NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE v. STRACH
Federal Civil Lawsuit North Carolina Middle District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-01063

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 7, 2018 at 1:30 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ACTION NC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DORIAN L SPENCE +1 202 662 8324 dspence@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Mark D'Amore +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 903 7820 mdamore@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 11/02/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marta Godecki +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mgodecki@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CLAIRE GUNNER +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 cgunner@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Kaufmann +1 303 592 2236 +1 303 592 1510 skaufmann@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Allen Sigmon +1 202 778 1664 +1 202 887 0763 ksigmon@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua R. Stein +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 jstein@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL C. VARNADO +1 202 887 1531 +1 202 887 0763 pvarnado@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Project Vote

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH E. BRANNON +1 202 546 4173 sbrannon@projectvote.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine M. Flanagan +1 202 210 6903 cflanagan@projectvote.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Coalition for Social Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GEORGE E. EPPSTEINER +1 919 323 3942 george@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Jean Riggs +1 919 323 3942 allison@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EMILY E. SEAWELL +1 919 246 4422 +1 919 323 3942 emily@southerncoalition.org
No Logo ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DORIAN L SPENCE +1 202 662 8324 dspence@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Mark D'Amore +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 903 7820 mdamore@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 11/02/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marta Godecki +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mgodecki@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CLAIRE GUNNER +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 cgunner@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Kaufmann +1 303 592 2236 +1 303 592 1510 skaufmann@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Allen Sigmon +1 202 778 1664 +1 202 887 0763 ksigmon@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua R. Stein +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 jstein@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL C. VARNADO +1 202 887 1531 +1 202 887 0763 pvarnado@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Project Vote

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH E. BRANNON +1 202 546 4173 sbrannon@projectvote.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine M. Flanagan +1 202 210 6903 cflanagan@projectvote.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Coalition for Social Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GEORGE E. EPPSTEINER +1 919 323 3942 george@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Jean Riggs +1 919 323 3942 allison@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EMILY E. SEAWELL +1 919 246 4422 +1 919 323 3942 emily@southerncoalition.org
No Logo DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DORIAN L SPENCE +1 202 662 8324 dspence@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Mark D'Amore +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 903 7820 mdamore@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 11/02/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marta Godecki +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mgodecki@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CLAIRE GUNNER +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 cgunner@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Kaufmann +1 303 592 2236 +1 303 592 1510 skaufmann@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Allen Sigmon +1 202 778 1664 +1 202 887 0763 ksigmon@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua R. Stein +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 jstein@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL C. VARNADO +1 202 887 1531 +1 202 887 0763 pvarnado@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Project Vote

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH E. BRANNON +1 202 546 4173 sbrannon@projectvote.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine M. Flanagan +1 202 210 6903 cflanagan@projectvote.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Coalition for Social Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GEORGE E. EPPSTEINER +1 919 323 3942 george@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Jean Riggs +1 919 323 3942 allison@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EMILY E. SEAWELL +1 919 246 4422 +1 919 323 3942 emily@southerncoalition.org
No Logo ISABEL NAJERA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DORIAN L SPENCE +1 202 662 8324 dspence@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Mark D'Amore +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 903 7820 mdamore@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 11/02/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marta Godecki +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mgodecki@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CLAIRE GUNNER +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 cgunner@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Kaufmann +1 303 592 2236 +1 303 592 1510 skaufmann@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Allen Sigmon +1 202 778 1664 +1 202 887 0763 ksigmon@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua R. Stein +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 jstein@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL C. VARNADO +1 202 887 1531 +1 202 887 0763 pvarnado@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Project Vote

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH E. BRANNON +1 202 546 4173 sbrannon@projectvote.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine M. Flanagan +1 202 210 6903 cflanagan@projectvote.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Coalition for Social Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GEORGE E. EPPSTEINER +1 919 323 3942 george@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Jean Riggs +1 919 323 3942 allison@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EMILY E. SEAWELL +1 919 246 4422 +1 919 323 3942 emily@southerncoalition.org
