United States v. Campo Flores
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00765-PAC-1

Tags
Last Updated April 1, 2020 at 10:38 AM DT (1.1 years ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brendan Francis Quigley +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2390 Brendan.Quigley@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Boies, Schiller & Flexner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall Wade Jackson +1 212 446 2300 +1 212 446 2350 rjackson@bsfllp.com
Space John Thomas Zach +1 212 637 2410 +1 212 637 2527 jzach@bsfllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kafahni Nkrumah +1 212 678 4960 +1 347 271 8610 kankrumahesq@aol.com
No Logo Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Squire Patton Boggs (US) L.L.P. (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained John J. Reilly +1 212 872 9800 +1 212 872 9815 john.reilly@squirepb.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Foley Square
Filed 11/4/2015
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 963=NI.F
Offense Level 4
21963=NI.F ATTEMPT/CONSPIRACY - NARCOTICS - IMPORTATION/EXPORTATION
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
Flag ECF
  Entries (196) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate - Final Judgment Appeal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: None Transcript
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 208 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
            ENDORSED LETTER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson and John T. Zach dated 4/4/18 re: The Defendants jointly submit this letter respectfully moving to unseal the docket of the witness in the trial in the above-captioned case known as Jose Santos Pena or "CS-1."...ENDORSEMENT...The application is denied. The cooperating witnesses, CS1 and CS2, have made a compelling case that their status as cooperators exposes both them and their families to a very real danger of injurious retaliation. Availability of information about their status must be circumscribed and the best way to do that, perhaps the only way, is to seal the transcripts and not docket any entries. The Court notes that the witnesses, CS1 and CS2, have already testified in open court which creates a real danger of identification. Sealing the transcripts and barring further release of docket entries and filings is the least restrictive means presently available to protect the interest of the two witnesses and their families. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/15/18)(jw) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas, Roberto De Jesus Soto Garcia. On April 4, 2018, Defendants filed a motion to (1) unseal the sealed criminal docket of an individual identified as "Jose Santos Pena," a confidential informant who testified against Defendants at trial, or, in the alternative, (2) order the Government to share with Defendants any filings related to Santos Pena's sentencing. On April 19, 2018, the Government opposed the motion and suggested that Santos Pena and his son (also a confidential informant) should be given an opportunity to respond as well. Santos Pena objects to the Defendants' motion. The Comi will address the issue at sentencing and reserves its decision until that time. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/15/18)(jw) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. On April 4, 2018, Defendants filed a motion to: (1) unseal the sealed criminal docket of an individual identified as "Jose Santos Pena," a confidential informant who testified against Defendants at trial, or, in the alternative, (2) order the Government to share with Defendants any filings related to Santos Pena's sentencing. On April 19, 2018, the Government opposed the motion and suggested that Santos Pena and his son (also a confidential informant) should be given an opportunity to respond as well. The Court hereby orders Santos Pena and his son to respond to the Defendants' motion, if they wish to do so, for an ex parte, in camera review by May 4, 2018. The Court reserves its decision until then. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4/24/2018)(bw) (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 204 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated April 4, 2018 re: Unsealing of the Docket of "Jose Santos Pena" . Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas, Roberto De Jesus Soto Garcia. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 202 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores for a Sentence proceeding held on 12/14/2017 before Judge Paul A. Crotty re: 193 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Transcript due by 1/22/2018. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 01/12/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 12/14/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Sentence held on 12/14/17 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/30/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/9/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores from 191 Judgment. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 465401197939. (nd) (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                JUDGMENT In A Criminal Case (S5-15-Cr-765-01). Date of Imposition of Judgment: 12/14/2017. Defendant Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (1) was found guilty on Count(s) 1s, after a plea of not guilty. Count(s) Open counts & indictments are dismissed on the motion of the United States. IMPRISONMENT: Two hundred sixteen (216) months. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: That the defendant be designated at FCI Coleman or at a facility near Florida, USA. The Court also recommends that the defendant be housed together with the co-defendant, Franqui Flores De Freitas. SUPERVISED RELEASE: N/A. ASSESSMENT: $100.00. FINE: $50,000.00. The court determined that the defendant does not have the ability to pay interest and it is ordered that: the interest requirement is waived for the fine. Having assessed the defendant's ability to pay, payment of the total criminal monetary penalties is due as follows: A Lump sum payment of $50,100.00 due immediately. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/15/2017)(bw) Modified on 12/18/2017 (dgo). (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Bloomberg Article, # 2 Exhibit B. Sentencing Statistics)(Bove, Emil) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting 188 LETTER MOTION Request to Change Time of Sentencing Conference as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (1). Request granted. The sentencing will be moved to 3 PM. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/8/2018) (Crotty, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson and John T. Zach dated December 7, 2017 re: Request to Change Time of Sentencing Conference . Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 12/07/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W)(Zach, John) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 10/3/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Arraignment held on 10/3/17 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/4/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 183 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 10/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas: On Tuesday, October 3, 2017, the Court heard Defendants objections to the Final Presentence Investigation Report for Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (Dkt. No. 175, filed August 15, 2017) (Campo Flores PSR) and Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas (Dkt. No. 176, filed August 15, 2017) (Flores De Freitas PSR). During the hearing, Defendants raised objections to offense level computations in paragraphs 122 - 127, 129 - 130 of the Campo Flores PSR and paragraphs 121 - 126, 128 - 129 of the Flores De Freitas PSR. Defendants also argued for the Safety Valve Relief pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §3553(f) and U.S.S.G. §5C1.2(a). Upon due consideration of the Campo Flores PSR, the Flores De Freitas PSR, the Defendants Sentencing Submission (Dkt. No. 178, filed August 25, 2017), the Governments Sentencing Submission (Dkt. No. 180, filed September 11, 2017), and the oral argument presented to the Court, the Court makes the following determinations (see transcript for details):The base offense level is 38 pursuant to U.S.S.G. §§2D1.1(a)(5) and 2D1.1(c)(1) (base offense level based on amount of controlled substance involved). Government has established, by a preponderance of the evidence, that the charged offense involved 450KG or more of cocaine. Defendants failed to establish, pursuant to §2D1.1, cmt. appl. n.5, that they did not intend to provide or purchase, or were not reasonably capable of providing or purchasing, 450KG or more of cocaine. The offense level is enhanced by two (2) pursuant to U.S.S.G. §2D1.1(b)(1) (possession of firearm). The record is clear that the Defendants security guards possessed firearms during the course of the charged offense. The security guards possession can be imputed to Defendants because U.S.S.G. §2D1.1 applies to conspiracy. Defendants have not established that the firearms were not used in connection with the charged conspiracy.The offense level is not enhanced under U.S.S.G. §2D1.1(b)(2) (use of violence or credible threat to use violence). Government did not establish, by a preponderance of the evidence, that Defendants used violence or made a credible threat to use violence in connection with the charged conspiracy.The offense level is enhanced by two (2) pursuant to U.S.S.G. §2D1.1(b)(3)(A) (importation of controlled substance using private aircraft). The record is clear that Defendants conspired to transport cocaine from Venezuela to Honduras using a private aircraft, and subsequently the cocaine would be transported to the United States through other means. Since Defendants conspired to use a private aircraft in the process of transporting the cocaine into the United States, U.S.S.G. §2D1.1(b)(3)(A) applies. This conclusion is consistent with the legislative history of U.S.S.G. §2D1.1(b)(3).The offense level is not enhanced under U.S.S.G. §2D1.1(b)(11) (bribery or attempted bribery of law enforcement officer). The enhancement is not limited to domestic bribery activities as Defendants contend. While there was a discussion of money, Government did not establish that bribes were to be paid to identified law enforcement officers. The offense level is not enhanced under U.S.S.G. §2D1.1(b)(15)(C) (aggravating role in importation of controlled substance). That enhancement is not available when U.S.S.G. §2D1.1(b)(3)(A) applies, as is the case here. See U.S.S.G. §2D1.1, cmt. appl. n.20(B).The offense level is enhanced by two (2) pursuant to U.S.S.G. §3B1.1(c) (organizer or leadership role in charged offense). Government has established, by a preponderance of the evidence, that Defendants were organizers and leaders of the charged offense. The charged offense involved at least Pepero, Gocho, Daza, Gonzalez, plus the two Defendants.The offense level is not enhanced under U.S.S.G. §3C1.1 (obstruction of justice). Defendants exercised their constitutional right in raising arguments in support of their motion to suppress; the Court does not find any willful obstruction of justice. The Defendants application for Safety Valve Relief, under 18 U.S.C. §3553(f), is denied. Defendants failed to establish 18 U.S.C. §§3553(f)(2) (no firearm possession), 3553(f)(4) (no organizer or leadership role), and 3553(f)(5) (production of all information to government). The total offense level is 44. The Defendants offense level is treated as 43. See U.S.S.G. Ch. 5, Pt. A, cmt. appl. n.2 (An offense level of more than 43 is to be treated as an offense level of 43.)The Court will sentence Efrain Antonio Campo Flores on December 14, 2017, at 11AM; and Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas on December 14, 2017, at 3PM. Defendants shall file any supplemental Sentencing Submissions by December 1, 2017; Government shall file any supplemental Sentencing Submission by December 8, 2017. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/6/2017)(dgo) (Entered: 10/06/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE OF PARTIES as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. On Tuesday, October 3, 2017, at 11:45AM, the Court will hear Defendants objections to the Final Presentence Investigation Report (PSR) for Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (Dkt. No. 175, filed August 15, 2017) and Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas (Dkt. No. 176, filed August 15, 2017). At that time, Defendants may raise any objection to the proposed application of the enhancements set forth in the PSRs offense level computation. There will be no Fatico hearing; the trial record is more than sufficient to determine whether there is or is not a preponderance of the evidence to apply any of the proposed enhancements. The Court intends to rule on each of the enhancements. Thereafter, the Court will schedule a date for individual sentencing of each defendant. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 9/27/2017)(ft) Modified on 9/27/2017 (dgo). (Entered: 09/27/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Campo-Jonathan Chats, # 2 Exhibit B. Campo-Flores Chats, # 3 Exhibit C. Campo-Peter Chats, # 4 Exhibit D. Defendants' Objections to the PSRs, # 5 Exhibit E. Fabio Lobo Sentencing Transcript)(Bove, Emil) (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody dated September 6, 2017 re: Sentencing Schedule. (Rody, David) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: 8/25/2017 Sentencing Submission
