjournment. I have also spoken with Assistant United States Attorney, Emil Bove, counsel for the Government, who has consented to the requested adjournment. Defendants consent to the waiver of speedy trial time from February 29th to March 29, 2016. ENDORSEMENT: The 2-29-16 PTC is adjourned to: Tuesday, March 29, 2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14C. Time excluded through March 29, 2016. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/26/2016)(bw) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Initial Appearance proceeding held on 11/12/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (do) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Initial Appearance held on 11/12/15 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2016. (do) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from John J. Reilly dated 12/16/2015 re: Withdrawal of Attorney Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. (Reilly, John) (Entered: 12/16/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/4/2015)(ft) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated December 3, 2015 re: Proposed Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bove, Emil) Modified on 12/4/2015 (ka). (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None
                      AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice /CORRECTED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Poston, Rebekah) (Entered: 12/01/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ENDORSED E-MAIL as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from John J. Reilly dated 11/20/2015 @ 10:03 AM re: We are counsel for defendant Efrain Antonio Campo Flores in this matter. At our request Your Honor has scheduled a conference in the matter for Wednesday, December 2, 2015 at 3pm. We are writing to respectfully request an adjournment of two weeks to a date in the week of December 14, 2015 at the Courts convenience. We have conferred with Mr. Vincent Southerland and Mr. Jonathan Marvinny of the Federal Defenders of New York, Inc. which represents the co-defendant and they consent to the adjournment. This is our second request for an adjournment. The Assistant US Attorneys assigned to the case also consent to the adjournment. We consent to the further exclusion of time until the new date. Counsel for all parties are copied on this message. ENDORSEMENT: Upon the parties consent - and the exclusion of time, the matter is adjourned to 12/17/2015 @ 11:00 AM. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11-25-15)(mov) (Entered: 11/25/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan Andrew Marvinny appearing for Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Appearance Type: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment. (Marvinny, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/24/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ENDORSED E-MAIL as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores and Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from John J. Reilly dated 11/16/2015 - 02:40 PM re: adjournment of 11-18-15 @ 3PM conference. ENDORSEMENT: Upon the parties consent - and the exclusion of time, the matter will be adjourned to 12/2/2015 @ 10:15 AM. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11-16-15)(mov) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Matthew Joseph Laroche appearing for USA. (Laroche, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Deft. present with atty outherland; AUSA Quigley and Spanish Interpreter also present. Deft. is detained on consent without prejudice. Initial Appearance as to Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas held on 11/12/2015., As to Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas( Status Conference set for 11/18/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (jm) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas appointing fed defender Vincent Southerland. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge James L. Cott) (jm) (Entered: 11/13/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Order to Unseal S(2)Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 11/12/15)(jm) Modified on 11/12/2015 (jm). (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: None
                                      S(2)SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1. (jm) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 2,826 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?