No Logo NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DORIAN L SPENCE +1 202 662 8324 dspence@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Mark D'Amore +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 903 7820 mdamore@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 11/02/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marta Godecki +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mgodecki@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CLAIRE GUNNER +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 cgunner@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Kaufmann +1 303 592 2236 +1 303 592 1510 skaufmann@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Allen Sigmon +1 202 778 1664 +1 202 887 0763 ksigmon@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua R. Stein +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 jstein@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL C. VARNADO +1 202 887 1531 +1 202 887 0763 pvarnado@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Project Vote

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH E. BRANNON +1 202 546 4173 sbrannon@projectvote.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine M. Flanagan +1 202 210 6903 cflanagan@projectvote.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Coalition for Social Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GEORGE E. EPPSTEINER +1 919 323 3942 george@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Jean Riggs +1 919 323 3942 allison@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EMILY E. SEAWELL +1 919 246 4422 +1 919 323 3942 emily@southerncoalition.org
No Logo SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED DORIAN L SPENCE +1 202 662 8324 dspence@lawyerscommittee.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Mark D'Amore +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 903 7820 mdamore@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 11/02/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marta Godecki +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mgodecki@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CLAIRE GUNNER +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 cgunner@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven M. Kaufmann +1 303 592 2236 +1 303 592 1510 skaufmann@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kirk Allen Sigmon +1 202 778 1664 +1 202 887 0763 ksigmon@mofo.com
TERMINATED: 09/09/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua R. Stein +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 jstein@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED PAUL C. VARNADO +1 202 887 1531 +1 202 887 0763 pvarnado@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Project Vote

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SARAH E. BRANNON +1 202 546 4173 sbrannon@projectvote.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Catherine M. Flanagan +1 202 210 6903 cflanagan@projectvote.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Southern Coalition for Social Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/16/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED GEORGE E. EPPSTEINER +1 919 323 3942 george@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allison Jean Riggs +1 919 323 3942 allison@southerncoalition.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED EMILY E. SEAWELL +1 919 246 4422 +1 919 323 3942 emily@southerncoalition.org
v.
No Logo Kelly, Thomas, Defendant
Officer/Director, Navidec, Inc.
Officer/Director, Usa Dealers Aution Com Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHRYNE E. HATHCOCK +1 919 716 6650 +1 919 716 6708 khathcock@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Regina Worley Calabro ,. +1 919 789 3178 +1 919 783 9412 regina.calabro@ogletreedeakins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Douglas McKnight +1 919 789 3159 +1 919 783 9412 michael.mcknight@ogletreedeakins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMY M. POCKLINGTON +1 804 663 2335 +1 804 225 8641 amy.pocklington@ogletreedeakins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip J. Strach +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 phil.strach@ogletree.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Anderson Blount Dorsett Mitchell & Jernigan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/06/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Lawler +1 919 821 1220 +1 919 821 6800 plawler@smithlaw.com
No Logo KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by N.c. Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED JAMES BERNIER, JR. +1 919 716 6932 +1 919 716 6763 JBernier@ncdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander McClure Peters +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 apeters@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by North Carolina Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED LAUREN M. CLEMMONS +1 919 716 6900 +1 919 716 6763 lclemmons@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Anderson Blount Dorsett Mitchell & Jernigan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/06/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Lawler +1 919 821 1220 +1 919 821 6800 plawler@smithlaw.com
No Logo NICK TENNYSON, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by N.c. Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KATHRYNE E. HATHCOCK +1 919 716 6650 +1 919 716 6708 khathcock@ncdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Regina Worley Calabro ,. +1 919 789 3178 +1 919 783 9412 regina.calabro@ogletreedeakins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Douglas McKnight +1 919 789 3159 +1 919 783 9412 michael.mcknight@ogletreedeakins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMY M. POCKLINGTON +1 804 663 2335 +1 804 225 8641 amy.pocklington@ogletreedeakins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip J. Strach +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 phil.strach@ogletree.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Anderson Blount Dorsett Mitchell & Jernigan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/06/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Lawler +1 919 821 1220 +1 919 821 6800 plawler@smithlaw.com
No Logo RICK BRAJER, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Regina Worley Calabro ,. +1 919 789 3178 +1 919 783 9412 regina.calabro@ogletreedeakins.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Farr +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 thomas.farr@odnss.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Douglas McKnight +1 919 789 3159 +1 919 783 9412 michael.mcknight@ogletreedeakins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED AMY M. POCKLINGTON +1 804 663 2335 +1 804 225 8641 amy.pocklington@ogletreedeakins.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Phillip J. Strach +1 919 787 9700 +1 919 783 9412 phil.strach@ogletree.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Anderson Blount Dorsett Mitchell & Jernigan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/06/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick D. Lawler +1 919 821 1220 +1 919 821 6800 plawler@smithlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/27/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael T. Wood +1 919 716 0186 +1 919 716 6758 mwood@ncdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RIPLEY RAND +1 336 333 5351 +1 336 333 5438 ripley.rand@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ELIZABETH M. RYAN +1 202 305 6792 +1 202 307 3961 elizabeth.ryan@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (176) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to continue