                                                        SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Georgescu Sentencing Transcript, # 2 Exhibit B-Toure Sentencing Transcript)(Rody, David)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Sealed Legal Document 174 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: 6/28/2017 Sealed document
                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: 6/20/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 172 LETTER MOTION Adjournment of Sentencing Date as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (1), Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas (2). ENDORSEMENT: The sentencing is scheduled for September 12, 2017 at 2 PM for Flores de Freitas, and September 13, 2017 at 2 PM for Campo Flores. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 6/20/2017) (dgo)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/17/2017, Entered: 6/17/2017 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                              JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody dated June 17, 2017 re: Adjournment of Sentencing Date . Document filed by Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Rody, David)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/30/2017, Entered: 5/31/2017 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting 170 LETTER MOTION Extension of time for Defendants to file objections to the initial Presentence Investigation Reports as to Efrain Campo Flores (1) and Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas (2). ENDORSEMENT: Request granted. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5/30/2017) (dgo)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/7/2017, Entered: 4/7/2017 letterCourt Filing
                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated April 7, 2017 re: Response to March 24, 2017 Opinion & Order Document filed by USA. (Bove, Emil)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 168 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: 4/5/2017 Sealed document
                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: 3/24/2017 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                      OPINION & ORDER: as to (S5-15-Cr-765-) Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (1), Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas (2). On November 18, 2016, following a nine-day trial, a jury convicted Defendants Efrain Antonio Campo Flores and Franqui Francisco Flores de Freitas ("Defendants") of conspiring to (i) import five or more kilograms of cocaine into the United States from a foreign country, in violation of 21 U.S.C. §§ 952(a) and 960(a)(1), or (ii) distribute five or more kilograms of cocaine, knowing and intending that it would be imported into the United States, in violation of 21 U.S.C. §§ 959(a) and 960(a)(3). The thrust of the government's proof was that Defendants agreed to arrange a flight transporting 800 kilograms of cocaine from Venezuela to Honduras, knowing and intending that the cocaine was ultimately bound for the United States. According to the government, Defendants---both nephews of the First Lady of Venezuela---sought to take advantage of their political connections by coordinating a private flight that would appear legitimate and thus be subject to less scrutiny, notwithstanding the illicit drug cargo it would carry. On January 23, 2017, Defendants renewed their motion for a judgment of acquittal (Fed. R. Crim. P. 29(c)), and moved in the alternative for a new trial (Fed. R. Crim. P. 33(a)). They contend that acquittal is warranted because the government failed to present sufficient credible evidence to support conviction and to disprove entrapment. They also contend that a new trial is warranted because of a cooperating witness's perjury and because the Court gave an improper conscious avoidance instruction. For the reasons stated below, the Court denies Defendants' motion....[See this Opinion & Order]... CONCLUSION: Accordingly, the Court DENIES Defendants' Rule 29 and 33 motions. The government must promptly produce any Brady and Giglio materials responsive to Defendants' November 14, 2016 letter request. See Dkt. 166-1. Sentencing is scheduled for June 26, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion at docket number 158. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 3/24/2017)(bw)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: 158 JOINT MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29.JOINT MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 33. . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rody, David) (Entered: 03/06/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting 164 LETTER MOTION Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to the Post-Trial Motions as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (1), Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas (2)ENDORSEMENT: Extension granted to 3/6/2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/16/2017) (Crotty, Paul) (Entered: 02/16/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody dated February 15, 2017 re: Extension of Time to File Reply Brief to the Post-Trial Motions . Document filed by Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Rody, David) (Entered: 02/15/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re 161 MOTION in Limine .. (Redacted) (Rody, David) (Entered: 02/14/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re 158 JOINT MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29.JOINT MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 33.. (Bove, Emil) (Entered: 02/13/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION in Limine . Document filed by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit E, # 3 Exhibit F)(Bove, Emil) (Entered: 02/10/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      DECLARATION of Dr. Andrea Holmes in Support as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: 158 JOINT MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29.JOINT MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 33.. (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        JOINT MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29., JOINT MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 33. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - JOINT MOTION for Acquittal Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 29., JOINT MOTION for New Trial Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 33. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Dr. Andrea Holmes)(Mann, Michael) Modified on 1/24/2017 (ka). (Entered: 01/23/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/17/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/18/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/17/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/17/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/16/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/16/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/15/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/15/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/14/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/14/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/10/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/10/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/9/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/9/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/8/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/8/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/7/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/7/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/3/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/3/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 11/2/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 11/2/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/27/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        JURY VERDICT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (1) Guilty on Count 1s and Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas (2) Guilty on Count 1s. (mov) (mov). (Main Document 134 replaced on 11/18/2016) (mov). (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Jury Trial as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas held on 11/18/2016. REMARK: Jury Charge began and ended. The 4 alternate jurors were excused and the 12 jurors began their deliberations at 11:20 AM (approximately). At 5:35 PM (approximately) the jurors reached a unanimous GUILTY verdict on Count 1 as to Efrain Campo Flores and Franqui Francisco Flores de Freitas. The following post-trial motion schedule was set: Motion: 1/23/17; Response: 02/13/17; Reply: 02/21/17. The Court set Tuesday, March 7, 2017 as a sentencing control date. The defendants continue remanded. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlowski and Kris Sellin) (mov) (Entered: 11/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody & Randall Jackson dated November 16, 2016 re: Motion for Judgment of Acquittal . Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated November 16, 2016 re: GXs 607-610 Document filed by USA. (Bove, Emil) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                JOINT LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 16, 2016 re: Government Exhibits 607-610 (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  JOINT LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 15, 2016 re: 5K Jury Charge Instruction (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSAs Quigley/Bove dated 11/15/2016 re: 5k letter/cooperation agreement Document filed by USA. (Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody dated November 15, 2016 re: Reply to the Government's 11/15/2016 Opposition Letter (Rody, David) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody dated November 14, 2016 re: to Preclude Testimony by Cooperating Witness Carlos Gonzalez . Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Rody, David) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          JOINT LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 15, 2016 re: Verdict Form (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: 122 JOINT MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Cooperating Witness Carlos Gonzalez.. (Bove, Emil) Modified on 11/15/2016 (ka). (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              JOINT LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody dated November 15, 2016 re: The Government's Request for a Conscious Avoidance Jury Instruction (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 11/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - JOINT MOTION to Preclude Testimony by Cooperating Witness Carlos Gonzalez. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Mann, Michael) Modified on 11/15/2016 (ka). (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas, Roberto De Jesus Soto Garcia addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSAs Quigley / Bove dated 11/14/2016 re: Verdict Form Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody dated November 13, 2016 re: Manufactured Jurisdiction (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSAs Quigley / Bove dated 11/13/2016 re 118 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 13, 2016 re: 117 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSAs Quigley / Bove dated 11/13/2016 re: Cross Examination . re: Opp. (Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 11/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 13, 2016 re: 117 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSAs Quigley / Bove dated 11/13/2016 re: Cross Examination . re: Opposition to Government Request re Cross Examination . Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSAs Quigley / Bove dated 11/13/2016 re: Cross Examination . Document filed by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 11/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 13, 2016 re: Government's Proposed Verdict Form (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated November 12, 2016 re: Requests to Charge Document filed by USA. (Bove, Emil) (Entered: 11/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody dated November 8, 2016 re: El Sentado (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated November 8, 2016 re: Testimony Regarding Campo's Post-Arrest Statement Document filed by USA. (Bove, Emil) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 8, 2011 re: Admissibility of Post-Arrest Statements (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 7, 2016 re: Testimony Interpreting Post-Arrest Statements (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSAs Emil Bove / Brendan Quigley dated 11/7/2016 re: Death of "Sentado" . Document filed by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody dated November 7, 2016 re: Manufactured Jurisdiction (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas, Roberto De Jesus Soto Garcia addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSAs Emil Bove/Brendan Quigley dated 11/5/2016 re: 106 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 4, 2016 re: To Preclude Government Exhibits 1, 2, 56 and 61 .. , Defense Proposed Verdict Sheet, and Defense Requests to Charge (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 11/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 4, 2016 re: To Preclude Government Exhibits 1, 2, 56 and 61 . Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated November 4, 2016 re: Proposed Verdict Form (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 11/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated November 3, 2016 re: Proposed Limiting Instruction Document filed by USA. (Bove, Emil) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - Request To Charge by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas, Roberto De Jesus Soto Garcia. (Jackson, Randall) Modified on 10/27/2016 (ka). (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re 90 MOTION in Limine No. 1 - Financial Status., 91 MOTION in Limine No. 2 - Daubert., 93 MOTION in Limine No. 4 - Preclude Certain Statements in Recordings., 92 MOTION in Limine No. 3 - Preclude FARC References and Improper Hearsay.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Excerpt from Nov. 10, 2015 Meeting, # 2 Exhibit B. Excerpt-1 from Oct. 23, 2015 Meeting, # 3 Exhibit C. Excerpt-2 from Oct. 23, 2015 Meeting)(Bove, Emil) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Jury Instructions by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request To Charge by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 10/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated October 22, 2016 re: Spanish Language Translation Issues Document filed by USA. (Bove, Emil) (Entered: 10/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/13/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Conference held on 10/13/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from David M. Rody dated October 20, 2016 re: Spanish Language Translation Issues (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION in Limine No. 4 - Preclude Certain Statements in Recordings. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine No. 3 - Preclude FARC References and Improper Hearsay. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine No. 2 - Daubert. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine No. 1 - Financial Status. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order (clothing for trial) as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores: Upon the application of EFRAIN ANTONIO CAMPO FLORES, the defendant herein, for an order permitting the defendant to appear at all proceedings in this matter in the presence of jurors in civilian clothes instead of a prison uniform and without restraint by any means, including shackles, and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the defendant shall appear at all trial proceedings in civilian clothing acceptable to and in accordance with the directives of the Legal Department of the Metropolitan Correctional Center ("MCC") and without restraints while in the presence of jurors. The MCC shall admit through Mr. Jackson or his representative, at least 4 dress shirts, 2 pairs of slacks, 2 ties, 2 sweaters, 1 belt, 1 pair of dress shoes, and 5 pairs of socks, or any necessary alternative court clothing defense counsel may provide, into the MCC and allow Mr. Campo Flores to dress in such civilian clothing for each appearance at court commencing November 2, 2016, and continuing thereafter until trial concludes. Mr. Jackson or his representative shall be allowed to pick up soiled clothing and substitute clean clothing. The Bureau of Prisons and the MCC are DIRECTED to comply with this ORDER. SO ORDERED (signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10-20-16) (mov) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (1), Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas (2), on re: 84 LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Attorney Randall W. Jackson dated October 18, 2016 re: Jury Hardship Questionnaire. Defendants Efrain Campo Flores and Franqui Francisco Flores de Freitas jointly submit this letter respectfully requesting that the Court include in its hardship questionnaire two additional questions. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' application to ask four additional questions on the hardship questionnaire is denied. The questions are more appropriate for voir dire, and the Court will ask these questions (or a reasonable modification thereto) at the appropriate time. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/19/2016)(bw) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (1), Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas (2), on re: 83 LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Attorney Randall W. Jackson dated October 17, 2016 re: Peremptory Challenges. Defendants Efrain Campo Flores and Franqui Francisco Flores de Freitas respectfully submit this letter in support of the Defendants' joint request that the Court pe1mit the Defendants to exercise two additional peremptory challenges at trial. For the reasons described herein, the Defendants submit that this request is in the interests of justice. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' application for two additional peremptory challenges is granted. The challenges will be exercised in 6 rounds; one in each round for the government and two in each round for the defendants. Challenges must be used in each round; unused challenges will not be carried forward. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 10/19/2016)(bw) (Entered: 10/19/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas, Roberto De Jesus Soto Garcia addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSAs Quigley/Bove dated 10/18/16 re: Hardship Questionnaire/Peremptory Challenges Document filed by USA. (Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated October 18, 2016 re: Jury Hardship Questionnaire (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated October 17, 2016 re: Peremptory Challenges (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 9/9/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 9/9/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lisa Picciano Fellis, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Trial proceeding held on 9/8/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Trial held on 9/8/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/17/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT MOTION in Limine to Preclude Visible Security Measures at Trial. Document filed by Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Rody, David) (Entered: 10/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION & ORDER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores & Franqui Francisco Flores: The Court (i) DENIES Defendants' motion to suppress on the basis of spoliation; (ii) DENIES Defendants' motion to suppress Defendants' post-arrest statements; (iii) DENIES Defendants' motion for a Bill of Particulars; (iv) DENIES Defendants' motion to compel prompt production of Brady and Giglio material, and the identities of the confidential informants; and (v) DENIES Defendants motion to compel the early production of translated materials....Defendants motions are denied in all respects. The case will proceed to trial on November 7, 2016, as scheduled. An arraignment on the superseding indictment will go forward on October 13, 2016 at 4:00 p.m. The Clerk is directed to close the motions at Docket 44, 45, 47, 48, and 49. