Playtipus LLC et al v. Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:15-cv-02072

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 2, 2016 at 5:59 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Playtipus LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S DeVincenzo +1 212 612 3285 +1 212 612 3297 michael.devincenzo@mishcon.com
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
Space Charles Wizenfeld +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 charles.wizenfeld@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
No Logo Poltorak Media LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Capshaw DeRieux, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth L DeRieux +1 903 233 4826 +1 903 236 8787 ederieux@capshawlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S DeVincenzo +1 212 612 3285 +1 212 612 3297 michael.devincenzo@mishcon.com
Space Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com
Space Charles Wizenfeld +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 charles.wizenfeld@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ste. 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
v.
No Logo Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Haynes And Boone, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Philip Chiarizio +1 214 951 5132 +1 214 200 0556 matthew.chiarizio@haynesboone.com
Space David H Harper +1 214 651 5247 +1 214 200 0463 david.harper@haynesboone.com
Space Stephanie Noelle Sivinski +1 214 651 5000 +1 214 651 5940 stephanie.sivinski@haynesboone.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melissa J Baily +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 melissabaily@quinnemanuel.com
Space Andrew Michael Holmes +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 drewholmes@quinnemanuel.com
Space Kevin Alexander Smith +1 415 875 6600 +1 415 875 6700 kevinsmith@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Jeff Kaplan, Mediator
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/2/2016, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/9/2016, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 49 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/05/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting 48 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Stephanie Noelle Sivinski; Matthew Philip Chiarizio and David H Harper terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 10/05/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 38 Order, Terminate Motions, Scheduling Order,,,,,, Motion to Amend Docket Control Order by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Kevin) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to David Harper, Stephanie Sivinski, and Matthew Chiarizio by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael E Jones on behalf of Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/19/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Notice of Discovery Disclosure
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. P.R. 3-3 and 3-4 Disclosures (Sivinski, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            E-DISCOVERY ORDER re 39 Agreed MOTION for Entry of Agreed E-Discovery order filed by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd... Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 8/1/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Agreed MOTION for Entry of Agreed E-Discovery order by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Sivinski, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2017 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Amended Pleadings due by 11/14/2016., Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2016., Jury Selection set for 9/5/2017 09:00AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Mediation Completion due by 3/17/2017., Markman Hearing set for 1/30/2017 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions due by 7/18/2017., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/1/2017.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/21/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. re Initial and Additional Disclosures (Sivinski, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/21/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC re Initial and Additional Disclosures (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Joint MOTION for entry of a Docket Control Order by Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Wizenfeld, Charles) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Joint MOTION entry of a Discovery Order by Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Discovery Order)(Wizenfeld, Charles) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/8/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Agreed Protective Order)(Chiarizio, Matthew) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. Jeff Kaplan (Ret.) of JAMS is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 7/05/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Judge Jeff Kaplan, filed by Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC. (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER assigning case to Judge Payne by consent of the parties for all further proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/01/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      CONSENT to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd., Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/01/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative to Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC. (Wizenfeld, Charles) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC re P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative to Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Harper, David) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/3/16. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                FILED IN ERROR Additional Attachments to Main Document: 21 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,.. (Wizenfeld, Charles) Modified on 5/31/2016 (nkl, ). (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative to Transfer to the Northern District of California filed by Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Alexander Poltorak, # 2 Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 3 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 4 Exhibit B to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 5 Exhibit C to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 6 Exhibit D to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 7 Exhibit E to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 8 Exhibit F to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 9 Exhibit G to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 10 Exhibit H to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 11 Exhibit I to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 12 Exhibit J to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 13 Exhibit K to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 14 Exhibit L to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 15 Exhibit M to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 16 Exhibit N to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 17 Exhibit O to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 18 Exhibit P to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 19 Exhibit Q to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld, # 20 Exhibit R to Affidavit of Charles Wizenfeld)(Wizenfeld, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2016: # 21 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S DeVincenzo on behalf of Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC (DeVincenzo, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Stewart Raskin on behalf of Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephanie Noelle Sivinski on behalf of Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. (Sivinski, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd. (Sivinski, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Improper Venue, or in the Alternative to Transfer to the Northern District of California by Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Rinal Deo, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Matthew P. Chiarizio, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of SEC Filings by Amazon, Apple, Google, and Microsoft, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Sony Interactive Press Release, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Distances from Playtipus to Venues, # 6 Exhibit 4 - Playtipus to Marshall Travel Time, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Playtipus to San Jose Travel Time, # 8 Exhibit 6 - Distances from Halfbrick to Venues, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Halfbrick to Marshall Travel Time, # 10 Exhibit 8 - Halfbrick to San Jose Travel Time, # 11 Exhibit 9 - Distances from Apple to Venues, # 12 Exhibit 10 - Apple to Marshall Travel Time, # 13 Exhibit 11 - Apple to San Jose Travel Time, # 14 Exhibit 12 - Distances from Google to Venues, # 15 Exhibit 13 - Google to Marshall Travel Time, # 16 Exhibit 14 - Google to San Jose Travel Time)(Chiarizio, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2016: # 17 Text of Proposed Order) (nkl, ). (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew W. Spangler terminated. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 05/06/2016. (nkl, ) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Termination of Electronic Notices by Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC for Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd.. (nkl, ) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth L DeRieux on behalf of Playtipus LLC, Poltorak Media LLC (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Halfbrick Studios Pty Ltd..( Harper, David) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Additional Attachments to Main Document
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/30/2015, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Jury Demand
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 88 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?