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Continue
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Joint Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: 4/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOHN F. CARELLA on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (CARELLA, JOHN)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: 4/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
            JOINT STATUS REPORT filed by all parties.. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: 2/20/2018 Unknown Document Type
              ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE AND STAY signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 2/20/2018; that the Joint Motion [Doc. # 167 ] is GRANTED and the hearing scheduled for February 22, 2018, is continued and will be rescheduled for April 19, 2018, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3 of the United States Courthouse in Winston-Salem, North Carolina, and as set out herein. (Sheets, Jamie)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/16/2018, Entered: 2/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                Joint MOTION to Continue (Joint Status Report and Motion to Continue Status Conference and Stay by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. JACLYN A. MAFFETORE is substituted as counsel for Plaintiffs. Attorney EMILY E. SEAWELL terminated. (MAFFETORE, JACLYN)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: 1/16/2018 Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 1/16/2018; that the Joint Motion [Doc. # 164 ] is GRANTED and that the hearing scheduled for January 18, 2018, is continued and will be rescheduled to February 22, 2018, at 9:30 a.m.; all proceedings in this lawsuit, including discovery and deadlines, are suspended until after the rescheduled hearing, except that nothing in this Order prevents the parties from engaging in voluntary settlement discussions; and at least three business days prior to the re-scheduled hearing, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report providing any updates as to the status of the case, providing any proposals for the case schedule, and setting out the remaining disputes to be addressed at the hearing. Any request for a further continuance must include a detailed summary of the action taken since entry of this Order, and a specific timeline with respect to any matters that remain. (Sheets, Jamie)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/12/2018, Entered: 1/12/2018 Unknown Document Type
                      Joint MOTION to Continue (Joint Status Report and Motion to Continue Status Conference and Stay) by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/12/2017; that the Joint Motion to Continue [Doc. # 162 ] is GRANTED, the hearing scheduled for December 14, 2017, is continued and is rescheduled for January 18, 2018 at 9:30 a.m., and all proceedings in this lawsuit, including discovery and deadlines, are suspended until after the rescheduled hearing, except that nothing in this Order prevents the parties from engaging in voluntary settlement discussions. FURTHER that at least three business days prior to the re-scheduled hearing, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report providing any updates as to the status of the case, providing any proposals for the case schedule, and setting out the remaining disputes to be addressed at the hearing. (Sheets, Jamie)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: 12/11/2017 Unknown Document Type
                          Joint MOTION to Continue Stay by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(KAUFMANN, STEVEN)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 10/17/2017; that the Joint Motion to Continue [Doc. # 160 ] is GRANTED, and the hearing scheduled for October 19, 2017, is continued and will be rescheduled to December 14, 2017 at 9:30 a.m. All proceedings in this lawsuit, including discovery and deadlines, are suspended until after the rescheduled hearing, except that nothing in this Order prevents the parties from engaging in voluntary settlement discussions. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 10/17/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: 10/16/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              Joint MOTION to Continue Stay by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(VARNADO, PAUL)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 9/6/2017; that the Motion [Doc. # 156 ] is GRANTED, and the appearance of Lauren M. Clemmons, Special Deputy Attorney General, North Carolina Department of Justice, for Defendant Kim Westbrook Strach, Executive Director of the North Carolina State Board of Elections, is withdrawn. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 09/06/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by SARAH E. BRANNON (BRANNON, SARAH) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Joint MOTION to Continue Stay by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(VARNADO, PAUL) (Entered: 08/17/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney LAUREN M. CLEMMONS by on behalf of KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 9/5/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CLEMMONS, LAUREN) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: 7/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                        ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/3/2017; that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel [Doc. # 154 ] is GRANTED, and Catherine M. Flanagan shall be discharged as counsel for plaintiffs effective upon entry of this Order. Matthew M. D'Amore, Steven M. Kaufmann and Paul C. Varnado of Morrison & Foerster LLP, Dorian L. Spence of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Naila S. Awan and Stuart C. Naifeh of Demos, and Emily E. Seawell and Allison J. Riggs of the Southern Coalition for Social Justice will continue in their capacity as counsel of record to Plaintiffs in the action. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/1/2017, Entered: 7/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                          First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney CATHERINE M. FLANAGAN by on behalf of ACTION NC. Responses due by 7/24/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FLANAGAN, CATHERINE)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: 6/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                            ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 6/19/2017; the hearing scheduled for June 23, 2017, is continued and will be rescheduled for August 24, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3 of the United States Courthouse in Winston-Salem, North Carolina, and as set out herein. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: 6/14/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                              Joint MOTION to Continue Stay and the June 23, 2017 Status Conference by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: 6/9/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 4/11/2017; that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel [Doc. # 150 ] is GRANTED, and Claire Gunner and Kirk Sigmon shall be discharged as counsel for plaintiffs effective upon entry of this Order. Matthew M. D'Amore, Steven M. Kaufmann and Paul C. Varnado of Morrison & Foerster LLP, Catherine M. Flanagan and Sarah E. Brannon of Project Vote, Dorian L. Spence of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Naila S. Awan and Stuart C. Naifeh of Dmos, and Emily E. Seawell and Allison J. Riggs of the Southern Coalition for Social Justice will continue in their capacity as counsel of record to Plaintiffs in the action. (Order signed on 4/11/2017 but due to technical issues was not docketed until 6/9/2017) (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: 4/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney CLAIRE GUNNER and Kirk Sigmon by on behalf of ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. Responses due by 4/27/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GUNNER, CLAIRE)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/3/2017, Entered: 4/3/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                    ORDER. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 4/3/2017, granting the parties' joint motion and the hearing scheduled for 4/7/2017, is continued until 6/23/2017 at 10:00 a.m. All proceedings including discovery and deadlines, are suspended until after the rescheduled hearing, except that nothing in this Order prevents the parties from engaging in voluntary settlement discussions. At least three business days prior to the re-scheduled hearing, the parties shall file a Joint Notice providing any updates as to the status of the case, providing any proposals for the case schedule, and setting out the remaining disputes to be addressed at the hearing, in accordance with the previous direction provided by the Court in its December 21, 2016 Order. Should any party conclude that settlement talks have reached an impasse before the June 23 hearing, nothing herein shall preclude such party from making a subsequent request for an earlier hearing. (Daniel, J)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                      Joint MOTION to Continue Stay by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: 1/31/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                        ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 1/31/2017; that the Joint Motion [Doc. # 144 ] is GRANTED: the hearing scheduled for February 3, 2017, is continued and is reset for Friday, April 7, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 of the United States Courthouse in Winston-Salem, North Carolina; the pending Motion to Modify [Doc. # 126 ] and Motion to Compel [Doc. # 131 ] are terminated as moot, and any issues of scheduling and discovery will be addressed at the hearing on April 7, 2017, with the opportunity for further briefing if necessary. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS re 139 Notice of Appearance (HATHCOCK, KATHRYNE)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS re 142 Notice of Appearance (BROOKS, CHRISTOPHER)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: 1/26/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                              Joint MOTION to Continue February 3rd Hearing by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (CLEMMONS, LAUREN)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: 1/25/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                ORDER that the Motion [Doc. # 140 ] is GRANTED. The law firm of Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak, & Stewart, P.C., Thomas A. Farr, Phillip J. Strach, Michael D. McKnight, Regina W. Calabro, and Amy M. Pocklington are permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendants. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 1/25/2017. (Butler, Carol)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CHRISTOPHER W. BROOKS on behalf of Defendants NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS (BROOKS, CHRISTOPHER)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: 1/24/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL T. WOOD on behalf of Defendant RICK BRAJER (WOOD, MICHAEL)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney THOMAS A. FARR by on behalf of NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KATHRYNE E. HATHCOCK on behalf of Defendants NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS (HATHCOCK, KATHRYNE)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/23/2017, Entered: 1/23/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 1/23/2017; that the Motion [Doc. # 137 ] is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs' reply brief in further support of their Motion to Compel is hereby reset to be served and filed on or before January 27, 2017. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 131 First MOTION to Compel by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/17/2017, Entered: 1/17/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE of Intent to File Dispositive Motions by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 131 First MOTION to Compel filed by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (BERNIER, JAMES)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: 1/6/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 131 First MOTION to Compel filed by RICK BRAJER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: 12/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 12/21/2016; that this matter is set for a status and scheduling conference and a hearing on the Motion to Modify [Doc. # 126 ] and Motion to Compel [Doc. # 131 ] on Friday, February 3, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 of the United States Courthouse in Winston-Salem, North Carolina. The deadlines for the close of discovery and filing dispositive motions will be suspended pending further consideration at the hearing. FURTHER that the Parties must engage in a further meet-and-confer during the week of January 23, 2017, and must file a Joint Notice by January 30, 2017, providing any updates as to the status of the case and setting out the remaining disputes to be addressed at the hearing. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 12/18/2016, Entered: 12/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney EMILY E. SEAWELL on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (SEAWELL, EMILY)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        First MOTION to Compel by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. Response to Motion due by 1/6/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: 12/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, to Response to 126 Joint MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: 11/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PAUL C. VARNADO on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (VARNADO, PAUL)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/22/2016, Entered: 11/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 126 Joint MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order filed by RICK BRAJER, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/2/2016, Entered: 11/2/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 11/2/2016; that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel [Doc. # 121 ] is GRANTED, and Marta A. Godecki shall be discharged as counsel for plaintiffs effective upon entry of this Order. Kirk Sigmon, Matthew M. D'Amore and Steven M. Kaufmann of Morrison & Foerster LLP, Catherine M. Flanagan and Sarah E. Brannon of Project Vote, Dorian L. Spence of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Naila S. Awan and Stuart C. Naifeh of Dmos, and Allison J. Riggs of the Southern Coalition for Social Justice will continue in their capacity as counsel of record to Plaintiffs in the action. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: 10/31/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MOTION to Modify the Scheduling Order by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (D'AMORE, MATTHEW) Modified on 11/1/2016 to edit text. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: 10/28/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CLAIRE GUNNER on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (GUNNER, CLAIRE)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 10/27/2016. For the reasons, as set forth in the Memorandum Opinion filed contemporaneously with this Order, Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 34) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendant Strach shall issue a directive within five (5) days of the entry of this Order to all North Carolina county boards of election as set out. Defendants Thomas and Tennyson shall make available any written declination requested by any county board of elections in this state. Defendants Strach, Thomas, and Tennyson shall take all reasonable steps necessary to effectuate this Courts Order. Defendant Strach's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Notice and Additional Declarations (ECF No. 116) is DENIED. Defendant Strach's Objection to the Notice of Amended Proposed Order (ECF No. 111) is SUSTAINED, in that Plaintiffs' Amended Proposed Order will not be considered by the Court.(Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 10/27/2016. For reasons as set forth in Memorandum Opinion filed contemporaneously with this Order, that Defendant Strach's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 28) and the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 31) filed collectively by Defendants Rick Brajer, Kelly Thomas and Nick Tennyson are DENIED WITH PREJUDICE. (Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: 10/27/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 10/27/2016 on Defendant Strach's Motion to Dismiss, Agency Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, (ECF Nos. 28, 31), and Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, (ECF No. 34).(Powell, Gloria)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: 10/25/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MARTA A. GODECKI by on behalf of ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. Responses due by 11/18/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GODECKI, MARTA)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              REPLY, filed by Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, to Response to 116 MOTION to Strike 112 Notice (Other),, filed by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (CLEMMONS, LAUREN) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 111 Notice (Other), 113 Objection - Other, 116 MOTION to Strike 112 Notice (Other),,, 117 Memorandum filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. Replies due by 10/3/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Hearing Transcript)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/14/2016, Entered: 9/14/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/29/2016, re: Motions Hearing, before Judge Loretta C. Biggs. Court Reporter Lori Russell, Telephone number 336-734-2547. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/16/2016. (Russell, Lori)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re 116 MOTION to Strike 112 Notice (Other),, in Support of Motion to Strike filed by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (BERNIER, JAMES) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Strike 112 Notice (Other),, by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 10/7/2016 (BERNIER, JAMES) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 9/9/2016; that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel [Doc. # 109 ] is GRANTED, and Joshua R. Stein shall be discharged as counsel for plaintiffs effective upon entry of this Order. Kirk Sigmon, Matthew M. D'Amore, Steven M. Kaufmann, and Marta A. Godecki of Morrison & Foerster LLP, Catherine M. Flanagan and Sarah E. Brannon of Project Vote, Dorian L. Spence of Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, Naila S. Awan and Stuart C. Naifeh of Dmos, and Allison J. Riggs of the Southern Coalition for Social Justice will continue in their capacity as counsel of record to Plaintiffs in the action. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/9/2016, Entered: 9/9/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          ***FILED IN ERROR*** MOTION to Strike 112 Notice (Other), by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 10/3/2016 (BERNIER, JAMES) Modified on 9/13/2016 to remove from public access. Attorney to refile. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: 9/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            OBJECTION - Other re 110 Notice (Other), 112 Notice (Other),, by Defendants RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. (FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: 9/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              NOTICE by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 110 Notice (Other), 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Second Declaration of Melvin Montford in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 2 Exhibit B: Second Declaration of Robert H. Hall in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, # 3 Exhibit C: Second Declaration of Alexander P. McCoy in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: 8/31/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re 110 Notice (Other), Objection to Plaintiffs' Notice of Amended Proposed Order (BERNIER, JAMES)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: 8/30/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE of Amended Proposed Order (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A to Amended [Proposed] Order, # 3 Exhibit B to Amended [Proposed] Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney JOSHUA R. STEIN by on behalf of ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. Responses due by 9/9/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(STEIN, JOSHUA)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Additional Attachments to Main Document re 100 Brief, Corrections Sheet to D.E. 100 -29 (Exhibit 29 to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction). (D'AMORE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, to Response to 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ; Plaintiffs' Supplemental Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY OF DOCUMENTS AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/27/2016; that the parties' Joint Motion for Entry of a Protocol for Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information [Doc. # 102 ] is GRANTED, and the Court adopts the consent Protocol set out above. The parties may agree to waive or modify requirements of the Protocol by consent, but in the event of a dispute, the terms set out above will control unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Supplemental Memorandum) filed by RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. Replies due by 7/29/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Second Declaration of Kelly Thomas, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts from Payne Deposition, # 3 Exhibit Excerpts from McClanahan Deposition, # 4 Exhibit Excerpts from Black Deposition, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Angela Taylor) (FARR, THOMAS) Modified on 7/25/2016 to correct reply deadline to conform with Judge Peake's order 96 regarding deadlines. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Memorandum re 100 Brief, In Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injuction by Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 1 Degraffenreid Depo Excerpts, # 3 Exhibit 2 Neesby Depo Excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 3 Bucholz Depo Excerpts, # 5 Exhibit 4 Strach Depo Excerpts, # 6 Exhibit 5 Feb 7 2016 Email, # 7 Exhibit 6 Feb 9 2016 Email)(CLEMMONS, LAUREN) Modified on 7/25/2016 to remove duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 7/13/2016; that the Motion to Withdraw as Counsel [Doc. # 101 ] is GRANTED, and George Eppsteiner shall be discharged as counsel for Plaintiffs effective July 16, 2016. Remaining counsel of record for Plaintiffs shall remain as counsel for Plaintiffs in this matter. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  Joint MOTION for Discovery ; Joint Motion for Entry of Protocol for Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney GEORGE E. EPPSTEINER by on behalf of ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Text of Proposed Order)(EPPSTEINER, GEORGE) Modified on 7/12/2016 to add text. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Supplemental MEMORANDUM of Law In Supprt re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35) (D'AMORE, MATTHEW) Modified on 7/11/2016 to remove duplicate text. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 07/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Brian D. Neesby filed by Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re 65 Response in Opposition to Motion - Amendment to Second Declaration of Brian D. Neesby in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (CLEMMONS, LAUREN) (Entered: 07/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER, signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 6/24/2016, that the stipulated protective order is LIMITED and MODIFIED as set out herein.FURTHER that any document or item submitted to the Court in violation of this Order is subject to being stricken. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 6/24/2016, as set out herein. (Butler, Carol) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 6/24/2016, that the Plaintiffs' Consent Motion for a Revised Discovery and Briefing Schedule Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 95 ) is GRANTED, and further that: Plaintiffs may take the depositions of the four named defendants, plus the depositions of Brian Neesby and Veronica Degraffenreid, prior to July 1, 2016; Plaintiffs' supplemental brief is due July 8, 2016, with a presumptive page limit of 30 pages; Defendants' responses are due July 22, 2016, with a presumptive page limit of 20 pages each; and Plaintiffs' reply is due July 29, 2016, with a presumptive page limit of 15 pages. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Consent MOTION to Modify 76 Order on Rule 26f Report - Individual, by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney GEORGE E. EPPSTEINER on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (EPPSTEINER, GEORGE) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Protective Order by RICK BRAJER, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re 84 Notice (Other) Statement of Interest of United States filed by RICK BRAJER, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. Replies due by 6/27/2016. (CLEMMONS, LAUREN) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney REGINA W. CALABRO on behalf of Defendants RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS (CALABRO, REGINA) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 06/06/2016; that the Motion is GRANTED, and Patrick D. Lawler is permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendants Kim W. Strach, Rick Brajer, Kelly Thomas, and Nick Tennyson. (Garland, Leah) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 6/3/2016, that the Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Hearing Date on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 85 ) is DENIED. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED DOCUMENT by RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. Amendment to 69 Response in Opposition to Motion, Amendment to Document 69-4. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - List of WIC Agencies, # 2 Exhibit B - Cooperative Agreement) (FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney SARAH E. BRANNON on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (BRANNON, SARAH) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney PATRICK D. LAWLER by on behalf of RICK BRAJER, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(LAWLER, PATRICK) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re 81 Order Filed for Hearing, by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. Responses due by 6/13/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF INTEREST OF THE UNITED STATES filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 517 re 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Powell, Gloria) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER Appointing RENE S. ELLIS as the mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Gammon, Cheryl) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JAMES BERNIER, JR on behalf of Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH (BERNIER, JAMES) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 5/10/2016; that the motion (ECF No. 79 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction 34 shall be heard on Monday, August 29, 2016 at 9:30 a.m. in Winston-Salem, North Carolina in Courtroom No. 1. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT re 76 Order on Rule 26f Report - Individual, Statement Regarding Identification of Agreed Mediator by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Hearing re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. Responses due by 5/31/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY, filed by Defendants RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS, to Response to 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, for Failure to State a Claim, filed by RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. (FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY, filed by Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, to Response to 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (CLEMMONS, LAUREN) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 4/28/2016; that the Court adopts the discovery schedule set forth above, as agreed upon by the Parties during the hearing on April 21, 2016. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 4/26/2016, that the motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit in Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 74 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Strach may file a Reply Memorandum in Support of her Motion to Dismiss of no more than 15 pages. (Daniel, J) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendant Strach's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(CLEMMONS, LAUREN) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. Responses due by 5/16/2016 (D'AMORE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 26(f) Report (Individual). Responses due by 5/16/2016 by RICK BRAJER, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS.(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 04/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, to Response to 48 MOTION to Expedite Discovery -Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MARTA A. GODECKI on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (GODECKI, MARTA) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. Replies due by 5/2/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Declaration of Commissioner Kelly Thomas, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Declaration of B. Neesby, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C - Declaration of B. Moore, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D - Declaration of M. Burghardt, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E - Declaration of C. McClanahan, # 6 Exhibit Ex. F - Declaration of S. Moore, # 7 Exhibit Ex. G - Declaration of W. Rose, # 8 Exhibit Ex. H - Declaration of D. Fayco, # 9 Exhibit Ex. I - Declaration of R. Gilliand, # 10 Exhibit Ex. J - Declaration of S. Batten, # 11 Exhibit Ex. K - Declaration of M. Hunter, # 12 Exhibit Ex. L - Declaration of H. Branch, # 13 Exhibit Ex. M - Declaration of R. Alepa, # 14 Exhibit Ex. N - Declaration of B. Jackson, # 15 Exhibit Ex. O - Declaration of D. Donahue, # 16 Exhibit Ex. P - Declaration of B. Morrow, # 17 Exhibit Ex. Q - Declaration of N. Coston, # 18 Exhibit Ex. R - Declaration of M. Becketts, # 19 Exhibit Ex. S - Declaration of R. Petteway, # 20 Exhibit Ex. T - Declaration of H. Skeens)(FARR, THOMAS) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed in Opposition filed by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 52 USCS, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Notice Letter)(CLEMMONS, LAUREN) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Brian D. Neesby filed by Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re 65 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (CLEMMONS, LAUREN) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Veronica W. Degraffenreid filed by Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re 65 Response in Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (CLEMMONS, LAUREN) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Replies due by 5/2/2016. (CLEMMONS, LAUREN) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, for Failure to State a Claim, filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. Replies due by 4/28/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 48 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by RICK BRAJER, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. Replies due by 4/18/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 4/11/2016, that the Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit (ECF No. 58 ) is GRANTED, and Defendants Brajer, Thomas, and Tennyson may file a Joint Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction of no more than 30 pages. (Daniel, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 4/11/2016, that the Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit on behalf of Defendant Strach (ECF No. 57 ) is GRANTED and Defendant Strach may file a Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction of no more than 30 pages.(Daniel, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 4/11/2016, that Plaintiffs' Amended MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages (ECF No. 59 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs may file a consolidated opposition brief of up to 50 pages in opposition to Defendant Strach's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 28 ) and Defendants Brayer, Thomas, and Tennyson's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 31 ). (Daniel, J)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amended MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exceed Page Limit by RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: 4/11/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Excess Pages)(CLEMMONS, LAUREN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney AMY M. POCKLINGTON on behalf of Defendants RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS (POCKLINGTON, AMY)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE on 4/4/2016; that this case is set for an Initial Pretrial Conference and hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery on April 21, 2016, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3 of the United States Courthouse in Winston-Salem, North Carolina. FURTHER that Defendants must file any Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery by April 11, 2016, and that Plaintiffs must file any Reply thereto by April 18, 2016. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 3/23/2016; that the motion 33 is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs' opening Preliminary Injunction Brief, in excess of ten (10) pages above the 20 page limit set forth by Local Rule 7.3(d), is allowed. Further, Plaintiffs are directed to file the Preliminary Injunction Brief as a separate document forthwith. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: 3/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHERINE M. FLANAGAN on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (FLANAGAN, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney DORIAN L SPENCE on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 48 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Expedite Discovery by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Emily Elizabeth Seawell in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Isabel Najera in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Melvin Montford in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Alexander P. McCoy in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Alexandria Marie Lane in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Juliette Muniz Lafargue in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Sherry Denise Holverson in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Robert H. Hall in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Catherine M. Flanagan in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Colline Ferrier in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Matthew M. D'Amore in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Pamela Cataldo in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION filed by Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE re 34 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Declaration of Christopher Butler in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. Responses due by 4/14/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Text of Proposed Order)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit B: Proposed Preliminary Injunction Brief)(D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM filed by Defendants RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS re 31 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the alternative, for Failure to State a Claim, filed by RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. (FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or in the alternative, for Failure to State a Claim, by RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. Responses due by 4/11/2016 (FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. (FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM filed by Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH re 28 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM in support of Motion to Dismiss filed by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (CLEMMONS, LAUREN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. Responses due by 4/11/2016 (CLEMMONS, LAUREN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: 3/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by KIM WESTBROOK STRACH. (CLEMMONS, LAUREN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CATHERINE M. FLANAGAN on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (FLANAGAN, CATHERINE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by RICK BRAJER, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 1/27/2016; that the motion 21 is GRANTED and the aforementioned counsel shall be withdrawn. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: 1/27/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 1/27/2016; that the motion (Docket Entry 22 ) is GRANTED. FURTHER pursuant to Local Rule 83.1(e) that the appearance of Michael T. Wood, Special Deputy Attorney General, North Carolina Department of Justice, for Defendant Rick Brajer, in his official capacity as Secretary of the North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, is withdrawn. (Sheets, Jamie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MICHAEL T. WOOD by on behalf of RICK BRAJER. Responses due by 2/16/2016 (WOOD, MICHAEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney KATHRYNE E. HATHCOCK by on behalf of NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. Responses due by 2/16/2016 (HATHCOCK, KATHRYNE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PATRICK D. LAWLER on behalf of Defendants RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS (LAWLER, PATRICK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PHILLIP JOHN STRACH on behalf of Defendants RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS (STRACH, PHILLIP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL DOUGLAS MCKNIGHT on behalf of Defendants RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS (MCKNIGHT, MICHAEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2016, Entered: 1/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney THOMAS A. FARR on behalf of Defendants RICK BRAJER, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS (FARR, THOMAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: 1/13/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LAUREN M. CLEMMONS on behalf of Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH (CLEMMONS, LAUREN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: 1/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STUART C. NAIFEH on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (NAIFEH, STUART)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: 1/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by attorney NAILA S. AWAN on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (AWAN, NAILA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by attorney JOSHUA R. STEIN on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (STEIN, JOSHUA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KIRK SIGMON on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (SIGMON, KIRK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney STEVEN M. KAUFMANN on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (KAUFMANN, STEVEN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MATTHEW M. D'AMORE on behalf of Plaintiffs ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE, ISABEL NAJERA, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE (D'AMORE, MATTHEW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KATHRYNE E. HATHCOCK on behalf of Defendants NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS (HATHCOCK, KATHRYNE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney MICHAEL T. WOOD on behalf of Defendant RICK BRAJER (WOOD, MICHAEL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by attorney ALEXANDER MCCLURE PETERS on behalf of Defendant KIM WESTBROOK STRACH (PETERS, ALEXANDER)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to RICK BRAJER, KIM WESTBROOK STRACH, NICK TENNYSON, KELLY THOMAS. (Attachments: # 1 Tennyson, # 2 Strach, # 3 Brajer)(Coyne, Michelle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE. (RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA. (RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed pursuant to FRCP 7.1(a) by Plaintiff ACTION NC. (RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-1826033), filed by ISABEL NAJERA, SHERRY DENISE HOLVERSON, NORTH CAROLINA A. PHILIP RANDOLPH INSTITUTE, ACTION NC, DEMOCRACY NORTH CAROLINA, ALEXANDRIA MARIE LANE. (RIGGS, ALLISON)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?