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on October 12, 2016)(mov) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated October 12, 2016 re: Grand Jury Subpoenas (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated October 11, 2016 re: Grand Jury Subpoenas Document filed by USA. (Bove, Emil) (Entered: 10/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated October 10, 2016 re: Improper Government Service of Grand Jury Subpoenas (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 10/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from John T. Zach dated October 9, 2016 re: 69 Letter, re: Opposition to Request for Supplemental Curcio Hearing . Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Zach, John) (Entered: 10/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                (S5) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (1) count(s) 1s, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas (2) count(s) 1s. (jm) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated October 4, 2016 re: Superseding Indictment and Curcio Hearing Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Superseding Indictment, # 2 Exhibit B. WSJ Article, # 3 Exhibit C. Reuters Article, # 4 Exhibit D. Proposed Curcio Examination)(Bove, Emil) (Entered: 10/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas, Roberto De Jesus Soto Garcia. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/7/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas, Roberto De Jesus Soto Garcia re: Conference held on 9/7/16 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Patricia Nilsen, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/3/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2017. (Siwik, Christine) (Entered: 09/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re 45 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Post-Arrest Statements., 48 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Evidence on the Basis of Spoliation.. Defendants' Post-Hearing Brief (Rody, David) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas, Roberto De Jesus Soto Garcia re 48 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Evidence on the Basis of Spoliation., 45 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Post-Arrest Statements.. Post-Hearing Brief (Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated September 15, 2016 re: Confidential Source-2 Document filed by USA. (Bove, Emil) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joanna Christine Wright appearing for Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. Appearance Type: Retained. (Wright, Joanna) (Entered: 09/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated September 2, 2016 re: Opposition to Government's Motion to Quash (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 09/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Quash Defense Subpoenas and for Other Relief Relating to the Upcoming Suppression Hearing. Document filed by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Defense Subpoenas)(Bove, Emil) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Randall W. Jackson dated August 16, 2016 re: Defendants' Objection to the Government's Request to Make an Ex Parte Submission (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: 47 JOINT MOTION to Compel Early Production of Translated Materials., 44 JOINT MOTION for Bill of Particulars ., 49 JOINT MOTION to Compel Prompt Production of Brady and Giglio Material and the Identities of Confidential Informants., 48 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Evidence on the Basis of Spoliation., 45 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Post-Arrest Statements. . (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Sandalio Gonzalez in Opposition by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: 47 JOINT MOTION to Compel Early Production of Translated Materials., 44 JOINT MOTION for Bill of Particulars ., 49 JOINT MOTION to Compel Prompt Production of Brady and Giglio Material and the Identities of Confidential Informants., 48 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Evidence on the Basis of Spoliation., 45 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Post-Arrest Statements.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. Photo)(Bove, Emil) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Emil Bove in Opposition by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: 47 JOINT MOTION to Compel Early Production of Translated Materials., 45 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Post-Arrest Statements., 48 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Evidence on the Basis of Spoliation., 44 JOINT MOTION for Bill of Particulars ., 49 JOINT MOTION to Compel Prompt Production of Brady and Giglio Material and the Identities of Confidential Informants.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A. DEA Request, # 2 Exhibit B. Haiti Expulsion Letter, # 3 Exhibit C. Agent Notes, # 4 Exhibit D. Photo, # 5 Exhibit E. Campo Miranda Waiver, # 6 Exhibit F. Campo Confession, # 7 Exhibit G. Flores Miranda Waiver, # 8 Exhibit H. Flores Confession, # 9 Exhibit I. Presentment Transcript, # 10 Exhibit J. Discovery Summary, # 11 Exhibit K. DEA Reports, # 12 Exhibit L. Search Warrant, # 13 Exhibit M. Curcio Hearing Transcript, # 14 Exhibit N. Holder Memorandum)(Bove, Emil) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re 47 JOINT MOTION to Compel Early Production of Translated Materials., 44 JOINT MOTION for Bill of Particulars ., 49 JOINT MOTION to Compel Prompt Production of Brady and Giglio Material and the Identities of Confidential Informants., 48 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Evidence on the Basis of Spoliation., 45 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Post-Arrest Statements.. (Bove, Emil) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of John T. Zach in Support by Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: 45 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Post-Arrest Statements.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B, # 3 Ex. C)(Rody, David) (Entered: 07/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of John T. Zach in Support as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores re: 48 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Evidence on the Basis of Spoliation.