Maxim Media Inc. v. Maxim International A/s

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91225336-OPP
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 13, 2016 at 8:25 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Maxim Media Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Jacobs & Burleigh LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara J. Lipshutz bjl@jacobsburleigh.com
v.
No Logo Maxim International A/s, Defendant

Represented by Seiter Legal Studio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J Seiter williamjseiter@seiterlegalstudio.com
Attributes
Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney ANDREW P BAXLEY
Date in Location 12/14/2015
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
Timeline
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (12) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None
Bd Decision: Dismissed W/ Prej
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None
W/draw Of Opposition
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/18/2016, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2016, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/24/2016, Entered: None W
Extension Of Time Granted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2016, Entered: None T
Stip For Ext
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None T
Pending, Instituted
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/14/2015, Entered: None T
Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/1/2015, Entered: None N
Filed And Fee
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?