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A)(Zach, John) (Entered: 07/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Randall W. Jackson in Support by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: 48 JOINT MOTION to Suppress Evidence on the Basis of Spoliation.. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT MOTION to Compel Prompt Production of Brady and Giglio Material and the Identities of Confidential Informants. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION to Suppress Evidence on the Basis of Spoliation. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT MOTION to Compel Early Production of Translated Materials. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Jackson, Randall) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/12/2016 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Conference held on 5/12/2016 before Judge Paul A. Crotty. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Ellen Simone, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/30/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2016. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from AUSAs Brendan Quigley and Emil Bove dated 5/6/16 re: Curcio Hearing Document filed by USA. (Quigley, Brendan) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Randall Wade Jackson appearing for Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. Appearance Type: Retained. (Jackson, Randall)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER (text only) granting 36 LETTER MOTION adjournment of the 5-3-16 PTC to 5-12-16 @ 11AM & exclusion of time under the Speedy Trial Act as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores & Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. TEXT: The 5-3-16 PTC is adjourned to: Thursday, May 12, 2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14C. Time excluded under the Speedy Trial Act from 5-3-16 to 5-12-16. SO ORDERED. (SO ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 5-2-16 - TEXT ONLY). (Crotty, Paul) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Address as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. New Address: John T. Zach, Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP, 575 Lexington Avenue, 7th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10022, (212) 446-2300. (Zach, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Michael D. Mann dated May 2, 2016 re: Adjournment of Pre-Trial Conference from May 3, 2016 to May 12, 2016 at 11:00 am . Document filed by Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Mann, Michael) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John Thomas Zach appearing for Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. Appearance Type: Retained. (Zach, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER (text only) granting 34 LETTER MOTION adjournment of the 4-5-16 PTC to 5-3-16 & exclusion of time under the Speedy Trial Act as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores & Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. TEXT: The 4-6-16 PTC is adjourned to: Tuesday, May 3, 2016 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 14C. Time excluded under the Speedy Trial Act from 4-6-16 to 5-3-16. SO ORDERED. (SO ORDERED by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 4-5-16 - TEXT ONLY) (Crotty, Paul) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Attorney Kafahni Nkrumah, Counsel for Defendant Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, dated February 25, 2016 re: I am respectfully writing to this Honorable Court to request an adjournment of the February 29, 2016 at 12:00pm status conference in the above referenced matter. There have been no prior adjournment request made by Mr. Campos Flores in this matter, although Mr. Campos Flores is aware that there has been a prior request, for an adjournment, Mr. Franqui Flores De Freitas, Mr. Vincent Southerland, Esq. who joins in counsel' request for an adjournment. I have also spoken with Assistant United States Attorney, Emil Bove, counsel for the Government, who has consented to the requested adjournment. Defendants consent to the waiver of speedy trial time from February 29th to March 29, 2016. ENDORSEMENT: The 2-29-16 PTC is adjourned to: Tuesday, March 29, 2016 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14C. Time excluded through March 29, 2016. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 2/26/2016)(bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: 2/25/2016, Terminated: 2/26/2016 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Efrain Campo Flores dated 02252016 re: Adjournment of Status Conference set for Feb. 29th, 2016 at 12:00pm . Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. Return Date set for 2/26/2016 at 05:00 PM. (Nkrumah, Kafahni)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Initial Appearance proceeding held on 11/12/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (do)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: 1/19/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas re: Initial Appearance held on 11/12/15 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carole Ludwig, (212) 420-0771, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/12/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/21/2016. (do)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas: Due to a change on the Court's calendar, the Pretrial Conference scheduled to go forward on March 29, 2016 is adjourned to: Wednesday, April 6, 2016 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14C @ 500 Pearl St. The Court excludes the time between March 29, 2016 and April 6, 2016 under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h) (7) (A). Allowing the parties' additional time to consider how to proceed next, as opposed to moving up the March 29 conference date, is in the interests of justice and outweighs the interests of the public and Defendants in a speedy trial. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on March 24, 2016)(mov) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/30/2015 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. (Signed by Judge Judge Paul A. Crotty - 12-17-15) (mov)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL ORDER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. The C.J.A Attorney assigned to receive cases on Thursday, December 17, 2015, Kafahni Nkrumah, is hereby appointed to represent the defendant in the above captioned matter. The Court relieved Mr. Reilly and Ms. Poston as counsel. The Clerk of Court is directed update the docket accordingly. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/17/15)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Crotty: Arraignment as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores and Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas held on 12/17/2015. Defendant Efrain Antonio Campo Flores appeared with his attorneys John J. Reilly, Rebekah J. Poston and Eridania Perez. On duty CJA Attorney Kafahni Nkrumah appeared. Defendant Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas appeared with his attorneys Jonathan A. Marvinny and Vincent M. Southerland. AUSA Brandan F. Quigley and AUSA Emil J. Bove, III appeared on behalf of the government. Spanish Interpreter Elizabeth Torres and Court Reporter Pamela Utter both present. Both defendants waived the public reading of the indictment and entered pleas of NOT GUILTY. The Court approved the financial affidavit as to defendant Campo Flores and appointed Mr. Nkrumah as his counsel. Mr. Reilly and Ms. Poston were relieved as counsel by the Court. See appointment of order counsel order issued. A pretrial conference is scheduled to go forward on Monday, February 29, 2016 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 14C. Time excluded through 2-29-16. The defendants continue remanded. (mov)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney update in case as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. Attorney Kafahni Nkrumah for Efrain Antonio Campo Flores added. Attorney Rebekah J. Poston and John J. Reilly terminated (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 12/16/2015, Entered: 12/16/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from John J. Reilly dated 12/16/2015 re: Withdrawal of Attorney Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. (Reilly, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: 12/4/2015 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12/4/2015)(ft)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: 12/4/2015 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER (TEXT ONLY) granting [17] Motion for Rebekah J. Poston to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores (1) (SO ORDERED Judge Paul A. Crotty on 12-4-15) (Crotty, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas: Notice to Attorney Emil Joseph Bove, III to RE-FILE Document [18] Letter. ERROR(S): Incorrect date of Letter. Letter dated November 3, 2015. Text reads December 3, 2015. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - LETTER by USA as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from Emil Bove dated December 3, 2015 re: Proposed Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bove, Emil) Modified on 12/4/2015 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015, Terminated: 12/4/2015 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice /CORRECTED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing)(Poston, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [17] AMENDED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice /CORRECTED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (sdi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED E-MAIL as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from John J. Reilly dated 11/20/2015 @ 10:03 AM re: We are counsel for defendant Efrain Antonio Campo Flores in this matter. At our request Your Honor has scheduled a conference in the matter for Wednesday, December 2, 2015 at 3pm. We are writing to respectfully request an adjournment of two weeks to a date in the week of December 14, 2015 at the Courts convenience. We have conferred with Mr. Vincent Southerland and Mr. Jonathan Marvinny of the Federal Defenders of New York, Inc. which represents the co-defendant and they consent to the adjournment. This is our second request for an adjournment. The Assistant US Attorneys assigned to the case also consent to the adjournment. We consent to the further exclusion of time until the new date. Counsel for all parties are copied on this message. ENDORSEMENT: Upon the parties consent - and the exclusion of time, the matter is adjourned to 12/17/2015 @ 11:00 AM. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11-25-15)(mov)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED E-MAIL as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores and Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas addressed to Judge Paul A. Crotty from John J. Reilly dated 11/16/2015 - 02:40 PM re: adjournment of 11-18-15 @ 3PM conference. ENDORSEMENT: Upon the parties consent - and the exclusion of time, the matter will be adjourned to 12/2/2015 @ 10:15 AM. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 11-16-15)(mov)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Matthew Joseph Laroche appearing for USA. (Laroche, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/13/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015, Terminated: 11/13/2015 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for REBEKAH J. POSTON to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11623827. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing)(Poston, Rebekah) Modified on 11/13/2015 (bcu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas to RE-FILE Document No. [12] MOTION for REBEKAH J. POSTON to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-11623827. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Rebekah J. Poston appearing for Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Deft. present with attys Reilly and Poston; AUSA Quigley also present. Deft. is detained on consent without prejudice. Initial Appearance as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores held on 11/12/2015., As to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores( Status Conference set for 11/18/2015 at 03:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Crotty.) (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/13/2015 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John J. Reilly appearing for Efrain Antonio Campo Flores. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order to Unseal S(2)Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 11/12/15)(jm) Modified on 11/12/2015 (jm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest of Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas in Haiti. (Deft. original arrest date is 11/10/15) (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Attorney update in case as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. Attorney Brendan Francis Quigley,Emil Joseph Bove, III for USA added. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas ASSIGNED to Judge Judge Paul A. Crotty. Judge Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Designated ECF as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            S(2)INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Efrain Antonio Campo Flores, Franqui Francisco Flores De Freitas. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: 11/10/2015 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/12/2015 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        S(2)SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,256 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?